Original Case: 2:21-cv-00022

Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-pcf-11184
Typeprivate civil federal / private
Nature of Suit376 Other Statutes - Qui Tam (31 U.S.C. § 3729(a))
Case Filed:Nov 21, 2023
Terminated:Feb 26, 2025
Last checked: Monday May 05, 2025 3:07 PM CDT
Amicus Curiae
State of Texas
Represented By
Kateland R. Jackson
Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Incorporated
Represented By
Danny Scot Ashby
O'Melveny & Myers, L.L.P.
contact info
Leah Godesky
O'Melveny & Myers, L.L.P.
contact info
Anton Metlitsky
O'Melveny & Myers, L.L.P.
contact info
L. Nicole Allan
O'Melveny & Myers, L.L.P.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Alex Doe, Relator
Represented By
Heather Gebelin Hacker
Hacker Stephens, L.L.P.
contact info
Andrew Bowman Stephens
Hacker Stephens, L.L.P.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 3:07 PM CDT
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
4 pgs UNITED STATES CIVIL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Incorporated 23-11184 (AS)
Related: [-]