Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02738

New Jersey District Court
Judge:Michael A Shipp
Referred: Rukhsanah L Singh
Case #: 3:24-cv-00046
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jan 04, 2024
Case in other court:District of Columbia, 1:23-cv-03049
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 02, 2024 4:45 AM EDT
Defendant
JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC
Defendant
JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Represented By
SUSAN M. SHARKO
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Defendant
JOHNSON & JOHNSON HOLDCO (NA) INC
Defendant
KENVUE INC
Defendant
LTL MANAGEMENT LLC
Defendant
PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL
Represented By
GINO PETER MECOLI
Reilly, Janiczek, Mcdevitt, Henrich & Cholden, PC
contact info
In Re
JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES & PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Plaintiff
DONNA WEEKS
Represented By
PATRICIA LEIGH O'DELL
Counsel Not Admitted To Usdc-Nj Bar
contact info
MICHELLE A. PARFITT
Counsel Not Admitted To Usdc-Nj Bar
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/09 9:28 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by GINO PETER MECOLI on behalf of PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL (MECOLI, GINO)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/23 2:56 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN M. SHARKO on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON (SHARKO, SUSAN)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
8 8 misc Short Form Complaint (no fee) Fri 01/26 3:38 PM
Short Form Complaint by DONNA WEEKS. (O'DELL, PATRICIA)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/26 3:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICIA LEIGH O'DELL on behalf of DONNA WEEKS (O'DELL, PATRICIA)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
mdl MDL Direct File Fri 01/05 12:18 PM
Member Case Direct File on 1/4/2024, for MDL 2738 Party JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES & PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION added. (jdg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
6 6 transfer Case Transferred In - District Court Transfer Thu 01/04 3:02 PM
Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:23-cv-03049. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 01/04 4:47 PM
Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh added. (jdg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
5 5 mdl MDL Notice to Counsel Thu 01/04 1:59 PM
EMAIL from the U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey requesting the transfer of the original file to be sent using the extract civil case feature of CM/ECF. (ztnr)
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Transfer Case Thu 01/04 1:55 PM
CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-287), dated 1/3/2024, from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directing the transfer to the U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Michael A. Shipp for coordinated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407.(MDL 2738) (ztnr)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2023
3 3 SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants.(znmw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice and Consent
2 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by DONNA WEEKS. Case related to Case No. 1:21-cv-02760 and MDL No. 2738. (Parfitt, Michelle)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON HOLDCO (NA) INC., KENVUE INC., LTL MANAGEMENT LLC., PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10417887) filed by DONNA WEEKS.(Parfitt, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons JJ,
Att: 3 Summons JJ HoldCo,
Att: 4 Summons LTL,
Att: 5 Summons Janssen,
Att: 6 Summons Kenvue,
Att: 7 Summons PCPC
Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (znmw)
Related: [-]