New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Gary R Brown
Referred: Steven I Locke
Case #: 2:23-cv-08375
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Nov 10, 2023
Terminated:Feb 05, 2024
Last checked: Saturday May 11, 2024 5:27 AM EDT
Defendant
Solawave Inc.
3641 Holdrege Ave, Unit B
Los Angeles, CA 90016
Represented By
Kevin James Minnick
Spertus, Landes & Josephs, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Kelly McGlynn
Represented By
Philip M. Smith
Kravit Smith LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, February 05, 2024
order Order Dismissing Case Mon 02/05 9:02 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Ordered by Judge Gary R. Brown on 2/5/2024. (KM)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 02/02 1:53 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kelly McGlynn (Smith, Philip)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
12 12 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 01/22 2:57 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Solawave Inc., filed by Kelly McGlynn. (Smith, Philip)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 01/10 10:34 AM
Electronic ORDER granting DE11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. On consent, Solawave's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to and including 1/17/24. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 1/10/2024. (AGB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 01/09 9:53 AM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Solawave Inc.. (Minnick, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 12/11 1:11 PM
Electronic ORDER granting DE10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. On consent, Solawave Inc.'s deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to and including 1/10/2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 12/11/2023. (AGB)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 12/08 2:28 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Solawave Inc.. (Minnick, Kevin)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 12/08 1:47 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin James Minnick on behalf of Solawave Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Minnick, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
8 8 3 pgs service Summons Returned Executed Mon 12/04 2:03 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kelly McGlynn. Solawave Inc. served on 11/20/2023, answer due 12/11/2023. (Smith, Philip)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
7 7 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically Wed 11/15 5:29 PM
Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically approved by Lisa Florio, Operations Manager, on 11/15/2023. (LF)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
6 6 service Summons Issued Mon 11/13 4:23 PM
Summons Issued as to Solawave Inc. (LJ)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Mon 11/13 4:20 PM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (LJ)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Mon 11/13 4:14 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (LJ)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Refund of Fees Paid Electronically Mon 11/13 4:06 PM
Letter MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically by Kelly McGlynn. (Smith, Philip)
Related: [-]
2 2 2 pgs misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Mon 11/13 10:32 AM
Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. by Kelly McGlynn (Smith, Philip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons
notice Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet Mon 11/13 8:51 AM
Notice: Re: Missing Civil Cover Sheet. A Civil Cover Sheet was not filed; the Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a Civil Cover Sheet. Counsel is directed to submit the Civil Cover Sheet using the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (LJ)
Related: [-]
utility Incorrect Case-Document Information Mon 11/13 4:11 PM
Incorrect Document Entry Information. Complaint was entered as against plaintiff; entry was deleted and re-entered as against defendant. (LJ)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 11/13 4:19 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Gary R. Brown and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (LJ)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 10, 2023
1 1 17 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 11/10 3:30 PM
COMPLAINT against Solawave Inc. Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Kelly McGlynn. (LJ)
Related: [-]
misc Filing Fee Received Mon 11/13 4:11 PM
FILING FEE: $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-17273216 (LJ)
Related: [-]