Murphy et al v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-05917 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1391 Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Nov 17, 2023 |
Case in other court: | West Virginia Northern, 3:23-cv-00227 |
Last checked: Thursday May 16, 2024 6:23 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
successor-in-interest to The Ansul Company One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
EI Dupont De Nemours & Company
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment CO
|
|
Plaintiff
Trisha Ginley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Melanie Kanatus
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Becky Miller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joshua Murphy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kaitlyn Burtt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Teressa Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sean Snider
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dr Amanda Thomas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kristal Triggs
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, July 02, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 07/02 11:47 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Melanie Kanatus, Amanda Thomas, Deborah Hilliard, Amy Louise, Jewell Mosby, Christy Rogers, Shelva Winfield, Malisa Butler, Marcus Chichester, Dawn Cookus, Annette Cooper, Robert Eaton, Margaret Grabill, Marcus Hilliard, Vincent Hosby, Catherine Hummer, William Luther, Morgan McCardell, Stephanie Mongan, Patrick Moran, Charles Pinckney, Tony Robinson, Heather Scheuch, Linda Schmidt, Garland See, Mark Smithmeyer, Irwin Snow, Shannon Spiker, John Stamat, Gary Stanley, Jonathan Taylor, Anne Walsh, John Whitcomb, Bernard WolfAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-02347-RMG, 2:21-cv-03882-RMG, 2:23-cv-05917-RMG(Skinner, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Sunday, November 19, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Sun 11/19 4:27 PM
Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Northern; Case Number 3:23-cv-00227. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Friday, November 17, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Sun 11/19 4:46 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: West Virginia Northern (associated as of 11/17/2023), 3:23-cv-00227, Murphy et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-05917-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
3 | 3 CERTIFIED COPY OF JPML CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-161) - 1 action(s) re: pldg. ( 2177 in MDL No. 2873, 1 in WVN/3:23-cv-00227) Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Clerk of the Panel Tiffaney D. Pete on 11/17/2023. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2873, WVN/3:23-cv-00227. (je) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 11/19/2023.] | |
Case transferred to District of District of South Carolina re MDL 2873. Entire Case file electronically transmitted. (je) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 11/19/2023.] | ||
Wednesday, November 01, 2023 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against 3M Company (F/K/A Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Co.); Buckeye Fire Equipment Co.; Chemguard; The Chemours Co., LLC; E.I. Dupont De Nemours & Co.; National Foam, Inc.; and Tyco Fire Products L.P., successor-in-interest to The Ansul Company, filed by Joshua Murphy; Teressa Smith; Melanie Kanatus, Executrix of the Estate of Kelly Kanatus; Sean Snider; Becky Miller, Executrix of the Estate of Kenneth Ryan; Amanda Thomas, on behalf of J.S., a minor; Kaitlyn Burtt, Adminstratix of the Estate of Tina Frame; Kristal Triggs; and Trisha Ginley. Filing Fee $402 - Receipt #AWVNDC-3817822.(je) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 11/19/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |