Original Case: 1:23-cv-00612

Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cv-01374
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Case Filed:Nov 30, 2023
Terminated:Sep 16, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 17, 2024 2:56 AM MDT
Defendant - Appellee
UNITED STATES LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY, AKA United States Liability Insurance Group, AKA United States Liability Insurance
Represented By
Katia K. Conrad
Litchfield Cavo
contact info
Vincent J. Velardo
Litchfield Cavo
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
TRACI BRYAN, as assignee of ATR Limited, DBA Peak Tavern, AKA The Peak Tavern, AKA Irish House Lounge
Represented By
Alex Darin Kerr
Bradford Pelton
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 2:56 AM MDT
Thursday, November 30, 2023
[11048650] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: Docketing statement, transcript order form, docketing statement, and disclosure forms due 12/14/2023 for Traci Bryan. Disclosure statement and notice of appearance due on 12/14/2023 for United States Liability Insurance Company. 23-1374
Related: [-]
Att: 1 25 pgs Main Document
Att: 2 2 pgs General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil