California Northern District Court
Case #: 3:23-cr-00345
Case Filed:Oct 05, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Nov 04, 2023 12:55 AM PDT
Defendant
Frederick Carl Gaestel (2)
Represented By
Albert J. Boro, Jr.
Boro Law Firm
contact info
David W. Rizk
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Defendant
Natalie Marie Gonzalez (1)
Represented By
David W. Rizk
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Defendant
Rory Spencer Rickey (4)
Represented By
David W. Rizk
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Kathryn Elizabeth Ross
Kathryn Ross, Attorney At Law
contact info
Defendant
Matthew Thomas Sestak (3)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Daniel Pastor
U.S. Attorney'S Office, Northern District Of California
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/04/2023 2:18 AM PDT
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
1 1 15 pgs COMPLAINT as to Matthew Thomas Sestak (1). (gba, COURT STAFF) [3:23-mj-71384-MAG]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Cover Sheet
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Frederick Carl Gaestel (1). (lsk, COURT STAFF) [3:23-mj-71382-MAG]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Rory Spencer Rickey (1). (lsk, COURT STAFF) [3:23-mj-71383-MAG]
Related: [-]
2 2 Motion to seal by USA (lsk, COURT STAFF) [3:23-mj-71382-MAG]
Related: [-]
2 2 Motion to seal by USA (lsk, COURT STAFF) [3:23-mj-71383-MAG]
Related: [-]
3 3 *SEALED DOCUMENT* MOTION for Sealing Order by USA. (gba, COURT STAFF) [3:23-mj-71384-MAG]
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs ORDER as to Frederick Carl Gaestel. Clerk of Court shall provide copies of the sealed documents to employees of the United States Attorneys Office. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang on 9/12/2023. (lsk, COURT STAFF)[3:23-mj-71382-MAG]
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs ORDER sealing as to Rory Spencer Rickey. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang on 9/12/2023. (lsk, COURT STAFF) [3:23-mj-71383-MAG]
Related: [-]
4 4 *SEALED DOCUMENT* Order Granting 3 Motion for Sealing Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter H. Kang on 9/12/2023. (gba, COURT STAFF) [3:23-mj-71384-MAG]
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2023
Set/Reset Hearing as to Defendant Frederick Carl Gaestel Initial Appearance on Complaint set for 9/14/2023 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 14, 18th Floor before Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang. (jaf, COURT STAFF) [3:23-mj-71382-MAG]
Related: [-]
Set/Reset Hearing as to Defendant Rory Spencer Rickey Initial Appearance on Complaint set for 9/14/2023 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 14, 18th Floor before Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang. (jaf, COURT STAFF) [3:23-mj-71383-MAG]
Related: [-]
1 1 23 pgs COMPLAINT as to Natalie Marie Gonzalez (1). (lsk, COURT STAFF) [3:23-mj-71393-MAG]
Related: [-]
2 2 Motion to seal by USA (lsk, COURT STAFF) [3:23-mj-71393-MAG]
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs ORDER sealing as to Natalie Marie Gonzalez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang on 9/13/2023. (lsk, COURT STAFF) [3:23-mj-71393-MAG]
Related: [-]
5 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang: Initial Appearance as to Frederick Carl Gaestel held on 9/14/2023, remanded to custody. The Court directs entry of the following Order : Pursuant to the Due Process Protection Act, the Court advised government counsel of the government's disclosure obligations under Brady v. Maryland and its progeny, and that the failure to do so in a timely manner may result in dismissal of the indictment or information, dismissal of individual charges, exclusion of government evidence or witnesses, or any other remedy that is just under the circumstances. Added attorney David W. Rizk for Frederick Carl Gaestel. ID/ Removal Hearing set for 9/18/2023 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 14, 18th Floor before Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang. Government moves to unseal the entire case - Granted by Court. Recording Time 10:42-10:49. (lsk, COURT STAFF) [3:23-mj-71382-MAG]
Related: [-]
5 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang: Initial Appearance as to Rory Spencer Rickey held on 9/14/2023, remanded to custody. The Court directs entry of the following Order : Pursuant to the Due Process Protection Act, the Court advised government counsel of the government's disclosure obligations under Brady v. Maryland and its progeny, and that the failure to do so in a timely manner may result in dismissal of the indictment or information, dismissal of individual charges, exclusion of government evidence or witnesses, or any other remedy that is just under the circumstances. Added attorney David W. Rizk for Rory Spencer Rickey. Removal Hearing set for 9/18/2023 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 14, 18th Floor before Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang. Government moves to unseal the entire case - Granted by Court.Recording Time 10:49-10:55. (lsk, COURT STAFF) [3:23-mj-71383-MAG]
Related: [-]
6 6 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang: Initial Appearance as to Natalie Marie Gonzalez held on 9/14/2023 The Court directs entry of the following Order : Pursuant to the Due Process Protection Act, the Court advised government counsel of the government's disclosure obligations under Brady v. Maryland and its progeny, and that the failure to do so in a timely manner may result in dismissal of the indictment or information, dismissal of individual charges, exclusion of government evidence or witnesses, or any other remedy that is just under the circumstances. Detention Hearing as to Natalie Marie Gonzalez held on 9/14/2023, Added attorney David W. Rizk (special) for Natalie Marie Gonzalez. Status Conference ID counsel set for 9/19/2023 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 14, 18th Floor before Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang. Government moves to unseal the entire case - Granted by Court. Recording Time 11:00-11:13; 2:53-3:44. (lsk, COURT STAFF) Modified on 9/15/2023 (lsk, COURT STAFF). [3:23-mj-71393-MAG]
