Kansas District Court
Judge:Holly L Teeter
Referred: Brooks G Severson
Case #: 2:23-cv-02540
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Dec 07, 2023
Terminated:Aug 02, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 04, 2024 4:08 AM CDT
Defendant
USD 469 Lansing
Represented By
Alex Scott Gilmore
Fisher, Patterson, Sayler & Smith, Llp - Overland Park
contact info
Andrew D. Holder
Fisher, Patterson, Sayler & Smith, Llp - Overland Park
contact info
Plaintiff
Vera Jane Daniels
Represented By
Arthur A. Benson, II
Law Office Of Arthur Benson, Ii
contact info
Plaintiff
Celeste Nicole Hoins
Represented By
Arthur A. Benson, II
Law Office Of Arthur Benson, Ii
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Jeff Bollin
Terminated: 02/20/2024
Represented By
Andrew D. Holder
Fisher, Patterson, Sayler & Smith, Llp - Overland Park
contact info
Defendant
Amy Cawvey
Terminated: 02/20/2024
Represented By
Andrew D. Holder
Fisher, Patterson, Sayler & Smith, Llp - Overland Park
contact info
Defendant
Marty Kobza
Terminated: 02/20/2024
Represented By
Andrew D. Holder
Fisher, Patterson, Sayler & Smith, Llp - Overland Park
contact info
Defendant
Michelle McQuillan
Terminated: 02/20/2024
Represented By
Andrew D. Holder
Fisher, Patterson, Sayler & Smith, Llp - Overland Park
contact info
Defendant
Pete Robinson
Terminated: 02/20/2024
Represented By
Andrew D. Holder
Fisher, Patterson, Sayler & Smith, Llp - Overland Park
contact info
Defendant
Carla Wiegers
Terminated: 02/20/2024
Represented By
Andrew D. Holder
Fisher, Patterson, Sayler & Smith, Llp - Overland Park
contact info
Defendant
Mary Wood
Terminated: 02/20/2024
Represented By
Andrew D. Holder
Fisher, Patterson, Sayler & Smith, Llp - Overland Park
contact info
Defendant
Aaron Yoakam
Terminated: 02/20/2024
Represented By
Andrew D. Holder
Fisher, Patterson, Sayler & Smith, Llp - Overland Park
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, August 02, 2024
41 41 2 pgs misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 08/02 4:20 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL with Prejudice by Vera Jane Daniels, Celeste Nicole Hoins. (Benson, Arthur)
Related: [-]
40 40 adr ADR Report Fri 08/02 3:49 PM
ADR REPORT by USD 469 Lansing. ADR session held on: 07/16/2024 and conducted by Hon. Paul C. Gurney. Results of ADR: Case settled at ADR. Status of litigation at time of ADR: Partial Discovery(Holder, Andrew)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Mon 08/05 12:55 PM
***Civil Case Terminated per 41 Stipulation of Dismissal and per HLT Chambers.(kas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
39 39 3 pgs discov Notice to Take Deposition Wed 07/17 6:26 PM
NOTICE by Plaintiffs Vera Jane Daniels, Celeste Nicole Hoins of taking deposition of Defendant Lansing Unified School District No. 469 on August 7, 2024 (Benson, Arthur)
Related: [-]
38 38 2 pgs discov Notice to Take Deposition Wed 07/17 6:24 PM
NOTICE by Plaintiffs Vera Jane Daniels, Celeste Nicole Hoins of taking deposition of Kirsten Workman on August 7, 2024 (Benson, Arthur)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
37 37 notice Notice of Service Fri 07/12 3:29 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE by USD 469 Lansing of Rule 68 Offer of Judgment to Plaintiffs (Holder, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 05, 2024
36 36 misc Certificate of Service Fri 07/05 2:31 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendants' First Supplemental Rule 26(e) Disclosures by USD 469 Lansing. (Holder, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
34 34 2 pgs discov Notice to Take Deposition Thu 06/13 3:35 PM
NOTICE by Plaintiffs Vera Jane Daniels, Celeste Nicole Hoins of taking deposition of Mary Wood, Carla Weigers, Amy Cawvey on July 9, 2024 (Benson, Arthur) Modified on 6/13/2024 to correct typo within docket text (kas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
35 35 minutes Telephone Conference Thu 06/13 4:07 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson: PRE-MOTION TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 6/6/2024. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
33 33 discov Notice to Take Deposition Mon 06/03 12:12 PM
NOTICE by Plaintiffs Vera Jane Daniels, Celeste Nicole Hoins of taking deposition of Southeast Kansas Education Service Center on June 14, 2024(Benson, Arthur)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs Subpoena in a Civil Case
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
32 32 order Order on Motion for Discovery Hearing Tue 05/28 3:37 PM
