Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-pcd-30830
Typeprivate civil diversity / private
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Case Filed:Nov 21, 2023
Terminated:Jul 02, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 03, 2024 5:25 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
BP Exploration & Production, Incorporated
Represented By
Thomas Pollard Diaz
Liskow & Lewis, A.P.L.C.
contact info
Rex Manning
Kirkland & Ellis, L.L.P.
contact info
Kristopher Scott Ritter
Kirkland & Ellis, L.L.P.
contact info
Devin Chase Reid
Liskow & Lewis, A.P.L.C.
contact info
Adrianne Katrine Jakola
Kirkland & Ellis, L.L.P.
contact info
George W. Hicks Jr.
Kirkland & Ellis, L.L.P.
contact info
Aaron Lloyd Nielson
Kirkland & Ellis, L.L.P.
contact info
Russell Keith Jarrett
Liskow & Lewis, A.P.L.C.
contact info
Charles B. Wilmore
Liskow & Lewis, A.P.L.C.
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
BP America Production Company
Represented By
Thomas Pollard Diaz
Liskow & Lewis, A.P.L.C.
contact info
Rex Manning
Kirkland & Ellis, L.L.P.
contact info
Kristopher Scott Ritter
Kirkland & Ellis, L.L.P.
contact info
Devin Chase Reid
Liskow & Lewis, A.P.L.C.
contact info
Adrianne Katrine Jakola
Kirkland & Ellis, L.L.P.
contact info
George W. Hicks Jr.
Kirkland & Ellis, L.L.P.
contact info
Aaron Lloyd Nielson
Kirkland & Ellis, L.L.P.
contact info
Russell Keith Jarrett
Liskow & Lewis, A.P.L.C.
contact info
Charles B. Wilmore
Liskow & Lewis, A.P.L.C.
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
BP, P.L.C.
Represented By
Thomas Pollard Diaz
Liskow & Lewis, A.P.L.C.
contact info
Rex Manning
Kirkland & Ellis, L.L.P.
contact info
Kristopher Scott Ritter
Kirkland & Ellis, L.L.P.
contact info
Devin Chase Reid
Liskow & Lewis, A.P.L.C.
contact info
Adrianne Katrine Jakola
Kirkland & Ellis, L.L.P.
contact info
George W. Hicks Jr.
Kirkland & Ellis, L.L.P.
contact info
Aaron Lloyd Nielson
Kirkland & Ellis, L.L.P.
contact info
Russell Keith Jarrett
Liskow & Lewis, A.P.L.C.
contact info
Charles B. Wilmore
Liskow & Lewis, A.P.L.C.
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Transocean Holdings, L.L.C.
Represented By
Kerry J. Miller
Fishman Haygood, L.L.P.
contact info
Paul Charest Thibodeaux
Fishman Haygood, L.L.P.
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Transocean Deepwater, Incorporated
Represented By
Kerry J. Miller
Fishman Haygood, L.L.P.
contact info
Paul Charest Thibodeaux
Fishman Haygood, L.L.P.
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Incorporated
Represented By
Kerry J. Miller
Fishman Haygood, L.L.P.
contact info
Paul Charest Thibodeaux
Fishman Haygood, L.L.P.
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Halliburton Energy Services, Incorporated
Represented By
Robert Alan York
Reed Smith, L.L.P.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Dawarren Zykeith Williams
Represented By
Paul Allen Dominick
Maynard Nexsen, P.C.
contact info
Douglas M. Schmidt
contact info
Timothy John Falcon
Falcon Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/03/2024 5:25 AM CDT
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
3 pgs PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Dawarren Zykeith Williams 23-30830 (WMJ)
Related: [-]