California Northern District Court
Judge:Vince Chhabria
Case #: 3:23-cv-06573
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Dec 21, 2023
Terminated:Jan 12, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 18, 2024 1:18 AM PDT
Defendant
Morteza Amiri
Defendant
Timothy Manly Williams
Defendant
Jonathan Ramirez
Defendant
Ryan Geis
Defendant
Deven Wenger
Defendant
Thomas Smith
Defendant
Eric Rombough
Defendant
Andrea Rodriguez
Defendant
Calvin Prieto
Defendant
Matthew Nutt
Defendant
Tony Morefield
Defendant
Moore
Defendant
Marcott
Defendant
Tom Lenderman
Defendant
Scott Duggar
Defendant
Jonathan Adams
Defendant
Loren Bledsoe
Defendant
Tammany Brooks
Defendant
City of Antioch
Defendant
Arron Hughes
Defendant
Josh Evans
Defendant
Steven Ford
Defendant
Robert Gerber
Defendant
Daniel Harris
Defendant
Kyle Hill
Plaintiff
Kaycee Suitter
Represented By
Benjamin Nisenbaum
Burris, Nisenbaum, Curry & Lacy, LLP
contact info
James Cook
Burris, Nisenbaum, Curry & Lacy, LLP
contact info
John L. Burris
Burris, Nisenbaum, Curry & Lacy, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Tahjay McCullough
Represented By
Benjamin Nisenbaum
Burris, Nisenbaum, Curry & Lacy, LLP
contact info
James Cook
Burris, Nisenbaum, Curry & Lacy, LLP
contact info
John L. Burris
Burris, Nisenbaum, Curry & Lacy, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Gregorio Yarborough
Represented By
Benjamin Nisenbaum
Burris, Nisenbaum, Curry & Lacy, LLP
contact info
James Cook
Burris, Nisenbaum, Curry & Lacy, LLP
contact info
John L. Burris
Burris, Nisenbaum, Curry & Lacy, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Quincy Mason
Represented By
Benjamin Nisenbaum
Burris, Nisenbaum, Curry & Lacy, LLP
contact info
James Cook
Burris, Nisenbaum, Curry & Lacy, LLP
contact info
John L. Burris
Burris, Nisenbaum, Curry & Lacy, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Danyel Earl Lacy
Represented By
Benjamin Nisenbaum
Burris, Nisenbaum, Curry & Lacy, LLP
contact info
James Cook
Burris, Nisenbaum, Curry & Lacy, LLP
contact info
John L. Burris
Burris, Nisenbaum, Curry & Lacy, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Shaquille Hillard
Represented By
Benjamin Nisenbaum
Burris, Nisenbaum, Curry & Lacy, LLP
contact info
James Cook
Burris, Nisenbaum, Curry & Lacy, LLP
contact info
John L. Burris
Burris, Nisenbaum, Curry & Lacy, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Marcell Lewis
Represented By
Benjamin Nisenbaum
Burris, Nisenbaum, Curry & Lacy, LLP
contact info
James Cook
Burris, Nisenbaum, Curry & Lacy, LLP
contact info
John L. Burris
Burris, Nisenbaum, Curry & Lacy, LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Dan Guise
Terminated: 12/28/2023


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, January 12, 2024
16 16 minutes Case Management Conference - Initial Tue 01/16 9:31 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vince Chhabria: Initial Case Management Conference held via Zoom on 1/12/2024. Court ordered 23-cv-06573-VC to be consolidated into 23-cv-01895-VC; the Clerk's office is directed to consolidate and close 23-cv-06573-VC. CASE REFERRED to randomly assigned Magistrate Judge for Discovery purposes. Parties to meet and confer and inform the Court within 7 days if they have a preference to a particular magistrate judge for settlement purposes. If no preference is made, Court to issue order referring case to a randomly assigned magistrate judge. Consolidated Amended Complaint due by 2/2/2024. Responses due by 2/23/2024. Proposed protective order due by 1/19/2024. Counsel may request the Court to issue an order requiring the U.S. Attorney's office to appear at the next CMC. Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/2/2024. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/16/2024 at 09:00 AM by Videoconference Only. CMC to be moved to 10:00AM if 2/16/2024 CMC calendar is light. Parties may file stipulation to continue CMC if parties deem there is nothing to discuss. Total Time in Court: 25 minutes. Court Reporter: Hearing recorded via Zoom: 10:08 - 10:33. Plaintiff Attorney: Ben Nisenbaum. Defendant Attorney: Tony Sain (Antioch), Todd Master (Amiri), Kristlenne Vicunna (Wenger), Steven Dippell (Prieto), Dale Allen (Rombough), John Robinson (Rodriguez), Noah Blechman (Williams). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bxs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/12/2024)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