ORDER granting 31 Motion for Pre-motion Discovery Telephone Conference (per 5/28/24 email from the parties). Telephone conference set for 6/6/2024 11:00 AM (BGS - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 5407703) before Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson on 5/28/24. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
Related: [-]
31 31 motion Discovery Hearing Tue 05/28 3:35 PM
Joint MOTION for Pre-motion Discovery Telephone conference. Related [+] (df)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson
Friday, May 10, 2024
30 30 notice Joint Mediation Notice Fri 05/10 10:08 AM
JOINT MEDIATION NOTICE - Mediation to be held July 16, 2024 by USD 469 Lansing (Holder, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
29 29 order Scheduling Order Wed 05/01 2:28 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Mediation Notice or Confidential Settlement Report Due to Magistrate Judge by 6/5/2024. Mediation deadline 8/2/2024. Discovery deadline 11/1/2024. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/22/2024. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/5/2024 at 02:00 PM by Telephone BGS - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 5407703 before Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson. Dispositive motion deadline 1/9/2025. The parties expect the jury trial of this case to take approximately three trial days in Kansas City, Kansas. The court will subsequently set this case for trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson on 5/1/2024. (ca)
Related: [-]
28 28 minutes Scheduling Conference Wed 05/01 11:32 AM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 5/1/2024. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
Related: [-]
27 27 misc Entry of Appearance Wed 05/01 9:13 AM
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Alex Scott Gilmore on behalf of USD 469 Lansing. (Gilmore, Alex)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
26 26 misc Certificate of Service Fri 04/19 2:00 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Initial Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures by USD 469 Lansing. (Holder, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
25 25 misc Certificate of Service Thu 04/18 12:39 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs Initial Rule 26 Disclosures by Vera Jane Daniels, Celeste Nicole Hoins. (Benson, Arthur)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
24 24 notice Notice (Other) Mon 04/01 12:57 PM
NOTICE of Rule 68 Offer of Judgment by USD 469 Lansing (Holder, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
23 23 order Protective Order Fri 03/29 12:26 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson on 3/29/24. (df)
Related: [-]
22 22 order Order on Motion for Protective Order Fri 03/29 12:24 PM
ORDER granting 21 Joint Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson on 3/29/24. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Protective Order Fri 03/29 12:18 PM
JOINT MOTION for Entry of Agreed Protective Order (per email from counsel dated 3/28/24). Related [+] (df)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson
Thursday, March 28, 2024
20 20 order Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling Thu 03/28 10:49 AM
INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 5/1/2024 at 10:00 AM by Telephone BGS - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 5407703 before Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 4/10/2024. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 4/19/2024. Proposed Scheduling Order Deadline 4/19/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson on 3/28/24. (cc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
19 19 order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 02/20 1:41 PM
ORDER granting15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiffs' response states they do not oppose the motion and agree to dismissal of the individual defendants. Doc.17 . Accordingly, Defendants Marty Kobza, Amy Cawvey, Pete Robinson, Carla Wiegers, Jeff Bollin, Mary Wood, Aaron Yoakam, and Michelle McQuillan are dismissed. Plaintiffs' claim against USD 469 Lansing remains pending. Signed by District Judge Holly L. Teeter on 2/20/2024. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (sz)
Related: [-]
18 18 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 02/20 12:51 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by USD 469 Lansing.(Holder, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 19, 2024
17 17 respm Response to Motion Mon 02/19 4:09 PM
RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Vera Jane Daniels, Celeste Nicole Hoins re15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Benson, Arthur)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
