Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:John M Younge
Case #: 2:23-cv-05094
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal- Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Dec 22, 2023
Terminated:Aug 15, 2024
Case in other court:Court of Common Pleas of Bucks County, 23-07361
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 19, 2024 5:42 AM EDT
Defendant
LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE
Represented By
RACHEL ROSE HAGER
Finazzo Cossolini O'Leary Meola & Hager, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
KMC DISTRIBUTORS, LLC
Represented By
MICHAEL HANDLEY
Rothberg Federman & Holister
contact info


Docket last updated: 90 minutes ago
Thursday, August 15, 2024
18 18 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case - 41(b) Fri 08/16 7:46 AM
ORDER OF 8/15/24 THAT IT HAVING BEEN REPORTED THAT THE ISSUES BETWEEN THE PARTIES IN THE A BOVE ACTION HAVE BEEN SETTLED AND UPON ORDER OF THE COURT, PURSUANT TO RULE 41.1(b) OF THE LRCP, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THIS ACTION IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, PURSUANT TO AGREEMENT OF COUNSEL WITHOUT COSTS. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS ON 8/15/24. 8/16/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)
Related: [-]
17 17 minutes Settlement Conference Fri 08/16 7:44 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS. A Video Settlement Conference was held on August 15, 2024, Not on the record. (DT)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 06/24 1:34 PM
ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 8/15/2024 02:00 PM Via Video Conference BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS ON 6/24/24. 6/24/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Order Mon 06/24 1:30 PM
ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR A CONFERENCE 14 IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS ON 6/24/24.6/24/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Order Mon 06/24 1:28 PM
JOINT MOTION FOR A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE.(bw)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
13 13 order Scheduling Order Mon 06/03 7:40 AM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: ALL FACTUAL DISCOVERY DUE BY 9/11/24. A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 3/25/2025 10:00 AM IN Video Conference BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN M. YOUNGE. ALL EXPERT DISCOVERY DUE BY 10/23/2024. ALL MOTIONS DUE BY 11/25/2024. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 11/25/2024. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 5/31/24. 6/3/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
12 12 misc Letter Thu 05/30 4:28 PM
Letter dated May 30, 2024 by LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE. (HAGER, RACHEL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
11 11 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge-Settlement Wed 03/13 10:55 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 1/23/2025 10:00 AM via Video Conference BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN M. YOUNGE., ALL FACT DISCOVERY DUE BY 7/11/24. ALL EXPERT DISCOVERY DUE BY 8/22/2024., ALL MOTIONS DUE BY 9/23/2024., MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR DAUBERT MOTIONS DUE BY 9/23/2024. THIS CASE IS REFERRED T0 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS FOR SETTLEMENT PURPOSES. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 3/13/24. 3/13/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
10 10 minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Wed 03/13 10:51 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN M. YOUNGE Pretrial Conference held on 3/13/24 (bw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
9 9 misc Report Of Wed 03/06 3:26 PM
Report Of Rule 26(f) Meeting by LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE. (HAGER, RACHEL)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
8 8 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 01/30 8:08 AM
ORDER THAT A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HAS BEEN SET FOR 3/13/2024 10:00 AM via Video Conference BEFORE HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 1/29/24. 1/30/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 01/29 10:07 AM
ANSWER to Complaint together with Affirmative Defenses by LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE.(HAGER, RACHEL)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 29, 2023
6 6 misc State Court Record - Attachment Tue 01/02 8:20 AM
State Court record received from Court of Common Pleas of Bucks County. (nd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2023
5 5 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 12/28 10:40 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE TIME IN WHICH DEFENDANT, LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE, MAY MOVE, ANSWER, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT, BE EXTENDED UP TO AND INCLUDING 1/29/2024. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 12/28/23. 12/28/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
4 4 misc Stipulation Wed 12/27 3:09 PM
STIPULATION Extending Defendant Ohio Security Insurance Company's Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE. (HAGER, RACHEL)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 22, 2023
3 3 discov Disclosure of Citizenship Fri 12/22 10:19 AM
Disclosure of Citizenship in Diversity Cases by LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE . (HAGER, RACHEL)
Related: [-]
2 2 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Fri 12/22 10:15 AM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc. with Certificate of Service by LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE.(HAGER, RACHEL)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal (Attorney) Fri 12/22 10:08 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17150342), filed by LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE.(HAGER, RACHEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal - Bucks County Pleadings,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Designation Form