Vanyo et al v. The 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-06099 |
Nature of Suit | 245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Nov 28, 2023 |
Case in other court: | North Carolina Eastern, 5:23-cv-00639 |
Last checked: Sunday May 26, 2024 5:15 AM EDT |
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
The 3M Company
|
|
Defendant
Raytheon Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
|
Defendant
E I Dupont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
John Doe Defendants 1-49
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma U.S. Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Archroma Management LLC
Archroma Management LLC 4000 Monroe Rd.
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
AGC Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
William G. Cain
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pamela Vanyo
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 08/14 6:17 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Pamela Vanyo Without Prejudice Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-06099-RMG(Summy, Scott) |
|
Monday, December 04, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
service
Summons Issued
Mon 12/04 1:03 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
Friday, December 01, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Fri 12/01 3:57 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: North Carolina Eastern (associated as of 11/28/2023), 5:23-cv-00639, Vanyo et al v. The 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-06099-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
14 | 14
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Fri 12/01 3:41 PM
Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Eastern; Case Number 5:23-cv-00639. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Tuesday, November 28, 2023 | ||
13 | 13 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER regarding MDL No. 2873. Signed by Tiffaney D. Pete, Clerk of the Panel, on 11/28/2023. (McNally, Kimberly) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 12/1/2023.] | |
Case transferred to District of South Carolina. File transmitted electronically. (McNally, Kimberly) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 12/1/2023.] | ||
Tuesday, November 21, 2023 | ||
12 | 12 Letter to the court from Charles E. Raynal, IV regarding transfer of case. (McNally, Kimberly) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 12/1/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
11 | 11 Letter to the court from Melanie Black Dubis regarding transfer of case. (McNally, Kimberly) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 12/1/2023.] | |
Wednesday, November 15, 2023 | ||
10 | 10 ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer regarding 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding 1 Notice of Removal. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 11/15/2023. A copy of this Order was sent to counsel of record via US mail. (Collins, S) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 12/1/2023.] | |
Tuesday, November 14, 2023 | ||
Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding1 Notice of Removal. (Collins, S) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 12/1/2023.] | ||
Monday, November 13, 2023 | ||
9 | 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding1 Notice of Removal, filed by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP. (Blake, Christopher) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 12/1/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, November 08, 2023 | ||
8 | 8 Notice regarding1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Counsel, J. Scott Flowers of Hutchens Law Firm LLP at 4317 Ramsey St., Fayetteville, NC 28311; Scott Summy, Carla B. Pickrel, Cary McDougal, Jason Julius & Brett Land of Baron & Budd, P.C. at 3102 Oak Lawn Avenue, Suite 1100, Dallas, TX 75219-4281; Philip F. Cossich, Jr., Brandon J. Taylor, Christina M. Cossich, Andrew Cvitanovic & Luana N. Smith of Cossich, Sumich, Parsiola & Taylor, LLC at 8397 Highway 23, Suite 100, Belle Chasse, LA 70037; Daniel L. Ring & Tyler D. Alfermann of MAYER BROWN LLP at 71 South Wacker Drive, Chicago, IL 60606; Peter Condron of CROWELL & MORING at 1001 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Washington, D.C. 20004-259; Heidi Levine of SIDLEY AUSTIN LLP at One South Dearborn Street, Chicago, IL 60603; Melanie B. Dubis & Charles Raynal of PARKER POE ADAMS & BERNSTEIN LLP at 301 Fayetteville Street, Suite 400, Raleigh, NC 27601; John Wellschlager of DLA PIPER LLP (US) at The Marbury Building, 6224 Smith Avenue, Baltimore, MD 21209-3600; Michael L. Carpenter of GRAY LAYTON KERSH SOLOMON FURR & SMITH, P.A. at Post Office Box 2636, Gastonia, North Carolina 28053-2636; Jonathan I. Handler & Keith H. Bensten of DAY PITNEY LLP at One Federal Street, 29th Floor, Boston, MA 02110; Jonathan Blakley of GORDON REES SCULLY MANSUKHANI, LLP at One North Franklin, Suite 800, Chicago, IL 60606; John Parker & Oliver Twaddell of GOLDBERG SEGALLA LLP at 711 Third Avenue, Suite 1900, New York, NC 10017; Kat Hacker of BARTLIT BECK LLP at 1801 Wewatta, Suite 1200, Denver, Colorado 80202; Kurt D. Weaver of WOMBLE BOND DICKSON (US) LLP at 555 Fayetteville Street, Suite 1100, Raleigh, NC 27601; Kirk G. Warner, Clifton L. Brinson & Addie K.S. Ries of SMITH, ANDERSON, BLOUNT, DORSETT, MITCHELL & JERNIGAN, L.L.P., Post Office Box 2611, Raleigh, North Carolina 27602-2611; David R. Erickson & Brent Dwerlkotte of SHOOK, HARDY & BACON L.L.P. at 2555 Grand Blvd., Kansas City, MO 64108; Keith E. Smith of GREENBERG TRAURIG, LLP at Three Logan Square, 1717 Arch Street, Suite 400, Philadelphia, PA 19103; Keith E. Smith of GREENBERG TRAURIG, LLP at Three Logan Square, 1717 Arch Street, Suite 400, Philadelphia, PA 19103; Ethan R. Ware of WILLIAMS MULLEN at P. O. Box 8116, Columbia, SC 29202 mailed via US Mail on November 8, 2023. (Rudd, D.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 12/1/2023.] | |
7 | 7 Financial Disclosure Statement by Tyco Fire Products, LP identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Control International plc for Tyco Fire Products, LP. (Blake, Christopher) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 12/1/2023.] | |
Monday, November 06, 2023 | ||
6 | 6 Notice filed by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP regarding1 Notice of Removal, (Exhibit A to Notice of Removal - State Court pleadings) . (Blake, Christopher) Modified on 11/8/2023 to describe exhibit. (Rudd, D.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 12/1/2023.] | |
5 | 5 Financial Disclosure Statement by Tyco Fire Products, LP identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Control International plc for Tyco Fire Products, LP. (Blake, Christopher) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 12/1/2023.] | |
4 | 4 Notice filed by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP regarding1 Notice of Removal, (Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet) . (Blake, Christopher) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 12/1/2023.] | |
3 | 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Chemguard, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Control International plc for Chemguard, Inc.. (Blake, Christopher) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 12/1/2023.] | |
2 | 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Christopher J. Blake on behalf of Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP. (Blake, Christopher) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 12/1/2023.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP from Cumberland County Superior Court, case number 23-cv-5928. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCEDC-7344196), filed by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP. (Blake, Christopher) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 12/1/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |