Banning et al v. Carreras et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Lance M Africk |
Referred: | Michael North |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-07261 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1051 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Dec 11, 2023 |
Terminated: | Mar 20, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Jun 08, 2024 3:36 AM CDT |
Defendant
3226 Magazine Properties, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jaimee Carreras
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jeffery Carreras
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
2604 Magazine Properties, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kimberlee Banning
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Bruser
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
38 | 38
1
pgs
order
Order Staying Case
Wed 03/20 11:16 AM
ORDER that the above-captioned matter is stayed and administratively closed until further order of this Court. FURTHER ORDERED that any party may file a written motion to reopen the above-captioned case in the event that the parties are unable to reach a final settlement agreement. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 03/19/2024.(ko) |
|
Friday, March 15, 2024 | ||
37 | 37
1
pgs
minutes
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Order
Fri 03/15 11:10 AM
ORDER that the submission date on26 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and30 MOTION to Dismiss are re-set to 3/22/2024. The parties' respective replies shall be due no later than 03/20/2024. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 03/14/2024.(ko) |
|
Thursday, March 14, 2024 | ||
36 | 36
1
pgs
minutes
Settlement Conference Set Hearings
Fri 03/15 9:27 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael North: Settlement Conference held on 3/14/2024. Negotiations were productive. The settlement conference will be reconvened on March 19, 2024 at 1:00 p.m., Room B419, Hale Boggs Building, 500 Poydras Street, New Orleans, Louisiana. (rt) |
|
Wednesday, March 13, 2024 | ||
35 | 35
27
pgs
respm
Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Wed 03/13 2:55 PM
RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by 3226 Magazine Properties, LLC, Jaimee Carreras, Jeffery Carreras re26 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.(ko) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit | ||
34 | 34
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Wed 03/13 2:51 PM
ORDER granting32 Motion for Leave to File Memorandum in Opposition in Excess of Page Limitations. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 03/13/2024. (ko) |
|
Tuesday, March 12, 2024 | ||
33 | 33
12
pgs
respm
Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Tue 03/12 10:15 PM
RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re30 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . (Latham, Gregory) |
|
32 | 32
2
pgs
motion
Leave to File Document
Tue 03/12 7:52 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Reurged Motion for Preliminary Injunction That Is in Excess of the Page Limits by 3226 Magazine Properties, LLC, Jaimee Carreras, Jeffery Carreras.(Grau, Benjamin) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 27 pgs Proposed Pleading, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit | ||
Monday, March 11, 2024 | ||
31 | 31
2
pgs
order
Order Set Hearings
Mon 03/11 12:40 PM
ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: A settlement conference in the above matter is hereby SCHEDULED for March 14, 2024 at 1:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Michael B. North, Room B419, Hale Boggs Building, 500 Poydras Street, New Orleans, Louisiana. Each party shall provide, in confidence, a concise settlement memorandum. This memorandum shall be submitted at least two (2) full business days before the conference. The memorandum shall be emailed directly to: efile-north@laed.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 3/11/2024.(cs) |
|
Wednesday, March 06, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
motion
Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim/FRCP12(b)(6) Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Wed 03/06 11:28 AM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by 3226 Magazine Properties, LLC, Jaimee Carreras, Jeffery Carreras. Motion(s) will be submitted on 3/20/2024.(Kraus, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Submission | ||
Tuesday, March 05, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
3
pgs
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim/FRCP12(b)(6)
Tue 03/05 12:34 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by 3226 Magazine Properties, LLC, Jaimee Carreras, Jeffery Carreras. Motion(s) will be submitted on 3/20/2024.(Kraus, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 27 pgs Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Submission | ||
Monday, March 04, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 03/04 11:39 AM
ORDER re27 Request/Statement of Oral Argument. The Court declines to schedule oral argument at this time. If, at a later date, the Court finds that oral argument would be helpful, counsel will be notified. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 03/04/2024.(ko) |
|
Thursday, February 29, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
3
pgs
misc
Request/Statement of Oral Argument
Thu 02/29 1:35 PM
Request/Statement of Oral Argument by 2604 Magazine Properties, LLC, Kimberlee Banning, Mark Bruser regarding26 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction(Vickers, Adam) |
|
Att: 1 1 pgs Proposed Order | ||
Monday, February 26, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
