Consolidated
Lead case: 1:23-cv-08292

New York Southern District Court
Judge:Sidney H Stein
Referred: Ona T Wang
Case #: 1:24-cv-00084
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:501 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Jan 05, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jul 05, 2024 4:34 AM EDT
Defendant
OAI Corporation, LLC
Represented By
Robert A. Van Nest
Keker & Van Nest LLP
contact info
Michelle S. Ybarra
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Allison Levine Stillman
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Sarang Damle
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Joseph Richard Wetzel, Jr.,
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Andrew Gass
Latham & Watkins, Llp (sanfran)
contact info
Thomas Edward Gorman
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Elana Nightingale Dawson
Latham & Watkins
contact info
Paven Malhotra
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
R. James Slaughter
Keker & Van Nest, LLP
contact info
Katie Lynn Joyce
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Andrew L. Perito
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Vera Ranieri
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Nicholas S Goldberg
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Allyson R. Bennett
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Defendant
OpenAI GP, LLC
Represented By
Robert A. Van Nest
Keker & Van Nest LLP
contact info
Michelle S. Ybarra
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Allison Levine Stillman
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Sarang Damle
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Joseph Richard Wetzel, Jr.,
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Andrew Gass
Latham & Watkins, Llp (sanfran)
contact info
Thomas Edward Gorman
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Elana Nightingale Dawson
Latham & Watkins
contact info
Paven Malhotra
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
R. James Slaughter
Keker & Van Nest, LLP
contact info
Katie Lynn Joyce
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Andrew L. Perito
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Vera Ranieri
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Nicholas S Goldberg
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Allyson R. Bennett
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Defendant
OpenAI Global LLC
Represented By
Robert A. Van Nest
Keker & Van Nest LLP
contact info
Michelle S. Ybarra
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Allison Levine Stillman
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Sarang Damle
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Joseph Richard Wetzel, Jr.,
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Andrew Gass
Latham & Watkins, Llp (sanfran)
contact info
Thomas Edward Gorman
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Elana Nightingale Dawson
Latham & Watkins
contact info
Paven Malhotra
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
R. James Slaughter
Keker & Van Nest, LLP
contact info
Katie Lynn Joyce
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Andrew L. Perito
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Vera Ranieri
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Nicholas S Goldberg
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Allyson R. Bennett
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Defendant
OpenAI Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Robert A. Van Nest
Keker & Van Nest LLP
contact info
Michelle S. Ybarra
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Allison Levine Stillman
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Sarang Damle
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Joseph Richard Wetzel, Jr.,
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Andrew Gass
Latham & Watkins, Llp (sanfran)
contact info
Thomas Edward Gorman
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Elana Nightingale Dawson
Latham & Watkins
contact info
Paven Malhotra
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
R. James Slaughter
Keker & Van Nest, LLP
contact info
Katie Lynn Joyce
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Andrew L. Perito
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Vera Ranieri
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Nicholas S Goldberg
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Allyson R. Bennett
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Defendant
OpenAI LLC
Represented By
Robert A. Van Nest
Keker & Van Nest LLP
contact info
Michelle S. Ybarra
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Allison Levine Stillman
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Sarang Damle
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Joseph Richard Wetzel, Jr.,
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Andrew Gass
Latham & Watkins, Llp (sanfran)
contact info
Thomas Edward Gorman
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Elana Nightingale Dawson
Latham & Watkins
contact info
Paven Malhotra
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
R. James Slaughter
Keker & Van Nest, LLP
contact info
Katie Lynn Joyce
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Andrew L. Perito
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Vera Ranieri
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Nicholas S Goldberg
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Allyson R. Bennett
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Defendant
OpenAI OpCo LLC
Represented By
Robert A. Van Nest
Keker & Van Nest LLP
contact info
Michelle S. Ybarra
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Allison Levine Stillman
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Sarang Damle
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Joseph Richard Wetzel, Jr.,
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Andrew Gass
Latham & Watkins, Llp (sanfran)
contact info
Thomas Edward Gorman
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Elana Nightingale Dawson
Latham & Watkins
contact info
Paven Malhotra
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
R. James Slaughter
Keker & Van Nest, LLP
contact info
Katie Lynn Joyce
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Andrew L. Perito
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Vera Ranieri
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Nicholas S Goldberg
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Allyson R. Bennett
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Defendant
OpenAI, Inc.
