New York Southern District Court
Judge:Ona T Wang
Case #: 1:23-cv-11256
Nature of Suit462 Immigration - Naturalization Application
Cause8:1446 Petition for Naturalization Hearing
Case Filed:Dec 28, 2023
Terminated:Jan 16, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Jun 30, 2024 4:57 AM EDT
Petitioner
Marek Jacek Wozniak
26 Lonergan Road
Suffern, NY 10901
Represented By
Richard A. Vrhovc, JR
Richard A. Vrhovc
contact info
Respondent
Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By
Courtney Elizabeth Moran
Doj-Civ
contact info
Respondent
Ur M. Jaddou
Represented By
Courtney Elizabeth Moran
Doj-Civ
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, January 16, 2025
27 27 order Stipulation and Order of Dismissal Thu 01/16 11:37 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the parties, that this Action is hereby dismissed with prejudice and without costs or fees to any party pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED that this Stipulation may be signed in counterparts, each of which constitutes an original and all of which constitute one and the same Stipulation. Facsimiles and /or PDFs of signatures shall have the same force and effect as original signatures and constitute acceptable, binding signatures for purposes of the Stipulation. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 1/16/2025) (rro)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
26 26 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/15 2:18 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Leslie A. Ramirez-Fisher on behalf of Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur M. Jaddou..(Ramirez-Fisher, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
25 25 misc Proposed Stipulation and Order Tue 01/14 4:50 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur M. Jaddou..(Kristofcak, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
24 24 3 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Thu 12/19 12:26 PM
INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: An Initial Pretrial Conference in accordance with Rule 16(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure will be held on Thursday, January 23, 2025 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 20D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007. Initial Conference set for 1/23/2025 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 20D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 12/19/2024) (rro)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
23 23 misc Proposed Case Management Plan Tue 11/26 4:22 PM
PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur M. Jaddou..(Kristofcak, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/22 3:23 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander Kristofcak on behalf of Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur M. Jaddou..(Kristofcak, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
21 21 notice Notice of Substitution of Attorney Thu 11/21 1:31 PM
NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: Courtney Moran, New Attorney: Leslie A. Ramirez-Fisher, Address: United States Attorney, Southern District of New York, 86 Chambers Street, Third Floor, New York, New York, US 10007, 212 637 0378. Document filed by Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur M. Jaddou..(Ramirez-Fisher, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
20 20 answer Response to Petition (Other) Fri 06/21 4:58 PM
RESPONSE to1 Petition (Other),. Document filed by Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur M. Jaddou..(Moran, Courtney)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
19 19 order Scheduling Order Fri 05/17 3:24 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The Government shall file its response to the Petition by June 21, 2024. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang) (Text Only Order) (ada)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
18 18 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Mon 04/01 3:39 PM
NOTICE, CONSENT, AND REFERENCE OF A CIVIL ACTION TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur M. Jaddou, Marek Jacek Wozniak. (Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge) CASE ASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. IT IS ORDERED: This case is referred to a United States magistrate judge to conduct all proceedings and order the entry of a final judgment in accordance with 28 U.S.C. § 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73. (Signed by Judge Dale E. Ho on 4/1/2024).(ks)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 31, 2024
17 17 misc Proposed Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Sun 03/31 10:01 PM
PROPOSED CONSENT TO JURISDICTION BY US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur M. Jaddou. Document filed by Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur M. Jaddou..(Moran, Courtney)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Proposed Case Management Plan Sun 03/31 9:58 PM
PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur M. Jaddou..(Moran, Courtney)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Status Report Sun 03/31 9:57 PM
STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur M. Jaddou..(Moran, Courtney)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Thu 02/29 11:37 AM
ORDER granting13 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. Application GRANTED. The parties shall file the required letter by April 1, 2024. The Government's deadline to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is ADJOURNED, sine die. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Dale E. Ho on 2/29/2024) (ks)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Document Wed 02/28 4:30 PM
CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File a joint status letter and proposed case management plan addressed to Judge Dale E. Ho from Courtney E. Moran dated February 28, 2024. Document filed by Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur M. Jaddou..(Moran, Courtney)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
12 12 2 pgs order Order Thu 02/08 12:53 PM
