Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Robert W Schroeder, III
Referred: James Boone Baxter
Case #: 5:24-cv-00003
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:Jan 04, 2024
Terminated:Oct 01, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
14 14 order Judgment Tue 10/01 2:50 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT. It is ORDERED that the above-captioned case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to exhaust state remedies. It is further ORDERED that any pending motions in the above-captioned case are DENIED-AS-MOOT. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 10/1/2024. (slo)
Related: [-]
13 13 2 pgs order Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Tue 10/01 2:48 PM
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for12 Report and Recommendations. It is ORDERED that the above-captioned petition for writ of habeas corpus is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to exhaust state remedies. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 10/1/2024. (slo)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
12 12 motion Report and Recommendations Fri 08/30 3:01 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re1 Complaint filed by Rickey W. Smith. Objections due within 14 days of receipt. Signed by Magistrate Judge James Boone Baxter on 8/30/2024. (slo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 07/24 2:57 PM
ORDER The Petitioner Rickey W. Smith has filed a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this habeas corpus proceeding. Because Petitioner has paid the statutory $5.00 filing fee, an application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is not necessary. It is accordingly ORDERED that the Petitioner's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Dkt. No.10 ) is DENIED as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge James Boone Baxter on 7/24/2024. (psm)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
10 10 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 07/15 12:29 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (with trust fund data sheet) by Rickey W. Smith.(slo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Errata
Thursday, June 06, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Change of Address Thu 06/06 10:05 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Rickey W. Smith. Adress changed from Estelle Unit to Telford Unit, 3899 State Hwy 98, New Boston, TX 75570.(slo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Monday, April 29, 2024
misc Filing Fee Received Mon 04/29 3:58 PM
Filing fee received: $ 5, receipt number 6-67056 (gsm)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Change of Address Mon 04/01 10:51 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Rickey W. Smith. New address: Estelle Unit D-1-104B, 264 FM 3478, Huntsville, TX 77320-3320(SLO)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Monday, March 11, 2024
7 7 notice Notice (Other) Mon 03/11 10:12 AM
NOTICE by Rickey W. Smith re3 Order. ($5.00 fee requested to be forwarded to US District Court)(slo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
6 6 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Mon 03/11 10:10 AM
PETITION (Amended) for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Rickey W. Smith.(slo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
5 5 service Acknowledgment of Receipt Tue 01/30 11:01 AM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Rickey W. Smith on 1/25/2024 as to3 Order,4 Order. (slo)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
4 4 2 pgs order Order Fri 01/19 1:17 PM
ORDER. It is ORDERED that the Petitioner shall have thirty days in which to file an amended petition, setting forth with particularity the conviction or other action which he is challenging, the grounds upon which he seeks relief and the facts upon which he relies for each ground of relief. Signed by Magistrate Judge James Boone Baxter on 1/19/2024. (slo)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs order Order Fri 01/19 1:14 PM
ORDER. It is ORDERED that the Petitioner shall have 30 days from the date of receipt of this order in which to either: (1) pay the statutory $5.00 filing fee, or (2) furnish an application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis which is accompanied by a properly certified in forma pauperis data sheet or inmate account record. Signed by Magistrate Judge James Boone Baxter on 1/19/2024. (slo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 01/04 3:23 PM
COMPLAINT against Darren Anderson, Jerry Rochelle filed by Rickey W. Smith. ( No filing fee or Motion for IFP received.)(slo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 01/04 3:25 PM
STANDING ORDER REFERRING PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS CASES to Magistrate Judge James Boone Baxter for all pretrial matters.. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 1/4/2024. (slo)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Availability Thu 01/04 3:25 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (slo)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Thu 01/04 3:26 PM
Sent Consent to Magistrate, Docket sheet and Prose guidelines, that include information regarding reporting change of address to court, to the Petitioner per Magistrate Judge (slo)
Related: [-]