3
pgs
motion
Preliminary Injunction
Mon 02/26 4:10 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by 2604 Magazine Properties, LLC, Kimberlee Banning, Mark Bruser. Motion(s) will be submitted on 3/20/2024.(ko) |
|
Att: 1 31 pgs Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Adam Vickers, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 10 Notice of Submission | ||
25 | 25
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 02/26 4:06 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against 3226 Magazine Properties, LLC, Jaimee Carreras, Jeffery Carreras filed by Kimberlee Banning, 2604 Magazine Properties, LLC, Mark Bruser.(ko) |
|
24 | 24
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Order on Motion for Extension of Deadlines Order on Motion for Leave to File Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Order on Motion to Enroll as Co
Mon 02/26 4:04 PM
ORDER granting21 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. FURTHER ORDERED that22 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages is granted. FURTHER ORDERED that20 Motion to Extend Submission Date of Plaintiff's Proposed Motion for a Preliminary Injunction is granted. Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction shall be set for submission on 03/20/2024. FURTHER ORDERED that23 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney Benjamin R. Grau, Douglass F. Wynne, Jr, Joshua D. Ecuyer, Suzette Toledano as to defendants is granted. FURTHER ORDERED that12 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction is dismissed as moot without prejudice to defendants' right to file a motion to dismiss plaintiffs' first amended complaint if appropriate. Any such re-urged motion to dismiss shall be set for submission on 03/20/2024. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 02/26/2024. (ko) |
|
Friday, February 23, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
2
pgs
motion
Enroll as Counsel of Record
Fri 02/23 2:57 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record by 3226 Magazine Properties, LLC, Jaimee Carreras, Jeffery Carreras.(Kraus, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 1 pgs Proposed Pleading | ||
22 | 22
3
pgs
motion
File Excess Pages
Fri 02/23 2:27 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by 2604 Magazine Properties, LLC, Kimberlee Banning.(Vickers, Adam) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Pleading Re-Urged Motion for Preliminary Injunction, | ||
Att: 3 31 pgs Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 4 Statement Declaration of Adam Vickers, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 1 - Banning Declaration, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 2 - Bruser Declaration, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 3 - Membership Interest Agreement, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 4 - Lease Agreement, | ||
Att: 9 59 pgs Exhibit 5 - Jeff Carreras Depo, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 6 - Jaimee Carreras Depo, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 7 - Fraudulent Trademark Assignment, | ||
Att: 12 Notice of Submission | ||
21 | 21
motion
Leave to File Document
Fri 02/23 1:35 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by 2604 Magazine Properties, LLC, Kimberlee Banning.(Vickers, Adam) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Pleading, | ||
Att: 2 Complaint | ||
20 | 20
2
pgs
motion
Extension of Deadlines
Fri 02/23 10:28 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Submission Date by 3226 Magazine Properties, LLC, Jaimee Carreras, Jeffery Carreras.(Kraus, Douglas) Modified on 2/23/2024 (ko) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, February 22, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Leave to File Document
Thu 02/22 4:33 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by 2604 Magazine Properties, LLC, Kimberlee Banning.(Vickers, Adam) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
18 | 18
3
pgs
motion
File Excess Pages
Thu 02/22 4:12 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by 2604 Magazine Properties, LLC, Kimberlee Banning.(Vickers, Adam) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, February 20, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Preliminary Injunction
Tue 02/20 5:38 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by 2604 Magazine Properties, LLC, Kimberlee Banning. Motion(s) will be submitted on 3/6/2024.(Vickers, Adam) |
|
Att: 1 31 pgs Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 45 pgs Statement Declaration of Adam Vickers, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 1 - Banning Declaration, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 2 - Bruser Declaration, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 3 - Membership Interest Agreement, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 4 - Lease Agreement, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 5 - Jeff Carreras Depo, | ||
Att: 8 35 pgs Exhibit 6 - Jaimee Carreras Depo, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 7 - Fraudulent Trademark Assignment, | ||
Att: 10 Notice of Submission | ||
16 | 16
27
pgs
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 02/20 11:23 AM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against 3226 Magazine Properties, LLC, Jaimee Carreras, Jeffery Carreras filed by Kimberlee Banning, 2604 Magazine Properties, LLC.(Vickers, Adam) |
|
Thursday, February 08, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Order Setting/Resetting Hearing on Motion ~Util - Terminate Motions
Thu 02/08 2:53 PM
