California Central District Court
Case #: 2:23-mj-05863
Case Filed:Nov 14, 2023
Terminated:Nov 14, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Nov 16, 2023 11:22 PM PST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
US Attorney's Office
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Fereidoun Khalilian (1)
Terminated: 11/14/2023
Represented By
Adam Olin
Federal Public Defenders Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/04/2023 6:22 PM PST
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
Notice to District of Nevada of a Rule 5 or Rule 32 Initial Appearance as to Defendant Fereidoun Khalilian. Your case number is: 23mj981-BNW. The clerk will transmit any restricted documents via email. Using your PACER account, you may retrieve the docket sheet and any text-only entries via the case number link. The following document link(s) is also provided:10 Warrant of Removal and Commitment to Another District. If you require certified copies of any documents, please send a request to email address CrimIntakeCourtDocs-LA@cacd.uscourts.gov (mhe)
Related: [-]
1 1 1 pgs AFFIDAVIT RE: OUT-OF-DISTRICT WARRANT (Rule 5(c)(3)) filed as to defendant Fereidoun Khalilian, originating in the District of Nevada. Defendant charged in violation of: 18:1958. Signed by agent Jesse Vazquez, FBI, Special Agent. USA. (mhe)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs REPORT COMMENCING CRIMINAL ACTION as to Defendant Fereidoun Khalilian; defendants Year of Birth: 1971; date of arrest: 11/13/2023 USMS# REG 65174-510 (mhe)
Related: [-]
3 3 5 pgs NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Fereidoun Khalilian (mhe)
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs Defendant Fereidoun Khalilian arrested on warrant issued by the USDC District of Nevada at Las Vegas.(mhe)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 53 pgs Charging Documents
5 5 1 pgs MINUTES OF ARREST ON OUT OF DISTRICT WARRANT held before Magistrate Judge A. Joel Richlin as to Defendant Fereidoun Khalilian. Court issues Order under Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f) concerning prosecutor's disclosure obligations; see General Order 21-02 (written order). Defendant arraigned and states true name is Attorney: Adam Olin for Fereidoun Khalilian, Deputy Federal Public Defender, present. Court orders defendant Permanently detained. Defendant remanded to the custody or currently in the custody of the US Marshal. Court orders defendant held to answer to District of Nevada. Warrant of Removal and final commitment to issue. Defendant submits to detention forthwith. Warrant of removal and final commitment is ordered. Court Smart: CS 11/14/23. (mhe)
Related: [-]
6 6 4 pgs ORDER OF DETENTION by Magistrate Judge A. Joel Richlin as to Defendant Fereidoun Khalilian, (mhe)
Related: [-]
7 7 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed as to Defendant Fereidoun Khalilian. ( Not for Public View pursuant to the E-Government Act of 2002) (mhe)
Related: [-]
8 8 2 pgs ADVISEMENT OF STATUTORY & CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS filed by Defendant Fereidoun Khalilian. (mhe)
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs WAIVER OF RIGHTS approved by Magistrate Judge A. Joel Richlin as to Defendant Fereidoun Khalilian. (mhe)
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs WARRANT OF REMOVAL AND COMMITMENT by Magistrate Judge A. Joel Richlin that Defendant Fereidoun Khalilian be removed to the District of Nevada (mhe)
Related: [-]