USA v. Ermin
New York Western District Court | |
Case #: | 1:23-mr-00552 |
Case Filed: | Dec 12, 2023 |
Last checked: Thursday Dec 14, 2023 2:22 AM EST |
Defendant
John Thomas Ermin (1)
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
USA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12/14/2023 3:02 AM EST |
Tuesday, December 12, 2023 | ||
1 | 1 MOTION Review of Magistrate Judge's Determination on Detention by USA as to John Thomas Ermin (23-mj-167). (LB) | |
2 | 2 TEXT ORDER as to John Thomas Ermin re the Government's1 Motion for Review of Magistrate Judge's Determination on Detention. The December 12, 2023 order of United States Magistrate Judge H. Kenneth Schroeder, Jr., releasing Defendant John Thomas Ermin is hereby STAYED until such time that the District Court can hear and determine the Government's motion for Review of the Magistrate Judge's Determination on Detention. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. on 12/12/2023. (KEF) |