Louisiana Western District Court
Judge:S Maurice Hicks, Jr
Referred: Mark L Hornsby
Case #: 5:23-cv-01685
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12132 Americans with Disabilities Act - Discrimination
Case Filed:Nov 21, 2023
Last checked: Sunday May 19, 2024 3:54 AM CDT
Defendant
Thrifty Discount Liquor & Wines
Represented By
Blair Boyd
Kean Miller (shv)
contact info
Michael D Lowe
Kean Miller (shv)
contact info
Defendant
Roland P Toups, II
Represented By
Blair Boyd
Kean Miller (shv)
contact info
Michael D Lowe
Kean Miller (shv)
contact info
Defendant
Elizabeth Patterson
Represented By
Blair Boyd
Kean Miller (shv)
contact info
Michael D Lowe
Kean Miller (shv)
contact info
Plaintiff
Gilbert Lau
136 Madison Ave 6th Fl
New York, NY 10016
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Jane Doe
Terminated: 02/15/2024
Represented By
Michael D Lowe
Kean Miller (shv)
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
44 44 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 04/29 10:17 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re40 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge re36 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,, Order on Motion for Extension,, filed by Thrifty Liquor No 10 L L C. (aty,Lowe, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
43 43 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 04/16 3:57 PM
ORDER granting41 Motion for Electronic Notification by Email. Plaintiff shall contact the court's clerk and complete any necessary forms that the clerk may require to receive court orders via the email listed in the motion. Defense counsel are directed to transmit future correspondence and/or court filings to Plaintiff at the same email address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 4/16/2025. (crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent to Receive Notice Electronically Form
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
42 42 notice Notice of Motion Setting Tue 04/15 4:11 PM
NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding:40 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge re36 Order. Motions referred to Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr. (crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
41 41 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 04/15 4:06 PM
MOTION for Electronic Notification by Email to Plaintiff by Gilbert Lau. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/15/2025.(crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
40 40 motion Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Judge Tue 04/15 4:04 PM
APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge re36 Order by Gilbert Lau.(crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - F,
Att: 2 Memorandum / Brief,
Att: 3 Envelope
Monday, March 31, 2025
39 39 notice Notice of Motion Setting Mon 03/31 2:09 PM
NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding:38 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motions referred to Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr. (crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
38 38 motion Summary Judgment Mon 03/31 1:49 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Thrifty Liquor No 10 L L C.(aty,Lowe, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Statement of material facts,
Att: 2 Proposed order,
Att: 3 Memorandum / Brief,
Att: 4 Affidavit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit
Monday, February 24, 2025
37 37 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 02/24 3:21 PM
ANSWER to33 Amended Complaint by Thrifty Liquor No 10 L L C.(aty,Lowe, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
36 36 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion for Extension (Other) Fri 02/21 11:04 AM
ORDER denying35 Motion for Permission for the U S Marshal Service to Serve Subpoenas; denying35 Motion for Extension. The court has already extended the discovery deadline once Doc.30 , and the current deadline requires that all discovery be complete by March 3, 2025. The requested extension would also require moving the dispositive motion deadline, which the court is unwilling to do. Plaintiff has not shown good cause for his delay in requesting these subpoenas and depositions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 2/21/2025. (crt,Keller, J)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
35 35 motion Miscellaneous Relief Extension (Other) Thu 02/20 2:09 PM
MOTION for Permission for the U S Marshal Service to Serve Subpoenas, MOTION for Extension of Discovery Deadline (Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/19/2025.) by Gilbert Lau. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby.(crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Subpoenas,
Att: 2 Deposition of Witness List and Parties,
Att: 3 Amended Notices of Deposition,
Att: 4 Envelope
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
34 34 misc Affidavit Tue 02/18 1:40 PM
AFFIDAVIT re33 Amended Complaint by Gilbert Lau.(crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Monday, February 10, 2025
33 33 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 02/10 1:09 PM
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Elizabeth Patterson, Thrifty Discount Liquor & Wines, Roland P Toups, II filed by Gilbert Lau.(crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits
32 32 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Mon 02/10 1:06 PM
ORDER granting31 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 2/10/2025. (crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
31 31 motion Amend/Correct Mon 02/10 9:34 AM
MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Complaint by Gilbert Lau. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/7/2025.(crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Second Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Proposed Exhibits,
Att: 3 Affirmation of Service,
Att: 4 Envelope
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
30 30 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension (Other) Wed 11/20 2:34 PM
ORDER granting29 Motion for Extension. Amended Pleadings due by 3/3/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 3/31/2025. After any dispositive motions are resolved, the court will consider the need to issue additional scheduling deadlines related to a trial and pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 11/20/2024. (crt,Keller, J)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
29 29 motion Extension (Other) Thu 11/14 3:20 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery with opposition by Gilbert Lau. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/13/2024.(crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix A,
Att: 2 Exhibit A Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's First Request for Interragatories,
Att: 3 Exhibit B Email to Counsel Regarding Consent,
Att: 4 Exhibit C Defendant's Request for Production of Documents,
Att: 5 Appendix A - I,
Att: 6 Affirmation of Service,
Att: 7 Envelope
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
28 28 notice Notice (Other) Wed 09/18 10:17 AM
NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant by Gilbert Lau.(crt,Bunting, M)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Monday, September 09, 2024
27 27 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 09/09 10:19 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Thrifty Liquor No 10 L L C. (aty,Lowe, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
26 26 3 pgs order Memorandum Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 08/27 4:55 PM
MEMORANDUM ORDER - Amended Pleadings due by 9/13/2024, Discovery deadline 12/6/2024, Dispositive Motions due by 2/7/2025. See PDF of document for further instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/27/2024. (crt,Bunting, M)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
