O'Guynn et al v. The 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-06973 |
Nature of Suit | 245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Dec 28, 2023 |
Case in other court: | New York Southern, 1:23-cv-10700 |
Last checked: Saturday Jun 29, 2024 6:12 AM EDT |
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products, LP
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
The 3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
E. I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Doe Defendants 1-20
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
as successor in interest to Sandoz Chemical Corporation 4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Archroma U.S. Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Plaintiff
Katherine Small
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Allen Peterson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Harolyn Polion
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eugene Quillia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Reyna
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tracy Sherrod-Bryce
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eva Shirley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Neal Slocum
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Pearson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bradford Snowney
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Felix StanKiewicz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edwin Summons
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gregory Argetsinger
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Conrad Cheeseboro
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Conklin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Melissa Caulder
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leandra Patin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Ofair
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Allen O'Guynn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Crisco
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Obie Mitchell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mary Millon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dominick Lanzilotta
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andrew Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ivan Hathaway
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffrey Harper
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gregory Goodrich
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Fagan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Corey Barnes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Julie Barrio
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Allen Bieber
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Plaintiff
Guy Pouvesle
Terminated: 04/02/2024
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pamela Coope
Terminated: 06/05/2024
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, August 23, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 08/23 2:54 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Allen Bieber, Gregory Goodrich, Eugene Quillia, Thomas Reyna, Tracy Sherrod-Bryce, Felix StanKiewicz, Barbara Bowens, Cornell Galloway, Kevin McKoy, Eddie Webb, Carlos Ramos, Beverly Thoman, Ronald Hale, Rita Brown, Tommy Dennard, Gregory Douglas, Kenneth Duchateau, Asuncion Fisher, Kenneth Ivey, Ramon Luciano, Jr, George Mitchell, David Wade, Aaron Bell, Emalynn Bell, Lacey Bell, Alivia Bell, Alexis Carroll, Andrea Carroll, Lorenzo Barnett, Robert Brown, Aldrich Cherry, Donald Cohen, Jacques Corvoisier, Milton Hammon, Sean Scaggs, Rodney Wayne Halstead, James Fragale, Vinson Reynoso, Edward Proctor, Lawrence Ahlin, Chad Brown, Chester Jones, Benjamin Romero, Troy Adams, Monte Allred, Bruce Brown, Bernice Gadson, Ernest Stringer Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice As to Personal Injury Claims OnlyAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Lanciotti, Patrick) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 08/13 5:22 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Frederick Bowen, Surjell Brickhouse, Dexter Day, Dennis Delisle, Gay Gallegos, Bonnie Heavener, Dan Higginbottom, Karl Landgren, Jesse Ramosmuller, John Rodgers, Christopher Conklin, Thomas McPherson, Robert Rowe, Robert Conway, Wade Ostrander, Jesus Ramos, Robert J. Bailor, Raquia T Sawyer, Thomas D. Ventura, Gilbert Williams, James Dawson, DEWAYNE WILLIAMS, Harold Dehnisch, Willie Manning, Mitchel Ursich, David Daniel, Cynthia Edwards, Richard Manion, James Montgomery, Larry Thornton, David Thorson, William Carroll, Andrew Fusco, Victor Kapunscinski, Edward Lulkovitz, Robert E. Otdway, James Randall, John Reed, Robert Slade, Jerome Stubbs, Vivian Stubbs, Sabrina Sykes, Cedric Hayes, Carolyn Mines, Urban Queen, Gregory Turner Without Prejudice, as to Listed PlaintiffsAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Mindicino, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Tuesday, May 28, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 05/28 1:05 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Pamela Coope Without Prejudice Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-06973-RMG(Lanciotti, Patrick) |
|
Tuesday, April 02, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 04/02 2:57 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Guy Pouvesle Without Prejudice Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-06973-RMG(Lanciotti, Patrick) |
|
Friday, December 29, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Fri 12/29 5:24 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Southern (associated as of 12/28/2023), 1:23-cv-10700, O'Guynn et al v. The 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-06973-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
8 | 8
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Fri 12/29 5:19 PM
Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:23-cv-10700. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Thursday, December 28, 2023 | ||
7 | 7 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina. (Signed by MDL Panel on 12/27/2023) (vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/29/2023.] | |
MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina.(vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/29/2023.] | ||
Monday, December 18, 2023 | ||
6 | 6 ORDER granting5 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. GRANTED. In the event the case has not by then been transferred to another district, counsel are to write the Court a status letter due January 24, 2024. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 12/15/2023) (ks) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/29/2023.] | |
Thursday, December 14, 2023 | ||
5 | 5 CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Jordan Sagalowsky and Patrick J. Lanciotti dated December 14, 2023. Document filed by The 3M Company..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/29/2023.] | |
Monday, December 11, 2023 | ||
4 | 4 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 12/20/2023 at 11:00 AM before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. The parties should call into the Court's dedicated conference line at (888) 363-4749, and enter Access Code 468-4906, followed by the pound (#) key. The parties should call into the Court's dedicated conference line at (888) 363-4749, and enter Access Code 468-4906, followed by the pound (#) key. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 12/11/2023) (ks) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/29/2023.] | |
Friday, December 08, 2023 | ||
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jordan David Sagalowsky. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: The 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co.). The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was modified to add alias separately. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/29/2023.] | ||
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/29/2023.] | ||
Magistrate Judge Gary Stein is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/29/2023.] | ||
Case Designated ECF. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/29/2023.] | ||
Thursday, December 07, 2023 | ||
3 | 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co.)..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/29/2023.] | |
2 | 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/29/2023.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 160262/2023. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28667127).Document filed by The 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co.)..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/29/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - O'Guynn Complaint |