ORDER granting14 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Motion to Continue Submission Date . FURTHER ORDERED that the13 MOTION to Continue Submission Date is granted. The submission date for12 MOTION to Dismiss is re-set to 3/6/2024. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 02/08/2024.(ko) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Expedite
Thu 02/08 10:35 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Motion to Continue Submission Date by 2604 Magazine Properties, LLC, Kimberlee Banning.(Vickers, Adam) Modified on 2/8/2024 - edit text to remove submission date (blg) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
13 | 13
2
pgs
motion
Continue
Thu 02/08 10:29 AM
MOTION to Continue Submission Date by 2604 Magazine Properties, LLC, Kimberlee Banning. Motion(s) will be submitted on 3/6/2024.(Vickers, Adam) |
|
Att: 1 3 pgs Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Notice of Submission | ||
Friday, January 26, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
2
pgs
motion
Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim/FRCP12(b)(6) Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Fri 01/26 3:50 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by 3226 Magazine Properties, LLC, Jaimee Carreras, Jeffery Carreras. Motion(s) will be submitted on 2/21/2024.Attorney Douglas R. Kraus added to party Jaimee Carreras(pty:dft), Attorney Douglas R. Kraus added to party Jeffery Carreras(pty:dft).(Kraus, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 18 pgs Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Submission | ||
Tuesday, January 23, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
1
pgs
minutes
Status Conference
Wed 01/24 11:30 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld: Status Conference held on 1/23/2024. The parties discussed an issue that arose during a deposition. (lb) |
|
Wednesday, January 10, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
minutes
Status Conference
Wed 01/10 2:53 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael North: Status Conference held on 1/10/2024. For the reasons stated, the parties shall proceed as discussed at the conference. (cs) |
|
Wednesday, January 03, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
minutes
Telephone Conference Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction
Wed 01/03 5:02 PM
Minute Order. Proceedings held before Judge Lance M Africk: Telephone Conference held on 1/3/2024. ORDERED that all defendants shall file their answer(s) no later than 01/26/2024. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall confer to set a discovery schedule for limited discovery, as set forth herein. FURTHER ORDERED that, with plaintiffs' consent and based on the need to take limited discovery in connection with the motion, plaintiffs'8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is dismissed without prejudice to plaintiffs' right to re-urge it as appropriate after the parties' limited discovery is complete. (ko) |
|
8 | 8
3
pgs
motion
Preliminary Injunction
Wed 01/03 10:59 AM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by 2604 Magazine Properties, LLC, Kimberlee Banning. Motion(s) will be submitted on 2/7/2024.(Vickers, Adam) |
|
Att: 1 26 pgs Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 4 1 pgs Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 8, | ||
Att: 10 Notice of Submission | ||
Thursday, December 21, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 12/21 2:34 PM
ORDER granting6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint, as to 3226 Magazine Properties, LLC answer due 1/26/2024. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 12/21/2023. (ko) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 12/21 9:31 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by 3226 Magazine Properties, LLC.Attorney Douglas R. Kraus added to party 3226 Magazine Properties, LLC(pty:dft).(Kraus, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, December 12, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Tue 12/12 3:04 PM
Summons Issued as to 3226 Magazine Properties, LLC, Jaimee Carreras, Jeffery Carreras.(js) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
4 | 4
1
pgs
misc
AO 120 Report Regarding Patent & Trademark
Tue 12/12 2:59 PM
AO 120 Report Regarding Patent & Trademark. (js) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Tue 12/12 2:58 PM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re1 Complaint. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the Civil Cover Sheet or the Summons. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. (js) |
|
Monday, December 11, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Mon 12/11 4:03 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (mb) |
|
1 | 1
15
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 12/11 3:52 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against 3226 Magazine Properties, LLC, Jaimee Carreras, Jeffery Carreras (Fee previously paid) filed by Kimberlee K. Banning, 2604 Magazine Properties, LLC.Attorney Adam Vincent Vickers added to party 2604 Magazine Properties, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Adam Vincent Vickers added to party Kimberlee K. Banning(pty:pla).(Vickers, Adam) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons - Jaimee Carreras, | ||
Att: 3 Summons - Jeffery Carreras, | ||
Att: 4 Summons - 3226 Magazine Properties, | ||
Att: 5 6 pgs Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 6 10 pgs Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 7 12 pgs Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 8 8 pgs Exhibit D | ||
misc
Filing Fee Received
Mon 12/11 3:59 PM
Filing fee received from Adam Vincent Vickers: Receipt No. ALAEDC-10312496 $ 405.00 (mb) |