Jacobus et al v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-05823 |
Nature of Suit | 245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Nov 14, 2023 |
Case in other court: | North Carolina Eastern, 7:23-cv-01457 |
Last checked: Sunday May 12, 2024 5:01 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
f/k/a Asahi Glass Co., Ltd. 55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
AGC Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma Management LLC
Archroma Management LLC 4000 Monroe Rd.
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Archroma U.S. Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
John Doe Defendants 1-49
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Raytheon Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation
|
|
Plaintiff
Heidi Baldwin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cindy Barber
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elizabeth Barber
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Barber
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chris Bengivengo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michelle Bengivengo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jon Blank
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lane Blank
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steven Boggs
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Teresa Boggs
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bonnie Braudway
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dustin Braudway
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George Bruton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Heidi Bruton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carolyn Bryant
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Bryant
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dana Crater
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Geoffrey Crater
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Derl Demello
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Denison
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Linda Denison
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bethany Duncan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Peter Duncan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Ely
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sharon Ely
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Susanne Fahnemann
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Clifford Gause, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Grant Dallas Glass
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jennifer Glass
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elaine Gomperts
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Gomperts
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Phillina Jacobs Grainger
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Hanson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mary Hanson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alena Haworth
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul Haworth
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Allie Hernandez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Hernandez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Honeybird Organic Farm, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul Horning
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Virginia Horning
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Julia Jacobsen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Seth Jacobsen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jason Tyler Jacobus
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alethea Jenkins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Jenkins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jenkins Family Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Nicholas Properties, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lindsey Cameron Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mike Kelleher
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Kessler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Aaram Kumar
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Debra Lahnum
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donald Lahnum
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michele Leblanc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dennis Leveris
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patricia Lewis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Lewis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dawn Liebetruth
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Phillip Troy Linger
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Betty Maynard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Atlas Maynard III
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Winifred McCoy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charlene McFayden
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dennis McFayden
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sharon Dean Mercer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patricia E. Mohr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gene Moore
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sharon Moore
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ann Nunn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Major Michael Nunn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Pena
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tracy Pena
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Price
BDTP 7901 Farrow Road
Columbia, SC 29203 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Scott
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vicki Scott
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Doug Shomody
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eva Simon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Danielle Sproles
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joshua Sproles
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Debera Stamey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Stamey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Sweeney
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kara Sweeney
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Katherine Tison
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rufus Henry Weaver III
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane Weggenmann
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alton Williams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Debra Wilson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fred Wilson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Woods
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Darryl Wright
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pamela Wright
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 08/14 6:03 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Elizabeth Barber, Grant Dallas Glass Without Prejudice Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-05823-RMG(Summy, Scott) |
|
Monday, November 27, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
service
Summons Issued
Mon 11/27 11:19 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
Friday, November 17, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Fri 11/17 3:41 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: North Carolina Eastern (associated as of 11/14/2023), 7:23-cv-01457, Jacobus et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-05823-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
12 | 12
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Fri 11/17 3:35 PM
Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Eastern; Case Number 7:23-cv-01457. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Thursday, November 09, 2023 | ||