16 16 8 pgs support Memorandum in Support of Motion Wed 02/14 4:41 PM
MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Jeff Bollin, Amy Cawvey, Marty Kobza, Michelle McQuillan, Pete Robinson, USD 469 Lansing, Carla Wiegers, Mary Wood, Aaron Yoakam(Holder, Andrew)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 02/14 4:38 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Jeff Bollin, Amy Cawvey, Marty Kobza, Michelle McQuillan, Pete Robinson, USD 469 Lansing, Carla Wiegers, Mary Wood, Aaron Yoakam (Holder, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
14 14 order Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer Wed 02/14 9:00 AM
CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 2/14/2024 for Defendants Jeff Bollin, Amy Cawvey, Marty Kobza, Michelle McQuillan, Pete Robinson, USD 469 Lansing, Carla Wiegers, Mary Wood, Aaron Yoakam to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 2/13/2024. (nac)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
13 13 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 12/18 12:58 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Celeste Nicole Hoins, Vera Jane Daniels. Pete Robinson waiver sent on 12/15/2023, answer due 2/13/2024. (Benson, Arthur)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 12/18 12:50 PM
(DISREGARD, SEE DE13 ) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Celeste Nicole Hoins, Vera Jane Daniels. (Benson, Arthur) Modified title per filer on 12/18/2023. Incorrect document attached, correct document attached on DE 13. (kmc)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 12/18 12:47 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Celeste Nicole Hoins, Vera Jane Daniels. Michelle McQuillan waiver sent on 12/15/2023, answer due 2/13/2024. (Benson, Arthur)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 12/18 12:46 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Celeste Nicole Hoins, Vera Jane Daniels. Mary Wood waiver sent on 12/15/2023, answer due 2/13/2024. (Benson, Arthur)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 12/18 12:44 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Celeste Nicole Hoins, Vera Jane Daniels. Marty Kobza waiver sent on 12/15/2023, answer due 2/13/2024. (Benson, Arthur)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 12/18 12:43 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Celeste Nicole Hoins, Vera Jane Daniels. USD 469 Lansing waiver sent on 12/15/2023, answer due 2/13/2024. (Benson, Arthur)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 12/18 12:42 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Celeste Nicole Hoins, Vera Jane Daniels. Jeff Bollin waiver sent on 12/15/2023, answer due 2/13/2024. (Benson, Arthur)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 12/18 12:40 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Celeste Nicole Hoins, Vera Jane Daniels. Carla Wiegers waiver sent on 12/15/2023, answer due 2/13/2024. (Benson, Arthur)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 12/18 12:39 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Celeste Nicole Hoins, Vera Jane Daniels. Amy Cawvey waiver sent on 12/15/2023, answer due 2/13/2024. (Benson, Arthur)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 12/18 12:37 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Celeste Nicole Hoins, Vera Jane Daniels. Aaron Yoakam waiver sent on 12/15/2023, answer due 2/13/2024. (Benson, Arthur)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 07, 2023
3 3 misc Designation of Place of Trial Thu 12/07 2:29 PM
DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiffs Vera Jane Daniels, Celeste Nicole Hoins - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Benson, Arthur)
Related: [-]
2 2 2 pgs misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 12/07 2:27 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiffs Vera Jane Daniels, Celeste Nicole Hoins. (Benson, Arthur)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (attorney) Thu 12/07 2:22 PM
COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $405, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6221527.), filed by Celeste Nicole Hoins, Vera Jane Daniels.(Benson, Arthur)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Judge Assignment Thu 12/07 2:50 PM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter and Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at http://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/notice-consent-and-reference-civil-action-magistrate-judge (jk)
Related: [-]