McGarvey v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-05830 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1442 Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Nov 14, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Missouri Western, 4:23-cv-00748 |
Last checked: Sunday May 12, 2024 5:01 AM EDT |
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC
|
|
Defendant
E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company
974 Centre Road
Wilmington, DE 19805 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corp
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Brenda McGarvey
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, November 17, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Fri 11/17 3:29 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Missouri Western (associated as of 11/14/2023), 4:23-cv-00748, McGarvey v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-05830-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
8 | 8
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Fri 11/17 3:26 PM
Case transferred in from District of Missouri Western; Case Number 4:23-cv-00748. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Tuesday, November 14, 2023 | ||
7 | 7 MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER, from Tiffaney D Pete, Clerk of the Panel, transferring case to District of South Carolina to be included in MDL No. 2873. Signed on 11/14/2023. Case electronically transferred. (Houston, Kiambu) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 11/17/2023.] | |
Wednesday, October 25, 2023 | ||
6 | 6 *** THIS DOCKET WAS ENTERED IN ERROR*** RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 12/22/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 1/5/2024 01:30 PM in Courtroom 7B, Kansas City (SRB) before District Judge Stephen R. Bough. Signed on 10/25/2023 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Borneman, Sara) Modified on 10/26/2023 (Borneman, Sara). [Transferred from Missouri Western on 11/17/2023.] | |
5 | 5 Before the Court is a Joint Stipulation Extending Time to Answer. (Doc. #4.) For good cause shown, the motion is GRANTED. If the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation declines to transfer this action to the In re Aqueous Film-Forming Foams Products Liability multi-district litigation, all defendants shall have through and including the 28th day after such disposition by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed on 10/25/2023 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Borneman, Sara) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 11/17/2023.] | |
4 | 4 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation Extending Time to Answer by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP. (Stubbs, Kara) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 11/17/2023.] | |
Thursday, October 19, 2023 | ||
3 | 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director.(Woods, Gloria) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 11/17/2023.] | |
Att: 1 MAP General Order | ||
Wednesday, October 18, 2023 | ||
2 | 2 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Kara Trouslot Stubbs on behalf of Defendants Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP, as successor-in-interest to The Ansul Co..(Stubbs, Kara) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 11/17/2023.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County, case number 2316-CV19551, filed by Kara Trouslot Stubbs. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-8675074.(Stubbs, Kara) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 11/17/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - State Court File |