11 | 11 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO - 157) - Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. § 1407 to the District of South Carolina for the reasons stated in the order of December 7, 2018, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Richard M. Gergel. Signed by Tiffany D. Pete, Clerk of the Panel, entered on 11/9/2023. (Stouch, L.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 11/17/2023.] | |
Tuesday, October 24, 2023 | ||
10 | 10 Notice of Appearance filed by James Scott Flowers on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Flowers, James) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 11/17/2023.] | |
Monday, October 23, 2023 | ||
8 | 8 ORDER granting6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer - If this action is transferred to the In re Aqueous Film-Forming Foam Products multidistrict litigation (AFFF MDL), then the deadlines for all Defendants to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint shall be in accordance with the established rules and procedures in the AFFF MDL. Should the Judicial Panel on the Multidistrict Litigation (JPML) decline to transfer this action to the AFFF MDL, Defendants shall have through and including the 28th day after such disposition by the JPML to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/20/2023. Copy sent to Counsel, J. Scott Flowers of Hutchens Law Firm LLP at 4317 Ramsey St., Fayetteville, NC 28311; Scott Summy, Carla B. Pickrel, Stephen Johnson, Jason Julius & Brett Land of Baron & Budd, P.C. at 3102 Oak Lawn Avenue, Suite 1100, Dallas, TX 75219-4281; Philip F. Cossich, Jr., Brandon J. Taylor, Christina M. Cossich, Andrew Cvitanovic & Luana N. Smith of Cossich, Sumich, Parsiola & Taylor, LLC at 8397 Highway 23, Suite 100, Belle Chasse, LA 70037; Daniel L. Ring & Tyler D. Alfermann of MAYER BROWN LLP at 71 South Wacker Drive, Chicago, IL 60606; Peter Condron of CROWELL & MORING at 1001 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Washington, D.C. 20004-259; Heidi Levine of SIDLEY AUSTIN LLP at One South Dearborn Street, Chicago, IL 60603; Melanie B. Dubis & Charles Raynal of PARKER POE ADAMS & BERNSTEIN LLP at 301 Fayetteville Street, Suite 400, Raleigh, NC 27601; John Wellschlager of DLA PIPER LLP (US) at The Marbury Building, 6224 Smith Avenue, Baltimore, MD 21209-3600; Michael L. Carpenter of GRAY LAYTON KERSH SOLOMON FURR & SMITH, P.A. at Post Office Box 2636, Gastonia, North Carolina 28053-2636; Jonathan I. Handler & Keith H. Bensten of DAY PITNEY LLP at One Federal Street, 29th Floor, Boston, MA 02110; Jonathan Blakley of GORDON REES SCULLY MANSUKHANI, LLP at One North Franklin, Suite 800, Chicago, IL 60606; John Parker & Oliver Twaddell of GOLDBERG SEGALLA LLP at 711 Third Avenue, Suite 1900, New York, NC 10017; Kat Hacker of BARTLIT BECK LLP at 1801 Wewatta, Suite 1200, Denver, Colorado 80202; Kurt D. Weaver of WOMBLE BOND DICKSON (US) LLP at 555 Fayetteville Street, Suite 1100, Raleigh, NC 27601; Kirk G. Warner, Clifton L. Brinson & Addie K.S. Ries of SMITH, ANDERSON, BLOUNT, DORSETT, MITCHELL & JERNIGAN, L.L.P., Post Office Box 2611, Raleigh, North Carolina 27602-2611; David R. Erickson & Brent Dwerlkotte of SHOOK, HARDY & BACON L.L.P. at 2555 Grand Blvd., Kansas City, MO 64108; Keith E. Smith of GREENBERG TRAURIG, LLP at Three Logan Square, 1717 Arch Street, Suite 400, Philadelphia, PA 19103; Ethan R. Ware of WILLIAMS MULLEN at P. O. Box 8116, Columbia, SC 29202. (Stouch, L.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 11/17/2023.] | |
Friday, October 20, 2023 | ||
Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding1 Notice of Removal. (Sellers, N.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 11/17/2023.] | ||
Monday, October 16, 2023 | ||
7 | 7 Notice regarding1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Counsel, J. Scott Flowers of Hutchens Law Firm LLP at 4317 Ramsey St., Fayetteville, NC 28311; Scott Summy, Carla B. Pickrel, Stephen Johnson, Jason Julius & Brett Land of Baron & Budd, P.C. at 3102 Oak Lawn Avenue, Suite 1100, Dallas, TX 75219-4281; Philip F. Cossich, Jr., Brandon J. Taylor, Christina M. Cossich, Andrew Cvitanovic & Luana N. Smith of Cossich, Sumich, Parsiola & Taylor, LLC at 8397 Highway 23, Suite 100, Belle Chasse, LA 70037; Daniel L. Ring & Tyler D. Alfermann of MAYER BROWN LLP at 71 South Wacker Drive, Chicago, IL 60606; Peter Condron of CROWELL & MORING at 1001 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Washington, D.C. 20004-259; Heidi Levine of SIDLEY AUSTIN LLP at One South Dearborn Street, Chicago, IL 60603; Melanie B. Dubis & Charles Raynal of PARKER POE ADAMS & BERNSTEIN LLP at 301 Fayetteville Street, Suite 400, Raleigh, NC 27601; John Wellschlager of DLA PIPER LLP (US) at The Marbury Building, 6224 Smith Avenue, Baltimore, MD 21209-3600; Michael L. Carpenter of GRAY LAYTON KERSH SOLOMON FURR & SMITH, P.A. at Post Office Box 2636, Gastonia, North Carolina 28053-2636; Jonathan I. Handler & Keith H. Bensten of DAY PITNEY LLP at One Federal Street, 29th Floor, Boston, MA 02110; Jonathan Blakley of GORDON REES SCULLY MANSUKHANI, LLP at One North Franklin, Suite 800, Chicago, IL 60606; John Parker & Oliver Twaddell of GOLDBERG SEGALLA LLP at 711 Third Avenue, Suite 1900, New York, NC 10017; Kat Hacker of BARTLIT BECK LLP at 1801 Wewatta, Suite 1200, Denver, Colorado 80202; Kurt D. Weaver of WOMBLE BOND DICKSON (US) LLP at 555 Fayetteville Street, Suite 1100, Raleigh, NC 27601; Kirk G. Warner, Clifton L. Brinson & Addie K.S. Ries of SMITH, ANDERSON, BLOUNT, DORSETT, MITCHELL & JERNIGAN, L.L.P., Post Office Box 2611, Raleigh, North Carolina 27602-2611; David R. Erickson & Brent Dwerlkotte of SHOOK, HARDY & BACON L.L.P. at 2555 Grand Blvd., Kansas City, MO 64108; Keith E. Smith of GREENBERG TRAURIG, LLP at Three Logan Square, 1717 Arch Street, Suite 400, Philadelphia, PA 19103; Keith E. Smith of GREENBERG TRAURIG, LLP at Three Logan Square, 1717 Arch Street, Suite 400, Philadelphia, PA 19103; Ethan R. Ware of WILLIAMS MULLEN at P. O. Box 8116, Columbia, SC 29202 mailed via US Mail on 10/16/2023. (Rudd, D.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 11/17/2023.] | |
6 | 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding1 Notice of Removal, filed by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP. (Blake, Christopher) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 11/17/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, October 10, 2023 | ||
5 | 5 Notice filed by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP regarding1 Notice of Removal, (Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet) . (Blake, Christopher) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 11/17/2023.] | |
4 | 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by Tyco Fire Products, LP identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Control International plc for Tyco Fire Products, LP. (Blake, Christopher) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 11/17/2023.] | |
3 | 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Chemguard, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Control International plc for Chemguard, Inc.. (Blake, Christopher) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 11/17/2023.] | |
2 | 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Christopher J. Blake on behalf of Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP. (Blake, Christopher) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 11/17/2023.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Tyco Fire Products, LP, Chemguard, Inc. from New Hanover Superior Court, case number 23-CVS-2879. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCEDC-7305055), filed by Tyco Fire Products, LP, Chemguard, Inc.. (Blake, Christopher) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 11/17/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A-New Hanover County Superior Court filings, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |