Illinois Central District Court
Judge:Michael M Mihm
Referred: Jonathan E Hawley
Case #: 1:23-cv-01417
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1983 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Nov 09, 2023
Terminated:Jan 29, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday May 07, 2024 3:32 AM CDT
Defendant
Bloomington Police Department
305 S. East Street
Bloomington, IL 61701
Represented By
Matthew Allen Warner
Quinn Johnston Henderson Pretorius & Cerulo
contact info
Peter R Jennetten
Quinn Johnston
contact info
Defendant
City of Bloomington
115 E. Washington Street
Bloomington, IL 61701
Represented By
Matthew Allen Warner
Quinn Johnston Henderson Pretorius & Cerulo
contact info
Peter R Jennetten
Quinn Johnston
contact info
Defendant
Steven Statz
Police Officer, in his individual and official capacity, 305 S. East Street
Bloomington, IL 61701
Represented By
Matthew Allen Warner
Quinn Johnston Henderson Pretorius & Cerulo
contact info
Peter R Jennetten
Quinn Johnston
contact info
Defendant
Adam Stone
Police Officer, in his individual and official capacity 305 S. East Street
Bloomington, IL 61701
Represented By
Matthew Allen Warner
Quinn Johnston Henderson Pretorius & Cerulo
contact info
Peter R Jennetten
Quinn Johnston
contact info
Defendant
Taylor Turner
Police Officer, in his individual and official capacity, 305 S. East Street
Bloomington, IL 61701
Represented By
Matthew Allen Warner
Quinn Johnston Henderson Pretorius & Cerulo
contact info
Peter R Jennetten
Quinn Johnston
contact info
Defendant
Alejandro Vasquez
Police Officer, in his individual and official capacity, 305 S. East Street
Bloomington, IL 61701
Represented By
Matthew Allen Warner
Quinn Johnston Henderson Pretorius & Cerulo
contact info
Peter R Jennetten
Quinn Johnston
contact info
Defendant
Aaron Veerman
Police Officer, in his individual and official capacity, 305 S. East Street
Bloomington, IL 61701
Represented By
Matthew Allen Warner
Quinn Johnston Henderson Pretorius & Cerulo
contact info
Peter R Jennetten
Quinn Johnston
contact info
Plaintiff
Rakeem Harris
1111 Woodbury Place
Bloomington, IL 61701


Docket last updated: 04/15/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, April 07, 2025
61 61 appeal USCA Order Mon 04/07 2:55 PM
CIRCUIT RULE 3(b) FEE NOTICE. See written Order. Within the next 30 days, you must either (1) Pay the required $600.00 docketing fee PLUS the $5.00 notice of appeal filing fee ($605.00 TOTAL) to the District Court Clerk, or (2) File a motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis with the Court of Appeals. If one of the above actions is not taken within 30 days from 4/4/2025, your case will be dismissed, pursuant to Circuit Rule 3(b). (ED)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis Fri 04/04 12:07 PM
TEXT ORDER: DENIYNG Plaintiff Rakeem Harris'60 Motion for Permission to Appeal in forma pauperis ("IFP") as BARRED pursuant to the Order entered in Harris v. McLean County, et al., Case No. 24-cv-1451-JEH (C.D. Ill. Mar. 24, 2025). That Order was entered three days prior to Harris filing the instant60 IFP motion, and bars him "from filing any further Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Cost for a period of one year," or until 03/24/2026. This bar was entered as a formal sanction against Harris to due to his repeated, abusive filing behaviors in several cases in this district, including this one. Consistent with that Order, Plaintiff's60 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis is DENIED as BARRED. Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 4/4/2025. (MJC)
Related: [-]