Board of County Commissioners of Washington County, Maryland v. Eli Lilly and Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:23-md-03080
Lead case: 2:23-md-03080
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Brian R Martinotti |
Referred: | Rukhsanah L Singh |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-22917 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Dec 06, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Maryland, 1:23-cv-03081 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 04, 2024 4:52 AM EDT |
Defendant
ESI MAIL PHARMACY SERVICE INC.
|
|
Defendant
Optumrx Inc.
|
|
Defendant
OptumInsight Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Optum Inc.
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK INC.
|
|
Defendant
MEDCO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.
|
|
Defendant
Express Scripts Inc.
1 Express Way
St. Louis, MO 63121 |
|
Defendant
EXPRESS SCRIPTS PHARMACY INC.
|
|
Defendant
EXPRESS SCRIPTS ADMINISTRATORS LLC.
|
|
Defendant
EVERNORTH HEALTH INC.
|
|
Defendant
ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
|
|
Defendant
CVS PHARMACY INC.
|
|
Defendant
CVS HEALTH CORPORATION
|
|
Defendant
CAREMARK RX L.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
CAREMARK PCS HEALTH LLC
|
|
Defendant
CAREMARK L.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. L.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
UNITED HEALTH GROUP INC.
|
|
In Re
INSULIN PRICING LITIGATION
|
|
Plaintiff
Board of County Commissioners of Washington County, Maryland
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
34 | 34
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 08/01 4:37 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against CAREMARK L.L.C., CAREMARK PCS HEALTH LLC, CAREMARK RX L.L.C., CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, CVS PHARMACY INC., ELI LILLY AND COMPANY, ESI MAIL PHARMACY SERVICE INC., EVERNORTH HEALTH INC., EXPRESS SCRIPTS ADMINISTRATORS LLC., EXPRESS SCRIPTS PHARMACY INC., Express Scripts Inc., MEDCO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC., NOVO NORDISK INC., Optum Inc., OptumInsight Inc., Optumrx Inc., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. L.L.C., UNITED HEALTH GROUP INC., filed by Board of County Commissioners of Washington County, Maryland.(PIFKO, MARK) |
|
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
33 | 33
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 03/22 1:01 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Board of County Commissioners of Washington County, Maryland. UNITED HEALTH GROUP INC. waiver sent on 12/8/2023, answer due 2/6/2024. (PIFKO, MARK) |
|
32 | 32
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 03/22 12:58 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Board of County Commissioners of Washington County, Maryland. Optumrx Inc. waiver sent on 12/8/2023, answer due 2/6/2024. (PIFKO, MARK) |
|
31 | 31
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 03/22 12:57 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Board of County Commissioners of Washington County, Maryland. OptumInsight Inc. waiver sent on 12/8/2023, answer due 2/6/2024. (PIFKO, MARK) |
|
30 | 30
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 03/22 12:51 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Board of County Commissioners of Washington County, Maryland. Optum Inc. waiver sent on 12/8/2023, answer due 2/6/2024. (PIFKO, MARK) |
|
Friday, February 02, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 02/02 9:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by TROY ALAN RAFFERTY on behalf of Board of County Commissioners of Washington County, Maryland (RAFFERTY, TROY) |
|
Wednesday, January 24, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 01/24 4:26 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Board of County Commissioners of Washington County, Maryland. EXPRESS SCRIPTS PHARMACY INC. waiver sent on 12/8/2023, answer due 2/6/2024. (PIFKO, MARK) |
|
27 | 27
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 01/24 4:24 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Board of County Commissioners of Washington County, Maryland. MEDCO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC. waiver sent on 12/8/2023, answer due 2/6/2024. (PIFKO, MARK) |
|
26 | 26
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 01/24 4:24 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Board of County Commissioners of Washington County, Maryland. Express Scripts Inc. waiver sent on 12/8/2023, answer due 2/6/2024. (PIFKO, MARK) |
|
25 | 25
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 01/24 4:24 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Board of County Commissioners of Washington County, Maryland. EXPRESS SCRIPTS ADMINISTRATORS LLC. waiver sent on 12/8/2023, answer due 2/6/2024. (PIFKO, MARK) |
|
24 | 24
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 01/24 4:23 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Board of County Commissioners of Washington County, Maryland. EVERNORTH HEALTH INC. waiver sent on 12/8/2023, answer due 2/6/2024. (PIFKO, MARK) |
|
23 | 23
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 01/24 4:23 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Board of County Commissioners of Washington County, Maryland. ESI MAIL PHARMACY SERVICE INC. waiver sent on 12/8/2023, answer due 2/6/2024. (PIFKO, MARK) |
|
Monday, January 22, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 01/22 6:50 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM FRANKLIN CASH, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs (CASH, WILLIAM) |
|
Thursday, January 04, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 01/04 11:08 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by BRANDON LEE BOGLE on behalf of All Plaintiffs (BOGLE, BRANDON) |
|
Wednesday, January 03, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 01/03 11:02 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by BECCA TIMMONS on behalf of Board of County Commissioners of Washington County, Maryland (TIMMONS, BECCA) |