Represented By
Robert A. Van Nest
Keker & Van Nest LLP
contact info
Michelle S. Ybarra
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Allison Levine Stillman
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Sarang Damle
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Joseph Richard Wetzel, Jr.,
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Andrew Gass
Latham & Watkins, Llp (sanfran)
contact info
Thomas Edward Gorman
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Elana Nightingale Dawson
Latham & Watkins
contact info
Paven Malhotra
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
R. James Slaughter
Keker & Van Nest, LLP
contact info
Katie Lynn Joyce
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Andrew L. Perito
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Vera Ranieri
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Nicholas S Goldberg
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Allyson R. Bennett
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Defendant
Microsoft Corporation
Represented By
Annette Louise Hurst
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe Llp (san Francisco)
contact info
Jared Barrett Briant
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Laura Brooks Najemy
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
contact info
Jeffrey S. Jacobson
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Sheryl Koval Garko
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Jonathan Alter
Interested Party
Authors Guild
Plaintiff
Nicholas Ngagoyeanes
Represented By
Michael Philip Richter
Grant Herrmann Schwartz & Klinger LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Nicholas A. Basbanes
Represented By
Michael Philip Richter
Grant Herrmann Schwartz & Klinger LLP
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
DAVID HENRY HWANG
Represented By
Christopher James Hydal
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
ANDREW SEAN GREER
Represented By
Christopher James Hydal
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Christopher Golden
Represented By
Christopher James Hydal
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
MATTHEW KLAM
Represented By
Christopher James Hydal
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Richard Kadrey
Represented By
Christopher James Hydal
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
LIPPMAN LAURA
Represented By
Christopher James Hydal
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
JUNOT DAZ
Represented By
Christopher James Hydal
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
TA-NEHISI COATES
Represented By
Christopher James Hydal
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
RACHEL LOUISE SNYDER
Represented By
Christopher James Hydal
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Sarah Silverman
Represented By
Christopher James Hydal
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Paul Tremblay
Represented By
Christopher James Hydal
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
AYELET WALDMAN
Represented By
Christopher James Hydal
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
JACQUELINE WOODSON
Represented By
Christopher James Hydal
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
MICHAEL CHABON
Represented By
Christopher James Hydal
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
misc Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion Tue 04/08 10:06 AM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. (350 in 1:23-cv-10211-SHS-OTW, 157 in 1:24-cv-00084-SHS-OTW, 399 in 1:23-cv-08292-SHS-OTW) MOTION for Olivia Caroline Malone to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-30893556. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-08292-SHS-OTW, 1:23-cv-10211-SHS-OTW, 1:24-cv-00084-SHS-OTW(rju)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
157 157 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/07 5:23 PM
MOTION for Olivia Caroline Malone to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-30893556. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by OAI Corporation, LLC, OpenAI GP, LLC, OpenAI Global LLC, OpenAI Holdings, LLC, OpenAI LLC, OpenAI OpCo LLC, OpenAI, Inc., OAI Corporation LLC, OpenAI GP LLC, OpenAI Holdings LLC, OpenAI Inc., OpenAI LP, OpenAI Startup Fund GP I LLC, OpenAI Startup Fund I LP, OpenAI Startup Fund Management LLC, OpenAI, LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-08292-SHS-OTW, 1:23-cv-10211-SHS-OTW, 1:24-cv-00084-SHS-OTW.(Malone, Olivia) Modified on 4/8/2025 (rju).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit / Declaration of Olivia C. Malone in support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice
Friday, April 04, 2025
156 156 motion Adjourn Conference Fri 04/04 3:33 PM
LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Scheduled for April 10, 2025 by OpenAI and Microsoft addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from R. James Slaughter, Herman Yue, and Carolyn Homer dated April 4, 2025. Document filed by OAI Corporation, LLC, OpenAI GP, LLC, OpenAI Global LLC, OpenAI Holdings, LLC, OpenAI LLC, OpenAI OpCo LLC, OpenAI, Inc., OAI Corporation LLC, OpenAI GP LLC, OpenAI Holdings LLC, OpenAI Inc., OpenAI LP, OpenAI Startup Fund GP I LLC, OpenAI Startup Fund I LP, OpenAI Startup Fund Management LLC, OpenAI, LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-08292-SHS-OTW, 1:23-cv-10211-SHS-OTW, 1:24-cv-00084-SHS-OTW.(Slaughter, R.)
