Umpa v. National Association of Realtors et al **This matter has been consolidated with 4:23-cv-00788-SRB and all future filings shall be made in case number 4:23-cv-00788-SRB.
Missouri Western District Court | |
Judge: | Stephen R Bough |
Case #: | 4:23-cv-00945 |
Nature of Suit | 410 Other Statutes - Antitrust |
Cause | 15:1 Antitrust Litigation |
Case Filed: | Dec 27, 2023 |
Terminated: | Apr 24, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Jun 24, 2024 3:35 AM CDT |
Defendant
National Association of Realtors
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Exp Realty, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
eXp World Holdings, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Weichert Realtors
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United Real Estate
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Real Brokerage, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Long & Foster Companies, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Redfin Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Realty ONE Group, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Real Broker, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Keller Williams Realty, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
HomeSmart International, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
HomeServices of America, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Hanna Holdings, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
HSF Affiliates, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Douglas Elliman, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Douglas Elliman Realty, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Compass, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BHH Affiliates, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
At World Properties, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Umpa
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
248 | 248
order
Order ~Util - Case Stayed
Wed 04/24 8:36 AM
Before the Court is a Notice of Pending Settlement and Joint Motion to Stay Case as to Realty One Group, Inc. (Doc. #247 .) Accordingly, the deadlines and proceedings in this case as they pertain to Defendant Realty One Group, Inc. are hereby STAYED. Signed on 4/24/2024 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Peters, Tracey) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
247 | 247
4
pgs
notice
Notice of Settlement
Tue 04/23 7:58 PM
NOTICE of settlement Notice of Pending Settlement and Joint Motion to Stay as to Defendant Realty One Group, Inc. by Realty ONE Group, Inc. (Caseria, Leo) |
|
246 | 246
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Order on Motion to Reassign/Transfer Case
Tue 04/23 4:47 PM
Plaintiffs filed a Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(2) in Gibson, et al. v. National Association of Realtors, Case No. 4:23-cv-00788-SRB. (Doc. #146.) Consequently, Defendants' 12(b)(2) and (b)(3) motions (Doc. #164 ; Doc. #171 ; Doc. #174 ; Doc. #180 ; Doc. #182 ; Doc. #185 ; Doc. #187 ; Doc. #195 ; Doc. #199 ) are DENIED AS MOOT and WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed on 4/23/24 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Peters, Tracey) |
|
245 | 245
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Tue 04/23 11:38 AM
Before the Court is Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Consolidate and for Leave to File Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. (Doc. #244 .) Upon review, the motion is GRANTED. Signed on 4/23/24 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Peters, Tracey) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
244 | 244
motion
Consolidate Cases Amend/Correct
Fri 04/19 10:29 PM
Consent MOTION to consolidate cases Gibson, No. 23-cv-788 and Umpa, No. 23-cv-0945 , Consent MOTION to amend/correct Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Robert A Braun on behalf of Daniel Umpa. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/3/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Braun, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint | ||
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
243 | 243
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 04/18 11:46 AM
Before the Court is Plaintiff's Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to Motions to Dismiss Based on Venue and Personal Jurisdiction. (Doc. #241 .) For good cause shown, the motion is GRANTED. Plaintiff's responses to Defendants' 12(b)(2) and (b)(3) motions (Doc. #164 ; Doc. #171 ; Doc. #174 ; Doc. #180 ; Doc. #182 ; Doc. #185 ; Doc. #187 ; Doc. #195 ; Doc. #199 ) shall tentatively be due on or before May 10, 2024, pending the resolution of Plaintiff's forthcoming motion to consolidate. Signed on 4/18/2024 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Peters, Tracey) |
|
242 | 242
respm
Suggestions in Opposition to Motion
Thu 04/18 10:34 AM
SUGGESTIONS in opposition re241 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to185 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction ,164 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction or, in the Alternative MOTION to reassign/transfer case ,195 filed by David Gringer on behalf of Defendant Hanna Holdings, Inc.. Reply suggestions due by 5/2/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Gringer, David) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
241 | 241
5
pgs
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 04/17 6:04 PM
MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to185 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction ,164 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction or, in the Alternative MOTION to reassign/transfer case ,195 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and failure to state cause of action ,187 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction ,171 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and improper venue ,180 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction ,182 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction ,174 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction ,199 Amended MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and Improper Venue filed by Steve W. Berman on behalf of Daniel Umpa. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/1/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Berman, Steve) |