Original Case: 4:22-cv-00064

Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cv-05129
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Case Filed:Nov 28, 2023
Terminated:Oct 03, 2024
Last checked: Friday Oct 04, 2024 5:05 AM MDT
Defendant
JJG PROPERTIES, LLC
Represented By
Anita K. Anthony
Mullican & Hart
contact info
Colleen Morris
Holden Litigation
contact info
Steven E. Holden
Holden & Montejano
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
FANTASIA HOOKAH LOUNGE, LLC
Represented By
Jon Douglas Starr
Starr, Begin & King
contact info
Bradley Edward Bowlby
Starr, Begin & King
contact info
William G. James
Riggs, Abney, Neal, Turpen, Orbison & Lewis
contact info
Sharon K. Parker
Riggs, Abney, Neal, Turpen, Orbison & Lewis
contact info
Thomas Martin Askew
Riggs, Abney, Neal, Turpen, Orbison & Lewis
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
MOHAMMAD ZAKIE ALSHAMMAT
Represented By
Jon Douglas Starr
Starr, Begin & King
contact info
Bradley Edward Bowlby
Starr, Begin & King
contact info
William G. James
Riggs, Abney, Neal, Turpen, Orbison & Lewis
contact info
Sharon K. Parker
Riggs, Abney, Neal, Turpen, Orbison & Lewis
contact info
Thomas Martin Askew
Riggs, Abney, Neal, Turpen, Orbison & Lewis
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
JORGE HERNANDEZ
Represented By
William G. James
Riggs, Abney, Neal, Turpen, Orbison & Lewis
contact info
Sharon Kay Weaver
Riggs, Abney, Neal, Turpen, Orbison & Lewis
contact info
Thomas Martin Askew
Riggs, Abney, Neal, Turpen, Orbison & Lewis
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
NAUTILUS INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By
Douglas Matthew Kleeman
Phelps Dunbar
contact info
Amy E. Bradley-Waters
Pierce Couch Hendrickson Baysinger & Green
contact info

GPO Oct 03 2024
[11125860] Affirmed. Terminated on the merits after submissions without oral hearing. Written, signed, unpublished; Judges Phillips, Baldock and Federico (authoring judge). Mandate to issue. [23-5129]

Docket last updated: 10/04/2024 5:05 AM MDT
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
[11047727] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 11/28/2023 Docketing statement, transcript order form and notice of appearance due 12/12/2023 for Mohammad Zakie Alshammat, Fantasia Hookah Lounge, LLC and Jorge Hernandez. Notice of appearance and disclosure statement due on 12/12/2023 for Nautilus Insurance Company. 23-5129
Related: [-]
Att: 1 34 pgs Main Document
Att: 2 2 pgs General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil