Oregon Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Teresa H Pearson
Case #: 6:23-bk-62287
Case Filed:Dec 08, 2023
Creditor Meeting:Jan 05, 2024

Debtor
Omegle.com LLC
2355 State St Ste 101
Salem, OR 97301-4541
Represented By
TIMOTHY A SOLOMON
Tabor Law Group
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Jeanne E Huffman
Jeanne E. Huffman, Trustee LLC Pob 1674
Pendleton, OR 97801
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee, Eugene
405 E 8th Ave #1100
Eugene, OR 97401


Docket last updated: 12/08/2023 1:05 PM PST
Friday, December 08, 2023
crditcrd none Fri 12/08 10:09 AM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Attorney Ch 7 Voluntary Petition([LINK 23-62287 7] ) [misc,volp7a] ( 338.00). Receipt Number A21278970. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 misc Attorney Ch 7 Voluntary Petition Fri 12/08 10:08 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition, Fee Amount $338 (SOLOMON, TIMOTHY)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Fri 12/08 10:14 AM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed By Debtor Omegle.com LLC (SOLOMON, TIMOTHY)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs court Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) Fri 12/08 10:17 AM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case and Notice of Meeting of Creditors Set for 1/5/2024 at 11:30AM at 341 Meeting via Telephone (HUFU). Dial 877-711-0954, passcode 4081510. (SOLOMON, TIMOTHY)
Related: [-]