Texas Western District Court
Case #: 3:23-cr-02506
Case Filed:Dec 20, 2023
Last checked: Friday Dec 22, 2023 1:36 AM CST
Defendant
Gustavo Alexis Enriquez-Acosta (2)
Defendant
Adam Isaiah Ramirez (1)
Represented By
Maria B. Ramirez
Law Office Of Maria B. Ramirez
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Adam R. Hines
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/22/2023 2:54 AM CST
Friday, October 27, 2023
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Leon Schydlower as to Adam Isaiah Ramirez (1), Gustavo Alexis Enriquez-Acosta (2), Edmundo Rodriguez-Padilla (3). (mg2) [3:23-mj-03453-LS]
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant Issued by Judge Leon Schydlower as to Adam Isaiah Ramirez. (mg2) (mg2). [3:23-mj-03453-LS]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (10/27/2023) Not for Public Disclosure
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
4 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Adam R. Hines appearing for USA. . Attorney Adam R. Hines added to party USA(pty:pla) (Hines, Adam) [3:23-mj-03453-LS]
Related: [-]
Saturday, November 18, 2023
Arrest of Adam Isaiah Ramirez in District of New Mexico. (dt) [3:23-mj-03453-LS]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
16 16 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Adam Isaiah Ramirez. (Hines, Adam) [3:23-mj-03453-LS]
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
Arrest of Adam Isaiah Ramirez (ll) [3:23-mj-03453-LS]
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: NO BOND SET as to Adam Isaiah Ramirez by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (ll) [3:23-mj-03453-LS]
Related: [-]
18 18 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Maria B. Ramirez for Adam Isaiah Ramirez appointed. Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (ll) [3:23-mj-03453-LS]
Related: [-]
19 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert F. Castaneda:Initial Appearance in Person as to Adam Isaiah Ramirez held on 11/27/2023 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), Spanish Language Interpreter NOT required as to Adam Isaiah Ramirez (Court Reporter ERO.) (ll) [3:23-mj-03453-LS]
Related: [-]
20 20 ORDER SETTING HEARING IN PERSON as to Adam Isaiah Ramirez, (Detention Hearing set for 11/30/2023 10:30 AM in El Paso before Judge Leon Schydlower, Preliminary Hearing set for 11/30/2023 10:30 AM in El Paso before Judge Leon Schydlower). Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (ll) [3:23-mj-03453-LS]
Related: [-]
21 21 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Adam Isaiah Ramirez (SEALED pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002). (ll) [3:23-mj-03453-LS]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
17 17 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 11/18/23 as to Adam Isaiah Ramirez. (dt) (mg2). [3:23-mj-03453-LS]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (11/30/2023) Warrant Executed
Thursday, November 30, 2023
22 22 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leon Schydlower:Preliminary Hearing as to Adam Isaiah Ramirez held on 11/30/2023 PROBABLE CAUSE FOUND (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), Detention Hearing as to Adam Isaiah Ramirez held on 11/30/2023 DETAINED WITHOUT BOND (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), Due Process Protections Act Warning given in Open Court as to Adam Isaiah Ramirez, Spanish Language Interpreter NOT required as to Adam Isaiah Ramirez (Court Reporter ERO.) (lg1) [3:23-mj-03453-LS]
Related: [-]
23 23 ORDER GRANTING16 Motion to Detain Defendant without Bond. DETAINED WITHOUT BOND as to Adam Isaiah Ramirez (1). Signed by Judge Leon Schydlower. (lg1) [3:23-mj-03453-LS]
Related: [-]
24 24 Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act as to Adam Isaiah Ramirez. Signed by Judge Leon Schydlower. (lg1) [3:23-mj-03453-LS]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Berton (bot2)
Related: [-]
25 25 INDICTMENT Related [+] with Notice of Forfeiture included as to as to all defendants. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Adam Isaiah Ramirez (1) count(s) 1, 2, Gustavo Alexis Enriquez-Acosta (2) count(s) 1, 2. (bot2)
Related: [-] dacted Version
27 27 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Adam Isaiah Ramirez (bot2)
Related: [-]
28 28 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Gustavo Alexis Enriquez-Acosta (bot2)
Related: [-]