Nevada District Court
Judge:Anne R Traum
Referred: Carla Baldwin
Case #: 3:23-cv-00620
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Dec 05, 2023

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, March 06, 2025
23 23 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Fri 03/07 10:32 AM
ORDER denying22 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO ADD A DEFENDANT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 3/6/2025. ( For Distribution by law library. ) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
22 22 motion Motion Leave to File Document/Excess Pages Wed 03/05 12:09 PM
MOTION for Leave to File to add Defendant by Plaintiff Roy D. Moraga. Responses due by 3/19/2025. (GA) (nondispositive)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
21 21 misc Status Report Thu 01/16 12:22 PM
STATUS REPORT 90 Day Stay Report by Interested Party Nevada Department of Corrections. (Hackmann, Mark)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
20 20 3 pgs order Order on Motion/Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 01/16 11:37 AM
ORDER - The IFP application (ECF No.1 ), is GRANTED . NDOC shall pay clerk from Inmate account until the full $350 filing fee has been paid. Clerk shall send a copy of this order to the Finance Division of the Clerk's Office (Email (NEF) 1/16/2025) and to the attention of Chief of Inmate Services for NDOC at formapauperis@doc.nv.gov. (Email (PDF) 1/16/2025)). Clerk shall electronically SERVE a copy of this order and a copy of complaint (ECF No.11 ) on the AG by adding the AG to the docket sheet. (E-service 1/16/2025;11 Complaint via NEF regeneration.) Service must be accomplished within 90 days of the date of this Order (4/15/2025). Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of entry of this order (2/6/2025) AG shall file notice re acceptance of service, and file under seal addresses for Ds for which service not accepted. If service accepted, the answer due within sixty (60) days from the date of this order (3/16/2025). Henceforth P shall serve Ds a copy of every pleading submitted for consideration together with a certificate of service. This case is no longer stayed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 1/15/2025. ( For Distribution by law library. )(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
19 19 minutes Early Mediation Conference Wed 01/15 8:08 AM
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Early Mediation Conference held on 1/14/2025 before Mediator Cindi Smith. Crtrm Administrator: M. Brown ; Pla Counsel: Roy Moraga ; Def Counsel: Mark Hackmann; with State Tort Claims Manager Nancy Katafias; Associate Warden Robert Hartman ; Court Reporter: Zoom ; Time of Hearing: 1:00 PM ; Recording start and end times: 2:17 pm - 2:19 pm ; 1st mediation session. A settlement was NOT reached. This case will return to the normal litigation track. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
18 18 minord Minute Order Tue 11/19 9:15 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 11/19/2024. By Deputy Clerk: M. Brown. In light of the Inmate Early Mediation Conference having been scheduled after the current deadline for the 90-day stay and the 90-day stay report (ECF No.15 ), the stay and the deadline for the report shall be extended to Friday, 1/17/2025 . Until the Court lifts the stay, no other pleadings or papers may be filed in this case, and the parties may not engage in any discovery, nor are the parties required to respond to any paper filed in violation of the stay unless specifically ordered by the Court to do so. IT IS SO ORDERED . (no image attached) ( For Distribution by law library. )(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MB)
Related: [-]
17 17 10 pgs order Order Setting Inmate Early Mediation Conference Tue 11/19 9:13 AM
ORDER Setting Inmate Early Mediation Conference for Tuesday, 1/14/2025, at 1:00 p.m. by video conference before Mediator Cindi Smith. The parties' mediation statements must be received by the court no later than 4:00 p.m., on Tuesday, 12/31/2024. DO NOT FILE THE MEDIATION STATEMENTS; DO NOT SERVE A COPY ON OPPOSING COUNSEL. See the attached order for specifications. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 11/19/2024. ( For Distribution by law library. )(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MB)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 14, 2024
16 16 notice Limited Notice Appearance of Counsel Mon 10/14 1:34 PM
LIMITED NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Mark Hackmann on behalf of Interested Party Nevada Department of Corrections. (Hackmann, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
15 15 order Screening Order Tue 09/24 7:56 AM
RESCREENING ORDER - Decision on ECF No.1 IFP application is still deferred. The Complaint (ECF No.11 ) is reinstated as the operative complaint. Clerk shall send Plaintiff a courtesy copy of the Complaint (attached hereto). The FAC (ECF No.14 ) is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff's Eighth Amendment deliberate indifference to a serious medical need claim will proceed against Defendants Isaacson, Dr. Minev, and Sullivan This action is stayed 90 days to allow parties to settle. 90-day report due by 12/23/2024. If case does not settle, Plaintiff will be required to pay the full filing fee. Clerk is directed to add the Nevada Department of Corrections to the docket as an Interested Party and e-serve a copy of this order, and copies of all items previously filed in this case by regenerating the NEF on the AG by adding the AG to the interested party on the docket. (E-service 9/24/2024; NEFs ## 1-14 regenerated to AG.) AG shall advise within 21 days of the date of the entry of this order (10/15/2024) re acceptance of service for the purpose of participation in the Early Mediation Program. Signed by District Judge Anne R. Traum on 9/23/2024. ( For Distribution by law library. )(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Copy of Complaint for Plaintiff
