Original Case: 2:22-cv-06215

Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-pcd-30833
Typeprivate civil diversity / private
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Case Filed:Nov 27, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 29, 2023 2:16 AM CST
Defendant - Appellant
Interstate Fire & Casualty Company
Represented By
Sidney W. Degan III
Degan, Blanchard & Nash, A.P.L.C.
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
Independent Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By
Sidney W. Degan III
Degan, Blanchard & Nash, A.P.L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
LMP Properties, L.L.C.
Represented By
Rajan Pandit
Pandit Law Firm, L.L.C.
contact info
Tristan Gregory Gruspier
Taylor Porter Brooks & Phillips, L.L.P.
contact info
Matthew Martin Mize
Robichaux, Mize, Wadsack & Richardson, L.L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Porche Investments, L.L.C.
Represented By
Rajan Pandit
Pandit Law Firm, L.L.C.
contact info
Tristan Gregory Gruspier
Taylor Porter Brooks & Phillips, L.L.P.
contact info
Matthew Martin Mize
Robichaux, Mize, Wadsack & Richardson, L.L.C.
contact info

GPO Jun 14 2024
UNPUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [23-30833 Reversed and Remanded ] Judge: CH , Judge: JEG , Judge: SAH Mandate issue date is 07/08/2024 [23-30833]

Docket last updated: 11/29/2023 2:16 AM CST
Monday, November 27, 2023
3 pgs PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Independent Specialty Insurance Company and Interstate Fire & Casualty Company 23-30833 (RCB)
Related: [-]