ORDER On December 28, 2023, Plaintiff filed a Petition for Review of his Naturalization Application, seeking review of the United States Customs and Immigration Services' denial of his application for naturalization. See Dkt. No. 1. On February 2, 2024, Defendants appeared. See Dkt. No. 11. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and file a joint status letter by March 1, 2024. Such letter shall state whether the parties anticipate needing discovery in this matter, and if so, the parties shall attach a proposed case management plan, available at the Courts website, https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-dale-e-ho. The letter shall also state whether either party intends to file a dispositive motion, and if so, shall provide a proposed briefing schedule on any such motion. To the extent possible, the parties shall offer a joint proposal; alternatively, the parties may offer competing proposals. The letter shall further state whether the parties request a referral for alternative dispute resolution through the District's Mediation Program or before the assigned Magistrate Judge. The letter shall finally include any other information relevant to resolving this case, whether through settlement, trial, or dispositive motion practice. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Dale E. Ho on 2/8/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/02 3:27 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Courtney Elizabeth Moran on behalf of Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur M. Jaddou..(Moran, Courtney)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
10 10 service Summons Issued Tue 01/23 2:49 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur M. Jaddou..(pc)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
9 9 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 01/22 1:43 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alejandro Mayorkas, In His Capacity as Secretary, US Dept. of Homeland Security and Ur M. Jaddou, In Her Capacity as Director, US Citizenship and Immigration Services, re:1 Petition (Other),. Document filed by Marek Jacek Wozniak..(Vrhovc, Richard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2024
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 01/18 2:23 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Richard A. Vrhovc, JR to RE-FILE Document No. 7 Request for Issuance of Summons, 8 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Defendant party name text listed on Summons PDF and Summons Caption does not correspond to pleading caption. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
8 8 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 01/17 2:47 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ur Jaddou, In her Capacity as Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, re:1 Petition (Other),. Document filed by Marek Jacek Wozniak..(Vrhovc, Richard)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 01/17 2:45 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alejandro Mayorkas, in his Capacity as Secretary of USDHS, re:1 Petition (Other),. Document filed by Marek Jacek Wozniak..(Vrhovc, Richard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 01/16 1:59 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Richard A. Vrhovc, JR to RE-FILE Document No. 5 Request for Issuance of Summons, 6 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the wrong filer/filers were selected for the request for issuance of summons; Summons caption title does not exactly match Petition caption title (plaintiff);. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 15, 2024
6 6 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 01/15 7:31 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ur Jaddaou, In her Capacity as Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, re:1 Petition (Other),. Document filed by Marek Jacek Wozniak..(Vrhovc, Richard)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 01/15 7:30 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alejandro Mayorkas, in his Capacity as Secretary of USDHS, re:1 Petition (Other),. Document filed by Marek Jacek Wozniak..(Vrhovc, Richard)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 01/15 7:17 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Vrhovc, Richard)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 29, 2023
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Fri 12/29 11:31 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Richard A. Vrhovc, JR. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Marek Jacek Wozniak, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, UR M. JADDOU. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted; party role was entered incorrectly. (vf)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet Fri 12/29 11:32 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Richard A. Vrhovc, JR to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The Form is Blank. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (vf)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Fri 12/29 11:33 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Dale E. Ho. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Fri 12/29 11:34 AM
Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 12/29 11:34 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 12/29 11:40 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Richard A. Vrhovc, JR to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Defendant party names listed on Summons PDF Rider and party text listed on Summons Caption do not correspond to pleading caption. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2023
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 12/28 4:39 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alejandro Mayorkas, in his Capacity as Secretary of USDHS; Ur M. Jaddou, in her Capacity as Director, USCIS, re:1 Petition (Other),. Document filed by Marek Jacek Wozniak..(Vrhovc, Richard)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 12/28 3:59 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Vrhovc, Richard)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition (Other) Thu 12/28 3:54 PM
PETITION REVIEW OF NATURALIZATION APPLICATION. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28748007).Document filed by Marek Jacek Wozniak..(Vrhovc, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-LPR card,
Att: 2 Exhibit B-N-400 Natz Application,
Att: 3 Exhibit C-Nov.3,2020 Denial,
Att: 4 Exhibit D-Sept.11,2023 Denial,
Att: 5 Exhibit E-485 AdjustmentApp,
Att: 6 Exhibit F-LaborCertApp#1-4/30/2001,
Att: 7 Exhibit G-LaborCertApp#2,
Att: 8 Exhibit H-Denial of I-140,
Att: 9 Exhibit I-I-130Approval