15 15 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Thu 01/11 12:59 PM
REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/12/2024 at 10:00 AM by Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bxs, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
14 14 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 01/11 12:02 PM
Case Reassigned to Judge Vince Chhabria. Judge William H. Orrick no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
13 13 1 pgs order Order Thu 01/11 10:33 AM
ORDER RELATING CASES: 23-cv-01895-VC & 23-cv-06573-WHO. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 1/11/2024. (vclc3, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
12 12 service Summons Issued Tue 01/09 3:22 PM
Summons Issued as to Jonathan Adams, Morteza Amiri, Loren Bledsoe, Tammany Brooks, City of Antioch, Scott Duggar, Josh Evans, Steven Ford, Ryan Geis, Robert Gerber, Daniel Harris, Kyle Hill, Arron Hughes, Tom Lenderman, Marcott, Moore, Tony Morefield, Matthew Nutt, Calvin Prieto, Jonathan Ramirez, Andrea Rodriguez, Eric Rombough, Thomas Smith, Deven Wenger, Timothy Manly Williams. (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
11 11 misc Proposed Summons Mon 01/08 2:09 PM
Proposed Summons. (Cook, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
10 10 order Case Management Scheduling Order Fri 01/05 5:50 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 3/26/2024 02:00 PM via Videoconference. Case Management Statement due by 3/19/2024. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/05/2023. (jmd, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Fri 01/05 3:42 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . ***The Proposed Summons does not contain the address(es) for the listed defendants. Also, the summons has a defendant listed who was terminated from the case on 12/28/2023, following the filing of an Amended Complaint 4 . Please correct and re-file the Proposed Summons in its entirety.*** Re:9 Proposed Summons filed by Shaquille Hillard, Tahjay McCullough, Quincy Mason, Marcell Lewis, Kaycee Suitter, Danyel Earl Lacy, Gregorio Yarborough (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
9 9 misc Proposed Summons Thu 01/04 3:55 PM
Proposed Summons. (Cook, James)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 01/04 9:05 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 01/04/2024.(mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
7 7 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Wed 01/03 3:16 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (bxl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Wed 01/03 2:41 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by All Plaintiffs (Cook, James)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Wed 01/03 2:40 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Shaquille Hillard, Danyel Earl Lacy, Marcell Lewis, Quincy Mason, Tahjay McCullough, Kaycee Suitter, Gregorio Yarborough.. (Cook, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2023
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 12/28 1:42 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed by Tahjay McCullough, Danyel Earl Lacy, Shaquille Hillard, Quincy Mason, Kaycee Suitter, Marcell Lewis, Gregorio Yarborough. (Burris, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 22, 2023
3 3 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Fri 12/22 8:44 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/18/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/25/2024 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
2 2 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Thu 12/21 3:34 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/4/2024. (bw, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 12/21 1:58 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-18963458.). Filed by Tahjay McCullough, Danyel Lacy, Shaquille Hillard, Quincy Mason, Kaycee Suitter, Marcell Lewis, Gregorio Yarborough.(Burris, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet