Original Case: 1:22-cv-00773

Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cv-01364
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Case Filed:Nov 20, 2023
Terminated:Sep 19, 2024
Last checked: Friday Sep 20, 2024 4:03 AM MDT
Defendant - Appellee
ANDREW HARTMAN, in his official capacity
Represented By
Lauren Davison
Office of the Attorney General for the State of Colorado
contact info
Jack Davy Patten III
Office of the Attorney General for the State of Colorado
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
ANNE KELLY, in her official capacity
Represented By
Colin James Mayberry
Boulder County Attorney
contact info
Lauren Davison
Office of the Attorney General for the State of Colorado
contact info
Jack Davy Patten III
Office of the Attorney General for the State of Colorado
contact info
David Evan Hughes
Boulder County Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
EMILY COHEN
Represented By
Emily Cohen
contact info

GPO Sep 19 2024
[11122049] Dismissed (jurisdictional defect); Terminated on the merits after submissions without oral hearing; Written, signed, unpublished; Judges Holmes, Moritz (authoring) and Carson. Mandate to issue. [23-1364]

Docket last updated: 09/20/2024 4:03 AM MDT
Monday, November 20, 2023
[11046235] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 11/18/2023 Notice of appearance due on 12/20/2023 for Emily Cohen. Notice of appearance due on 12/04/2023 for Andrew Hartman and Anne Kelly. 23-1364
Related: [-]
Att: 1 19 pgs Main Document
Att: 2 2 pgs General Docketing Letter - Pro Se
20 pgs [11046479] Amended notice of appeal filed. 23-1364
Related: [-]