California Central District Court
Judge:Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha
Referred: Alka Sagar
Case #: 2:23-cv-10644
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Dec 20, 2023
Terminated:Mar 01, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jun 17, 2024 1:20 AM PDT
Defendant
Elena Ayala
Defendant
Carniceria La Tapatia
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Jesus Garcia
Represented By
Kevin Hyunjong Hong
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason T. Yoon
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason J. Kim
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, March 01, 2024
15 15 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Fri 03/01 12:21 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by PLAINTIFF Jesus Garcia. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
14 14 13 pgs order Order Fri 03/01 11:20 AM
ORDER DECLINING SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION OVER THE STATE LAW CLAIMS by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: The court DECLINES to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiff's Unruh Act claim and related state law claims and dismisses those causes of action. As this action is now limited to Plaintiff's request for injunctive relief under the ADA, any trial in this action shall be tried by the court rather than by jury. (lc) Modified on 3/1/2024 (lc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
13 13 misc Response Thu 02/08 4:04 PM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Jesus Garciato Order to Show Cause11 re: Supplemental Jurisdiction(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Declaration
Friday, January 26, 2024
12 12 adr Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20) Fri 01/26 4:50 PM
Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (lc)
Related: [-]
11 11 3 pgs order Order to Show Cause Fri 01/26 3:51 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE COURT SHOULD EXERCISE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION OVER THE STATE LAW CLAIM by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 2/9/2024. (tf)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Fri 01/26 3:44 PM
STANDING ORDER RE PROSECUTION OF CERTAIN CASES UNDER THE AMERICAN WITH DISABILITIES ACT upon filing of the complaint by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Fri 01/26 3:41 PM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 12/21 10:09 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Elena Ayala, Carniceria La Tapatia. (et)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Thu 12/21 9:37 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Thu 12/21 9:37 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Thu 12/21 9:36 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (et)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
4 4 notice Summons Request Wed 12/20 12:14 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Jesus Garcia. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 12/20 12:12 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 12/20 12:12 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jesus Garcia. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 12/20 12:11 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: BCACDC-36608354 - Fee: $405. (Attorney Jason J. Kim added to party Jesus Garcia(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]