25 25 notice Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included) Mon 08/26 9:44 AM
NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re:24 Answer to Amended Complaint, sent to Michael D Lowe on behalf of Thrifty Liquor No 10 L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 9/9/2024. (crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
24 24 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 08/26 9:21 AM
ANSWER to3 Amended Complaint by Thrifty Liquor No 10 L L C.(aty,Lowe, Michael) Modified to correct filer on 8/26/2024 (Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
23 23 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 08/07 3:42 PM
ORDER granting13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. All of Plaintiff Gilbert Lau's claims against Elizabeth Patterson and Roland P. Toups II are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Plaintiff's claim of prima facie tort and respondeat superior claim against Thrifty Liquor No. 10, L.L.C., Elizabeth Patterson, and Roland P. Toups II are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Plaintiff's claims under the American with Disabilities Act and the Louisiana Employment Discrimination Law against Thrifty Liquor No. 10, L.L.C. remain. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 8/7/2024. (crt,Keifer, K)
Related: [-]
22 22 7 pgs order Memorandum Ruling Wed 08/07 3:38 PM
MEMORANDUM RULING re13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Roland P Toups, II, Thrifty Discount Liquor & Wines, Elizabeth Patterson. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 8/7/2024. (crt,Keifer, K)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
21 21 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 03/06 2:52 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Elizabeth Patterson, Thrifty Discount Liquor & Wines, Roland P Toups, II. (aty,Lowe, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
20 20 misc Affidavit Mon 03/04 1:49 PM
AFFIDAVIT re18 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion by Gilbert Lau. (crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
19 19 service Certificate of Service Thu 02/29 4:58 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gilbert Lau re16 Notice of Change of Address. (crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
18 18 11 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Thu 02/29 4:58 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Gilbert Lau. (crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
17 17 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension (Other) Fri 02/23 2:41 PM
ORDER granting15 Motion for Extension. Plaintiff is granted until March 22, 2024 to file proof of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 2/23/2024. (crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
16 16 notice Notice of Change of Address Thu 02/22 3:26 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Gilbert Lau. (crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
15 15 motion Extension (Other) Thu 02/22 11:03 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Perfect Service by Gilbert Lau. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/21/2024. (crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of Motion Setting Fri 02/16 9:24 AM
NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding:13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Motions referred to Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr. (crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2024
13 13 motion Dismiss Thu 02/15 4:26 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.Pro.12(B)(6) by Jane Doe, Thrifty Discount Liquor & Wines, Roland P Toups, II.(Attorney Michael D Lowe added to party Jane Doe(pty:dft), Attorney Michael D Lowe added to party Thrifty Discount Liquor & Wines(pty:dft), Attorney Michael D Lowe added to party Roland P Toups, II(pty:dft))(aty,Lowe, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum / Brief,
Att: 2 Proposed order
Friday, February 02, 2024
12 12 misc Mail Returned Fri 02/02 3:38 PM
MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Mail sent to Gilbert Lau, 1007 Gould Dr Ste 1 Bossier City, LA 71111, re:9 Report and Recommendations, returned marked: Return to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed, Unable to Forward. (crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Report and Recommendations Fri 02/02 9:55 AM
MEMORANDUM ORDER withdrawing9 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 2/2/2024. (crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 02/01 10:01 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gilbert Lau via USM. Thrifty Discount Liquor & Wines served on 1/25/2024, answer due 2/15/2024; Roland P Toups, II served on 1/25/2024, answer due 2/15/2024. (crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
9 9 motion Report and Recommendations Wed 01/24 1:29 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re3 Amended Complaint filed by Gilbert Lau. It is recommended that this civil action be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute and failure to comply with a court order. Objections to R&R due by 2/7/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 1/24/2024. (crt,Keller, J)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
8 8 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 12/06 2:59 PM
ORDER granting7 Motion for Service by US Marshal. Plaintiff must byDecember 21, 2023 deliver to the clerk of court a completed form USM-285, summons, and copy of the complaint and amended complaint for each defendant he wishes to serve. The clerk will forward the papers to the marshal for service.Failure to submit service papers for a defendant may result in dismissal of that defendant for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 12/6/2023. (crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 USM 285 Form
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
7 7 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 12/05 3:13 PM
MOTION for Service by U S Marshal re1 Complaint,3 Amended Complaint by Gilbert Lau. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/5/2023. (crt,Bunting, M)
Related: [-]
6 6 2 pgs order Memorandum Order Tue 12/05 3:11 PM
MEMORANDUM ORDER - Plaintiff must complete service and file evidence of service within 90 days of the filing of his complaint, which will be 2/19/24. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this civil action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 12/5/2023. (crt,Bunting, M)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2023
5 5 service Summons Issued - All (Form Included) Thu 11/30 2:42 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Thrifty Discount Liquor & Wines, Roland P Toups, II. (crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 11/30 2:40 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 11/30/2023. (crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 11/29 10:55 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jane Doe, Thrifty Discount Liquor & Wines, Roland P Toups, II with Jury Demand filed by Gilbert Lau.(crt,Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 11/29 10:50 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Gilbert Lau. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/21/2023. (crt,Miletello, A) (Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (11/29/2023) Proposed order
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 11/29 10:49 AM
COMPLAINT against Jane Doe, Thrifty Discount Liquor & Wines, Roland P Toups, II with Jury Demand filed by Gilbert Lau.(crt,Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed summons/writ
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 11/29 11:05 AM
CASE Assigned to Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]