Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:23-bk-42136

Minnesota Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Katherine A Constantine
Case #: 4:23-ap-04095
Nature of Suit63 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(8), student loan
Case Filed:Dec 08, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
US DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION BUILDING 400 MARYLAND AVE SW
WASHINGTON, DC 20202
Plaintiff
Ebony Shawntil Williams
705 Town Center Pkwy Apt 217
Lino Lakes, MN 55014
Represented By
Andrew C. Walker
Walker & Walker Law Offices PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
25 25 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Wed 01/29 11:35 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 01/29/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
24 24 3 pgs order Order for trial Mon 01/27 5:06 PM
Scheduling Order & Order for trial Motions Due: 4/23/2025. Discovery due by 3/24/2025. Trial date set for 6/10/2025 at 01:00 PM at Courtroom 8 West, 8th Floor, 300 S 4th St, Minneapolis, Judge Katherine A. Constantine. (LMO)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
court CHAP Minutes re hrg set by motion, aplc or order Thu 01/23 12:33 PM
Minutes re: Continued Status conference re21 Order for Status Conference. Telephonic Appearances by Joshua Peterson for Plaintiff and Adine Momoh for Defendant. (SLMP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
court CHAP Minutes re hrg set by motion, aplc or order Thu 12/05 1:50 PM
Minutes re:21 Order for status conference. Telephonic appearances by Joshua Peterson for Plaintiff and Adine Momoh for Defendant. STATUS CONFERENCE CONTINUED TO JANUARY 23, 2025, AT 11:30 A.M. (SLMP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
23 23 misc Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Wed 11/20 1:45 PM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor filed by Ebony Shawntil Williams. (Walker, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 03, 2024
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 11/03 10:32 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 11/03/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
21 21 1 pgs order Order for status conference Fri 11/01 1:32 PM
Order for status conference re:18 . Status Conference set for 12/5/2024 at 11:30 AM. Location: Courtroom 8 West, 8th Floor, 300 S 4th St, Minneapolis, Judge Katherine A. Constantine. (LMO)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
court CHAP Minutes re hrg set by motion, aplc or order Thu 10/31 11:57 AM
Minutes re:3 Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor. Telephonic appearances by Andrew Walker for Debtor and Adine Momoh for the United States of America and the Department of Education. NEW DISCLOSURE OF COMPENSATION OF ATTORNEY FORM ORDERED TO BE FILED ON OR BEFORE NOVEMBER 7, 2024. (SLMP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 10/24 11:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 10/24/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
19 19 court Notice of Hearing (Adversary) Tue 10/22 4:57 PM
Notice of Status conference Related [+] Status conference scheduled for 10/31/2024 at 11:30 AM. Location: Courtroom 8 West, 8th Floor, 300 S 4th St, Minneapolis, Judge Katherine A. Constantine. (LMO)
Related: [-] 3 Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
Monday, September 30, 2024
18 18 answer Answer to complaint Mon 09/30 9:48 PM
Answer to complaint without demand for jury trial filed by US DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (Momoh, Adine)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 08/02 11:32 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 08/02/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Order (Generic) Wed 07/31 2:00 PM
Order Extending Deadline to File an Answer or Otherwise Respond. Related [+] (SLMP)
Related: [-] 15 Stipulation
Monday, July 29, 2024
15 15 misc Stipulation or Agreement Mon 07/29 9:18 PM
Stipulation filed by US DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION and Ebony Shawntil Williams. Proposed Order. Nature of stipulation: for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond.(Voss, Ana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed order
Thursday, May 30, 2024
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 05/30 11:33 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 05/30/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Order (Generic) Tue 05/28 4:21 PM
Order Extending Deadline to File an Answer or Otherwise Respon Related [+] (SLMP)
Related: [-] 12 Stipulation
12 12 misc Stipulation or Agreement Tue 05/28 3:32 PM
Stipulation filed by US DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION and Ebony Shawntil Williams. Proposed Order. Nature of stipulation: for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond.(Momoh, Adine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed order
Friday, March 29, 2024
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 03/29 11:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 03/29/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order (Generic) Wed 03/27 2:48 PM
Order Extending Deadline to File an Answer or Otherwise Respond Related [+] (CMG)
Related: [-] 9 Stipulation
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
9 9 misc Stipulation or Agreement Tue 03/26 12:25 PM
Stipulation filed by US DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION and Andrew C. Walker. Proposed Order. Nature of stipulation: Extension of Time to Answer.(Momoh, Adine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed order
Sunday, January 28, 2024
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 01/28 11:26 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 01/28/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order (Generic) Fri 01/26 2:46 PM
Order Extending Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond Related [+] (CMG)
Related: [-] 6 Stipulation
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
6 6 misc Stipulation or Agreement Tue 01/16 5:27 PM
Stipulation filed by US DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION and Ebony Shawntil Williams. Proposed Order. Nature of stipulation: for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond.(Momoh, Adine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed order
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
5 5 misc Notice of appearance and request for notice Wed 01/03 4:17 PM
Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by US DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION and Adine S. Momoh. (Momoh, Adine)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2023
4 4 misc Certificate of service Fri 12/15 3:54 PM
Certificate of service Related [+] filed by Ebony Shawntil Williams.(Walker, Andrew)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, December 11, 2023
3 3 misc Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Mon 12/11 12:43 PM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor filed by Ebony Shawntil Williams. (Walker, Andrew)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons for adversary proceeding Mon 12/11 8:31 AM
Summons issued on US DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION Date Issued 12/11/2023, Answer Due 1/10/2024 (LMO)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 12/08 3:58 PM
Adversary case 23-04095 (63 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(8), student loan)), Complaint without demand for jury trial by Ebony Shawntil Williams against US DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. No Fee. (Walker, Andrew)
Related: [-]