Original Case: 2:23-cv-00417

Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cv-04149
Typecivil / usa as party
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Nov 20, 2023
Terminated:Dec 12, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 13, 2023 7:03 AM MST
Defendant - Appellee
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant - Appellee
SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Plaintiff - Appellant
JERRY ERNEST LOPEZ
Represented By
Jerry Ernest Lopez
contact info

GPO Dec 12 2023
[11051917] Default. Procedural termination without judicial action by Clerk of the Court. [23-4149]

Docket last updated: 12/13/2023 7:03 AM MST
Monday, November 20, 2023
[11046273] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 11/17/2023. Notice of appearance due on 12/20/2023 for Jerry Ernest Lopez. 23-4149
Related: [-]
Att: 1 15 pgs Preliminary Record
Att: 2 1 pgs General Docketing Letter - Pro Se
2 pgs [11046459] Jurisdiction challenged. Response due on 12/04/2023 for Jerry Ernest Lopez. See order for additional information. 23-4149
Related: [-]