Elad v. Truist Bank et al
Delaware District Court | |
Judge: | Gregory B Williams |
Case #: | 1:23-cv-01360 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Nov 29, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jun 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday May 27, 2024 4:34 AM EDT |
Defendant
Judge Vivian L. Medinilla
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Justice Gary F. Traynor
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Colleen Redmond
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sr. Michael E. Kozikowski
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jessica Hepburn
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ron Fiorvanati
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Truist Bank
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Elizabeth A. Sloan
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sheriff Scott T. Phillips
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ballard Spahr LLP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
McCabe, Weisberg & Conway, P.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Brittany M. Guisini
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lisa G. Fontello
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Judge Eric M. Davis
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Joshua Collins
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Janet Z. Charlton
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Judge Danielle J. Brennan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph B. Elad
Sui Juris 2700 Philadelphia Pike
Claymont, DE 19703 |
GPO
Jun 17 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION re: Pending Motions. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 6/17/2024. (lnb) |
Docket last updated: 09/12/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
65 | 65
appeal
- - Notice of Docketing ROA - 3rd Circuit
Mon 07/15 1:10 PM
NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA for the Third Circuit re64 Notice of Appeal to the Third Circuit filed by Joseph B. Elad. USCA Case Number 24-2242 USCA Case Manager: James (DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND CAN ONLY BE VIEWED BY COURT STAFF) (jk) |
|
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
64 | 64
appeal
- NOTICE OF APPEAL - Third Circuit
Mon 07/08 4:35 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Third Circuit of D.I.62 Memorandum Opinion and D.I.63 Order. Appeal filed by Joseph B. Elad. Filing fee $605, receipt number 2766. (oam) |
|
appeal
USCA Appeal Fees Received - Third Circuit
Mon 07/08 4:37 PM
USCA Appeal Fees received: $605, receipt number 2766 for D.I.64 Notice of Appeal to the Third Circuit filed by Joseph B. Elad. (oam) |