|
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 01/03 10:49 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew D. Schultz on behalf of Board of County Commissioners of Washington County, Maryland (Schultz, Matthew) |
|
Thursday, December 21, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 12/21 5:50 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Board of County Commissioners of Washington County, Maryland. ELI LILLY AND COMPANY waiver sent on 12/8/2023, answer due 2/6/2024. (PIFKO, MARK) |
|
17 | 17
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 12/21 5:37 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Board of County Commissioners of Washington County, Maryland. SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. L.L.C. waiver sent on 12/8/2023, answer due 2/6/2024. (PIFKO, MARK) |
|
16 | 16
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 12/21 5:37 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Board of County Commissioners of Washington County, Maryland. CVS PHARMACY INC. waiver sent on 12/7/2023, answer due 2/5/2024. (PIFKO, MARK) |
|
15 | 15
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 12/21 5:37 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Board of County Commissioners of Washington County, Maryland. CVS HEALTH CORPORATION waiver sent on 12/7/2023, answer due 2/5/2024. (PIFKO, MARK) |
|
14 | 14
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 12/21 5:37 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Board of County Commissioners of Washington County, Maryland. CAREMARK L.L.C. waiver sent on 12/7/2023, answer due 2/5/2024. (PIFKO, MARK) |
|
13 | 13
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 12/21 5:37 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Board of County Commissioners of Washington County, Maryland. CAREMARK RX L.L.C. waiver sent on 12/7/2023, answer due 2/5/2024. (PIFKO, MARK) |
|
12 | 12
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 12/21 5:37 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Board of County Commissioners of Washington County, Maryland. CAREMARK PCS HEALTH LLC waiver sent on 12/7/2023, answer due 2/5/2024. (PIFKO, MARK) |
|
11 | 11
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 12/21 2:44 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Board of County Commissioners of Washington County, Maryland. NOVO NORDISK INC. waiver sent on 12/8/2023, answer due 2/6/2024. (PIFKO, MARK) |
|
Tuesday, December 19, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 12/19 4:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MARK P PIFKO on behalf of Board of County Commissioners of Washington County, Maryland (PIFKO, MARK) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 12/19 4:07 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTINE COONEY MANSOUR on behalf of Board of County Commissioners of Washington County, Maryland (MANSOUR, CHRISTINE) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 12/19 3:56 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by RUSSELL WILLS BUDD on behalf of Board of County Commissioners of Washington County, Maryland (BUDD, RUSSELL) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 12/19 3:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JULES BURTON LEBLANC, III on behalf of Board of County Commissioners of Washington County, Maryland (LEBLANC, JULES) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 12/19 3:17 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by CATHERINE DORSEY on behalf of Board of County Commissioners of Washington County, Maryland (DORSEY, CATHERINE) |
|
Wednesday, December 06, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
mdl
MDL Notice to Counsel
Wed 12/06 2:30 PM
Clerk's Notice to Counsel Pursuant to CTO-6 entered in MDL No. 3080, District of Maryland case number 1:23-cv-03081 has been transferred to the District of New Jersey and assigned civil action number: 2:23-cv-22917. In Re: Insulin Pricing Litigation, MDL 3080. (sms2) |
|
4 | 4
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Court Transfer
Wed 12/06 2:05 PM
Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Maryland; Case Number 1:23-cv-03081. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Wed 12/06 2:18 PM
Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh added. (sms2) |
||
utility
Create Case Association
Wed 12/06 2:19 PM
Cases associated to 2:23-md-03080-BRM-RLS. (sms2) |
||
order
Case Management Order
Wed 12/06 2:34 PM
This case is part of MDL 3080. Parties are expected to review and abide by all prior orders entered in this MDL, which can be found[LINK:here] . (sms2) |
||
Tuesday, December 05, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
mdl
MDL Transfer Order (out)
Wed 12/06 9:18 AM
MDL Certified Transfer ORDER transferring case to the USDC for the District of New Jersey. Signed by Tiffany D. Pete, Clerk of the Panel on 11/28/2023. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Tuesday, November 14, 2023 | ||
2 | 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Caremark PCS Health, LLC, Caremark Rx, LLC, Caremark, LLC, ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Eli Lilly and Company, Evernorth Health, Inc., Express Scripts Administrators, LLC, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc., Medco Health Solutions, Inc., Novo Nordisk Inc., Optum, Inc., Optuminsight, Inc., Optumrx Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, United Health Group, Inc..(mg3s, Deputy Clerk) | |
Monday, November 13, 2023 | ||
1 | 1 202 pgs COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10923063.), filed by Board of County Commissioners of Washington County, Maryland.(Poole, David) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Summons, | ||
Att: 7 Summons, | ||
Att: 8 Summons, | ||
Att: 9 Summons, | ||
Att: 10 Summons, | ||
Att: 11 Summons, | ||
Att: 12 Summons, | ||
Att: 13 Summons, | ||
Att: 14 Summons, | ||
Att: 15 Summons, | ||
Att: 16 Summons, | ||
Att: 17 Summons, | ||
Att: 18 Summons, | ||
Att: 19 Summons |