Original Case: 1:22-cv-00266

Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cv-01370
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Case Filed:Nov 28, 2023
Terminated:Oct 01, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 02, 2024 3:12 AM MDT
Defendant - Appellee
THE VAIL CORPORATION
Represented By
Jessica P. Marsh
Williams Weese Pepple & Ferguson
contact info
Mairead K. Dolan
Williams Weese Pepple & Ferguson
contact info
Bronwyn H. Pepple
Williams Weese Pepple & Ferguson
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
DANIEL HERRICK
Represented By
Daniel Herrick
contact info

GPO Oct 01 2024
[11125120] Affirmed; Terminated on the merits after submissions without oral hearing; Written, signed, unpublished; Judges Tymkovich, Matheson and McHugh (authoring). Mandate to issue. [23-1370]

Docket last updated: 10/02/2024 3:12 AM MDT
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
[11047976] Fee paid in District Court on 11/28/2023. 23-1370
Related: [-]
[11047824] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 11/27/2023 Notice of appearance due on 12/28/2023 for Daniel Herrick, and Notice of appearance due on 12/12/2023 for The Vail Corporation. Disclosure statement due on 12/12/2023 for The Vail Corporation. Fee or ifp forms due 12/28/2023 for Daniel Herrick. 23-1370
Related: [-]
Att: 1 35 pgs Main Document
Att: 2 2 pgs General Docketing Letter - Pro Se
2 pgs [11047983] Jurisdictional review complete. Record on appeal 10th circuit due 12/19/2023. Appellant's brief due on 01/08/2024 for Daniel Herrick. 23-1370
Related: [-]