Original Case: 1:19-cv-00349

Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-usc-50856
Typeunited states civil / united states
Nature of Suit899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Case Filed:Nov 24, 2023
Terminated:Jul 12, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jul 15, 2024 4:59 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
Merrick Garland, U.S. Attorney General
Represented By
Bradley Hinshelwood
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Michael Lee Knapp I
Attorney Michael Knapp
contact info
Michael Fraser Knapp
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
United States Department of Justice
Represented By
Bradley Hinshelwood
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Michael Lee Knapp I
Attorney Michael Knapp
contact info
Michael Fraser Knapp
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Steven Dettelbach, in his official capacity as Director of the Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms, and Explosives
Represented By
Bradley Hinshelwood
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Michael Lee Knapp I
Attorney Michael Knapp
contact info
Michael Fraser Knapp
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms, and Explosives
Represented By
Bradley Hinshelwood
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Michael Lee Knapp I
Attorney Michael Knapp
contact info
Michael Fraser Knapp
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Michael Cargill
Represented By
Richard Abbott Samp
New Civil Liberties Alliance
contact info
Jonathan F. Mitchell
contact info
Sheng Tao Li
New Civil Liberties Alliance
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/15/2024 4:59 AM CDT
Friday, November 24, 2023
2 pgs US CIVIL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Michael Cargill 23-50856 (MFY)
Related: [-]