Lovell v. Chemguard, Inc. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-05955 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Nov 20, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Texas Northern, 3:23-cv-02400 |
Last checked: Saturday May 18, 2024 5:25 AM EDT |
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
Raytheon Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
|
Defendant
E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
John Doe Defendants 1-49
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Angus Fire
|
|
Defendant
AGC Inc
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemical Americas, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Gary Lovell
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, November 21, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Tue 11/21 12:17 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
7 | 7
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Tue 11/21 8:25 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Northern Texas (associated as of 11/20/2023), 3:23-cv-02400, Lovell v. Chemguard, Inc. et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-05955-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
6 | 6
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Tue 11/21 8:15 AM
Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:23-cv-02400. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Thursday, November 16, 2023 | ||
5 | 5 Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-160): The JPML has issued the attached order in MDL 2873, and that order has now been filed in the District of South Carolina. (oyh) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 11/21/2023.] | |
Friday, November 03, 2023 | ||
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC ORDER - Before the Court is Defendants Tyco Fire Products, L.P. and Chemguard, Inc.'s unopposed letter motion requesting an extension of time to file or respond to Plaintiff's Original Petition (the "Motion"). Doc. No. 3. Upon consideration of the same, the Court GRANTS the Motion in part and DENIES it in part. Tyco Fire Products, L.P. and Chemguard, Inc.'s SHALL FILE an answer or respond to Plaintiff's Original Petition no later than December 1, 2023. Defendants MAY FILE a renewed motion to extend the deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Original Petition at a later date if the potential transfer of this case remains unresolved. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 11/3/2023) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 11/21/2023.] | |
Thursday, November 02, 2023 | ||
3 | 3 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Chemguard Inc, Tyco Fire Products LP (Loh, Peter) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 11/21/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Proposed Stipulation and Order Extending Time to Answer | ||
Monday, October 30, 2023 | ||
2 | 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (sxf) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 11/21/2023.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP. (Filing fee $402; receipt number ATXNDC-14136758) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Loh, Peter) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 11/21/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A-1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) A-2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) A-3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) A-4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) A-5, | ||
Att: 6 Cover Sheet /Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 7 Cover Sheet Supplement /Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) D - Certificate of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement | ||
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Chemguard Inc, Tyco Fire Products LP. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (see document1 - 8 for image) (sxf) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 11/21/2023.] |