Original Case: 1:23-cv-02971

Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cv-01371
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Case Filed:Nov 28, 2023
Terminated:Jan 16, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Jan 18, 2024 1:21 AM MST
Defendant - Appellee
STATE OF OREGON
Plaintiff - Appellant
MEGAN KYTE
Represented By
Megan Kyte
contact info

GPO Jan 16 2024
[11059183] Affirmed;Terminated on the merits after submissions without oral hearing; Written, signed, unpublished. Judges Matheson, author; Briscoe and Eid. Mandate to issue. [23-1369, 23-1371]

Docket last updated: 01/18/2024 1:21 AM MST
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
[11048125] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 11/28/2023. Notice of appearance due on 12/28/2023 for Megan Kyte. 23-1371 --[Edited 12/01/2023 by LG]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 7 pgs Main Document
Att: 2 2 pgs General Docketing Letter - Pro Se