Friday, July 19, 2024
14 14 cmp Complaint Amended Fri 07/19 3:43 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Nevada Department of Corrections, Medical Director by Roy D. Moraga. Adds new parties. (GA)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Case Mon 07/01 1:30 PM
ORDER - The Court DENIES Plaintiff's motion requesting a stay until December 2024. However, the Court will allow Plaintiff until August 30, 2024 , to file an amended complaint curing the deficiencies of the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 7/1/2024. ( For Distribution by law library. )(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
12 12 motion Motion Stay Case or Discovery Tue 06/25 11:53 AM
MOTION to Stay Case, by Plaintiff Roy D. Moraga. Responses due by 7/9/2024. (DLS)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
11 11 cmp Complaint Fri 06/07 2:03 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Roy D. Moraga. (Filed and dismissed per10 Order). (DLS)
Related: [-]
10 10 8 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Order on Motion for Default Judgment Order on Motion for Sanctions Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Screening Order Fri 06/07 2:01 PM
SCREENING ORDER - It is therefore ordered that a decision on the application to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No.1 ) is deferred. It is further ordered that the Clerk of the Court file the Complaint (ECF No.1 -2) and send Plaintiff a courtesy copy. It is further ordered that Plaintiff's Motion for a Status Check (ECF No.9 ) is granted. Therefore, the Clerk of the Court will send Plaintiff a courtesy copy of the docket sheet for this action. It is further ordered that the following motions are denied without prejudice as premature: Motion for Leave to File Summons (ECF No.3 ), Motion for Default Judgment (ECF No.4 ), Motion for Sanctions (ECF No.5 ), Motion for Entry of Final Judgment (ECF No.6 ), Motion to Refile Default (ECF No.7 ), and Request for Submission (ECF No.8 ). It is further ordered that the Complaint (ECF No.1 -2) is dismissed without prejudice with leave to amend. Amended Complaint deadline: 7/7/2024. It is further ordered that the Clerk of the Court will send to Plaintiff the approved form for filing a § 1983 complaint and instructions for the same. If Plaintiff chooses to file an amended complaint, he should use the approved form and mark First Amended Complaint in the caption. Signed by District Judge Anne R. Traum on 6/7/2024. ( For Distribution by law library. ) Signed by District Judge Anne R. Traum on 6/7/2024.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint for P,
Att: 2 Docket Sheet,
Att: 3 Complaint form
Friday, May 03, 2024
9 9 motion Motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 05/03 10:39 AM
MOTION for Status Check and Docket Sheet, by Plaintiff Roy D. Moraga. Responses due by 5/17/2024. (DLS) (misc) (nondispositive)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
8 8 motion Motion in Water Case Thu 04/04 11:40 AM
MOTION NOTICE Request for Submission , filed by Roy D. Moraga. (DRM) Modified docket event on 4/4/2024 (KMB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
7 7 motion Motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 03/07 12:13 PM
MOTION for Intent to Refile a Motion for Default, by Plaintiff Roy D. Moraga. Responses due by 3/21/2024. (GA) (misc) (nondispositive)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
6 6 motion Motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 03/04 11:07 AM
MOTION for Entry of Final Judgment, by Plaintiff Roy D. Moraga. Responses due by 3/18/2024. (GA) (misc) (nondispositive)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
5 5 motion Motion Sanctions Fri 01/19 1:43 PM
MOTION for Sanctions, by Plaintiff Roy D. Moraga. (judgment) Responses due by 2/2/2024. (GA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
4 4 motion Motion Default Judgment Fri 12/29 12:33 PM
MOTION for Finding of Default, by Plaintiff Roy D. Moraga. Responses due by 1/10/2024. (GA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 07, 2023
3 3 motion Motion Leave to File Document/Excess Pages Thu 12/07 4:12 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Document, by Plaintiff Roy D. Moraga. Responses due by 12/21/2023.(GA) (nondispositive)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
2 2 notice Advisory Letter Pro Se non-habeas Tue 12/05 4:06 PM
ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (GA)
Related: [-]
1 1 motion Motion/Application Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 12/05 4:02 PM
MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Plaintiff Roy D. Moraga.(GA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibits