Idaho District Court
Judge:Amanda K Brailsford
Case #: 1:23-cv-00575
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause05:75(2) Contract - Reduction in Grade
Case Filed:Dec 21, 2023
Terminated:Feb 06, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 18, 2024 2:23 AM MDT
Counter Claimant
Trixxi Clothing Company, Inc.
Represented By
Yuval M Rogson
The Rogson Firm
contact info
Counter Defendant
Velox Media, LLC
Represented By
Rebecca Marie Fitz
Givens Pursley LLP
contact info
Bradley J Dixon
Givens Pursley LLP
contact info
Defendant
Trixxi Clothing Company, Inc.
a California corporation 6817 E. Acco Street
Commerce, CA 90040
Represented By
Yuval M Rogson
The Rogson Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Velox Media, LLC
an Idaho limited liability company 518 S. 9th Street
Boise, ID 83702
Represented By
Rebecca Marie Fitz
Givens Pursley LLP
contact info
Bradley J Dixon
Givens Pursley LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Thursday, February 06, 2025
21 21 order Order Thu 02/06 6:10 PM
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER: The parties have filed a joint stipulation of dismissal of the entire action with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A), (Dkt.20 ), which was effective upon filing. See Wilson v. City of San Jose, 111 F.3d 688, 692 (9th Cir. 1997) (dismissal under Rule 41(a)(1)(A) is automatic, without court order). This case has been terminated. Signed by Judge Amanda K Brailsford. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (pdg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
20 20 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 02/05 2:09 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation for Dismissal of Entire Action With Prejudice by Trixxi Clothing Company, Inc.. (Rogson, Yuval)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
19 19 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Scheduling Order Tue 10/08 11:00 AM
ORDER AMENDING SCHEDULING ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties' Joint Stipulation and Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order (Dkt.18 ) is GRANTED and the Scheduling Order (Dkt.15 ) is amended as follows: Completion of Fact Discovery: All fact discovery must now be completed by January 21, 2025. Dispositive Motions Deadline: All dispositive motions, including motions for punitive damages, must now be filed by February 20, 2025. Alternative Dispute Resolution: ADR must now be held by November 15, 2024. Signed by Judge Amanda K Brailsford. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ac)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
18 18 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Mon 10/07 9:42 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Yuval M Rogson appearing for Counter Claimant Trixxi Clothing Company, Inc., Defendant Trixxi Clothing Company, Inc.. Responses due by 10/28/2024 (Rogson, Yuval)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
17 17 order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance Tue 08/20 6:11 PM
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving dkt.16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Nico Tabibi for Trixxi Clothing Company, Inc. Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ac)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Pro Hac Vice Appearance Mon 08/19 9:24 PM
MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Nico Tabibi. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2797890.)Yuval M Rogson appearing for Counter Claimant Trixxi Clothing Company, Inc., Defendant Trixxi Clothing Company, Inc.. Responses due by 9/9/2024 (Rogson, Yuval)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
15 15 order Scheduling Order Fri 03/01 11:17 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER - IT IS ORDERED the following deadlines and procedures govern this litigation: All dispositive motions and motions for punitive damages, must be filed by December 6, 2024. Motions to amend the pleadings, except for allegations of punitive damages, and motions to join parties must be filed on or before June 7, 2024. The parties have chosen to participate in mediation. ADR must be held by August 15, 2024. All fact discovery must be completed by November 6, 2024. Signed by Judge Amanda K Brailsford. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ac)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
14 14 misc Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form Thu 02/29 4:39 PM
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Velox Media, LLC. (Dixon, Bradley)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Discovery Plan Thu 02/29 4:37 PM
DISCOVERY PLAN by Velox Media, LLC . (Dixon, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
12 12 order Litigation Order Wed 02/21 4:27 PM
LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: The Court will conduct a telephonic scheduling conference on March 7, 2024, at 2:30 mountain time (Boise chambers), for purposes of confirming the deadlines proposed by the parties in the joint Litigation Plan. On or before February 29, 2024, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Amanda K Brailsford. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ac)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 02/21 9:38 AM
DOCKET TEXT NOTICE VACATING HEARING: This case has been reassigned to Judge Brailsford; therefore, the Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 3/7/2024 before Judge Dale is VACATED. (st)
Related: [-]
utility Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents Wed 02/21 9:29 AM
The 60 day deadline has expired. Case has been reassigned to a District Judge. No more notice of availability or assignment will be sent out. Consent deadline(s) termed. (ac)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Case Number Change Wed 02/21 9:31 AM
DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, Case reassigned to Judge Amanda K Brailsford for all further proceedings. US Magistrate Judge Candy W Dale no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 1:23-cv-00575-AKB (ac)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Mon 02/12 4:50 PM
NOTICE by Trixxi Clothing Company, Inc. of Unavailability of Counsel From March 15 - March 25 (Rogson, Yuval)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Consent Filed Mon 02/12 11:14 AM
Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (km)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
8 8 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 02/09 1:18 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Velox Media, LLC. (Dixon, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
notice Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 02/07 2:35 PM
DOCKET TEXT NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ac)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2024
7 7 answer Answer to Counterclaim Thu 01/18 2:04 PM
ANSWER to5 Counterclaim by Velox Media, LLC.(Dixon, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
6 6 order Litigation Order Tue 01/02 1:43 PM
LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - On or before February 29, 2024, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 3/7/2024 11:00 AM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Chambers before US Magistrate Judge Candy W Dale. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Candy W Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2023
5 5 cmp Counterclaim Thu 12/28 4:34 PM
COUNTERCLAIM against Velox Media, LLC, filed by Trixxi Clothing Company, Inc..(Rogson, Yuval)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Agreements
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 12/28 4:25 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Demand for Jury Trial by Trixxi Clothing Company, Inc..(Rogson, Yuval)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 22, 2023
3 3 notice Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline Fri 12/22 1:25 PM
NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Trixxi Clothing Company, Inc., Velox Media, LLC re. dkt.1 Notice of Removal. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 2/20/2024. (ac)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 12/21 4:54 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trixxi Clothing Company, Inc.. (Rogson, Yuval)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 12/21 4:42 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants Trixxi Clothing Company, Inc. (erroneously named as Trixxi Clothing, Inc. in State Court Complaint) from Ada County District Court, case number CV01 23-18575 (Filing fee $405 receipt numberAIDDC-2678627.), filed by All Defendants.(Rogson, Yuval)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Exhibit 1 (Summons),
Att: 2 State Court Complaint Exhibit 2 (Complaint),
Att: 3 State Court Docket Sheet Exhibit 3 (Docket),
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 (California Complaint),
Att: 5 Cover Sheet
service Return of Service/Process Assumed Fri 12/22 1:21 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - Trixxi Clothing Company, Inc. served on 12/21/2023. (service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (ac)
Related: [-]