California Southern District Court
Judge:Marilyn L Huff
Referred: Steve B Chu
Case #: 3:23-cv-02051
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332pl Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Nov 07, 2023
Terminated:Jan 16, 2025
Case in other court:Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, 37-02023-00043197-CU-PL-CTL
Last checked: Sunday May 05, 2024 3:52 AM PDT
Defendant
Amazon.com Services LLC
Represented By
M. Ray Hartman, III
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Brian Michael Ledger
Gordon & Rees LLP
contact info
Ross Eleazer Bautista
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Tara Shinall
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Matthew Paul Nugent
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani
contact info
Defendant
Brick Adams LLC
Represented By
Mitchell B. Malachowski
Tyson & Mendes
contact info
Adrian A. Alba
Tyson & Mendes LLP
contact info
Defendant
Coast to Coast Service LLC
1058 Pacific Street
Brooklyn, NY 11238
Defendant
Does 1 through 30
Plaintiff
Carlota Encuentra
Represented By
Samuel Dagan
The Law Offices Of Samuel Dagan
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
Coast to Coast Sales LLC
a New York Domestic Limited Liability Company 1058 Pacific Street
Brooklyn, NY 11238
Represented By
Stephen M. Lobbin
Sml Avvocati P.C.
contact info
Thomas R. Kelleher
Walsh Mckean Furcolo, LLP
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Brick Adams LLC
Represented By
Mitchell B. Malachowski
Tyson & Mendes
contact info
Adrian A. Alba
Tyson & Mendes LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Church& Dwight Co., Inc.
Terminated: 01/02/2024
Represented By
David Paul Hansen
Snell & Wilmer, LLP
contact info

GPO Dec 06 2023
ORDER Submitting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss: Replies due by 12/11/2023. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 12/6/2023.(exs)
GPO Jan 02 2024
ORDER Granting Defendant Church & Dwight's Motion to Dismiss without Leave to Amend [Doc.5]. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 01/02/2024. (mjw)
GPO Apr 15 2024
Order Submitting Third Party Defendant Coast To Coasts Motion to Dismiss Third-party Complaint. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 04/15/2024.(mjw)
GPO Apr 17 2024
Order Granting Third Party Defendant Coast To Coasts Motion to Dismiss Third-party Complaint with Leave to Amend [Doc No.24]. Brick Adams may file an amended third-party complaint within 30 days from the date this order is filed. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 04/17/2024. (mjw)
GPO Jun 25 2024
ORDER Denying Third Party Defendant Coast To Coasts Motion to Dismiss First Amended Third-party Complaint [Doc. No.44]. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 06/25/2024. (mjw)

Docket last updated: 87 minutes ago
Thursday, January 16, 2025
68 68 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 01/16 11:21 AM
ORDER Granting Joint Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice and Directing the Clerk to Close the Case66 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 1/16/2025. (bdc)
Related: [-]
67 67 minutes ~Util - Terminate Hearings Thu 01/16 9:05 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu: The parties have filed a Joint Motion to Dismiss Entire Case with Prejudice. Accordingly, the Settlement Disposition Conference set for 1/17/2025 9:45 AM is vacated. (no document attached) (cdc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
66 66 motion Dismiss Wed 01/15 10:52 AM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss Entire Case with Prejudice by Brick Adams LLC(a New Jersey Domestic Limited Liability Company). (Malachowski, Mitchell)
Related: [-]