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
6 6 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 09/13/2023 as to Frederick Carl Gaestel. (exl, COURT STAFF) [3:23-mj-71382-MAG]
Related: [-]
6 6 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 09/13/2023 as to Rory Spencer Rickey. (exl, COURT STAFF) [3:23-mj-71383-MAG]
Related: [-]
8 8 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 09/13/2023 as to Natalie Marie Gonzalez. (exl, COURT STAFF) [3:23-mj-71393-MAG]
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
8 8 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Frederick Carl Gaestel (lsk, COURT STAFF) [3:23-mj-71382-MAG]
Related: [-]
8 8 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Rory Spencer Rickey (lsk, COURT STAFF) [3:23-mj-71383-MAG]
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang: ID of Counsel Hearing as to Frederick Carl Gaestel held on 9/18/2023, Status Conference as to Frederick Carl Gaestel held on 9/18/2023, remanded to custody. Added attorney Albert J. Boro, Jr for Frederick Carl Gaestel. Attorney David W. Rizk terminated in case as to Frederick Carl Gaestel. Detention Hearing set for 9/19/2023 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 14, 18th Floor before Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang. Recording Time 10:47-10:55. (lsk, COURT STAFF) [3:23-mj-71382-MAG]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release Bond Entered unsecured $15,000.00 as to Rory Spencer Rickey. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang on 9/18/2023. (lsk, COURT STAFF) Modified on 9/19/2023 (lsk, COURT STAFF). [3:23-mj-71383-MAG]
Related: [-]
10 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang: ID of Counsel/ Status Hearing as to Rory Spencer Rickey held on 9/18/2023, Added attorney Kathryn Elizabeth Ross for Rory Spencer Rickey. Attorney David W. Rizk terminated in case as to Rory Spencer Rickey. Recording Time 10:55-11:00; 3:10-3:36. (lsk, COURT STAFF) [3:23-mj-71383-MAG]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
9 9 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Natalie Marie Gonzalez (lsk, COURT STAFF) [3:23-mj-71393-MAG]
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs ORDER as to Frederick Carl Gaestel exclude time 9/19/2023-10/18/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang on 9/19/2023. (lsk, COURT STAFF) [3:23-mj-71382-MAG]
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang: Status Conference as to Natalie Marie Gonzalez held on 9/19/2023 Preliminary Examination set for 10/18/2023 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 14, 18th Floor before Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros. Status Conference set for 10/18/2023 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 14, 18th Floor before Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros. Recording Time 11:17-11:25. (lsk, COURT STAFF) [3:23-mj-71393-MAG]
Related: [-]
11 11 1 pgs ORDER as to Natalie Marie Gonzalez exclude time 9/19/2023-10/18/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang on 9/19/2023. (lsk, COURT STAFF) [3:23-mj-71393-MAG]
Related: [-]
12 12 1 pgs Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang: Detention Hearing as to Frederick Carl Gaestel held on 9/19/2023 Preliminary Examination set for 10/18/2023 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 14, 18th Floor before Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros. Recording Time 11:38-12:29. (lsk, COURT STAFF) [3:23-mj-71382-MAG]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
11 11 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release Bond $50,000.00 unsecured Entered as to Frederick Carl Gaestel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang on 9/19/2023. (lsk, COURT STAFF) [3:23-mj-71382-MAG]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
Set/Reset Hearing as to Defendant Natalie Marie Gonzalez. Status Conference set for 9/27/2023 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 14, 18th Floor before Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang. (jaf, COURT STAFF) [3:23-mj-71393-MAG]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
14 14 1 pgs Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang: Status Conference as to Natalie Marie Gonzalez held on 9/27/2023 re modification of pretrial release conditions. Recording Time 11:36-11:54. (lsk, COURT STAFF). Audio Recording emailed to AUSA and FPD. (jlg, COURT STAFF). [3:23-mj-71393-MAG]
Related: [-]
15 15 3 pgs Order by Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang granting 7 PS8 Memorandum Request, as to Natalie Marie Gonzalez (1).(jaf, COURT STAFF) [3:23-mj-71393-MAG]
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
16 16 AUDIO RECORDINGS ORDER Related [+],. Court will send to David Rizk at david_rizk@fd.org a link to the files requested in this order. Fee waived because filer is USAO, FPD or CJA counsel on this case (Rizk, David)[3:23-mj-71393-MAG] Audio Recording sent to David Rizk on 9/28/23. Modified on 10/25/2023 (jaf, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-] questing docket(s):14
17 17 1 pgs Order by Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang granting 13 PS8 Memorandum Request, as to Natalie Marie Gonzalez (1).(jaf, COURT STAFF) [3:23-mj-71393-MAG]
Related: [-]
18 18 AUDIO RECORDINGS ORDER Related [+],. Court will send to Daniel Pastor at daniel.pastor@usdoj.gov a link to the files requested in this order. Fee waived because filer is USAO, FPD or CJA counsel on this case (Pastor, Daniel)[3:23-mj-71393-MAG] Audio Files sent to Daniel Pastor. Modified on 10/25/2023 (jaf, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-] questing docket(s):14
Thursday, October 05, 2023
5 5 3 pgs ORDER to unseal case as to Matthew Thomas Sestak. Court HEREBY ORDERS that the the above-captioned matter be unsealed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros on 10/5/2023. (lsk, COURT STAFF) [3:23-mj-71384-MAG]
Related: [-]
20 20 10 pgs INDICTMENT as to Natalie Marie Gonzalez (1) count(s) 1, Frederick Carl Gaestel (2) count(s) 1, 3, Matthew Thomas Sestak (3) count(s) 1, 2, Rory Spencer Rickey (4) count(s) 1, 4. (lsk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]