Related: [-]
155 155 notice Notice (Other) Fri 04/04 12:34 AM
***SELECTED PARTIES***NOTICE of Proposed Redacted Version of ECF No. 379-2 re: (379 in 1:23-cv-08292-SHS-OTW) Response in Opposition to Motion,,,. Document filed by Jonathan Alter, Authors Guild, MICHAEL CHABON, TA-NEHISI COATES, JUNOT DAZ, ANDREW SEAN GREER, Christopher Golden, DAVID HENRY HWANG, MATTHEW KLAM, Richard Kadrey, LIPPMAN LAURA, Microsoft Corporation, Nicholas Ngagoyeanes, Nicholas A. Basbanes, OAI Corporation, LLC, OpenAI GP, LLC, OpenAI Global LLC, OpenAI Holdings, LLC, OpenAI LLC, OpenAI OpCo LLC, OpenAI, Inc., RACHEL LOUISE SNYDER, Sarah Silverman, Paul Tremblay, AYELET WALDMAN, JACQUELINE WOODSON, OpenAI GP LLC, OpenAI Holdings LLC, OpenAI Startup Fund I LP, OpenAI Startup Fund Management LLC, OpenAI Inc., OAI Corporation LLC, OpenAI Startup Fund GP I LLC, David Baldacci, Nicholas Basbanes, Kai Bird, Mary Bly, Taylor Branch, Rich Cohen, Michael Connelly, Sylvia Day, Jonathan Franzen, John Grisham, Sides Hampton, Elin Hilderbrand, Christina Baker Kline, Victor LaValle, Maya Shanbhag Lang, Eugene Linden, George R.R. Martin, Microsoft Corporation, Nicholas Ngagoyeanes, Daniel Okrent, OpenAI LP, Jodi Picoult, Douglas Preston, Roxana Robinson, Julian Sancton, George Saunders, Stacy Schiff, James Shapiro, Jia Tolentino, Scott Turow, Rachel Vail, Simon Winchester, OpenAI, LLC, Julian Sancton, Hampton Sides, Rachel Vail. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-08292-SHS-OTW, 1:23-cv-10211-SHS-OTW, 1:24-cv-00084-SHS-OTWMotion or Order to File Under Seal: 384 .(Lanham, John)
Related: [-]
154 154 respoth Response (non-motion) Fri 04/04 12:23 AM
***SELECTED PARTIES*** RESPONSE re: (380 in 1:23-cv-08292-SHS-OTW) Response to Motion,,, . Document filed by Jonathan Alter, Authors Guild, MICHAEL CHABON, TA-NEHISI COATES, JUNOT DAZ, ANDREW SEAN GREER, Christopher Golden, DAVID HENRY HWANG, MATTHEW KLAM, Richard Kadrey, LIPPMAN LAURA, Microsoft Corporation, Nicholas Ngagoyeanes, Nicholas A. Basbanes, OAI Corporation, LLC, OpenAI GP, LLC, OpenAI Global LLC, OpenAI Holdings, LLC, OpenAI LLC, OpenAI OpCo LLC, OpenAI, Inc., RACHEL LOUISE SNYDER, Sarah Silverman, Paul Tremblay, AYELET WALDMAN, JACQUELINE WOODSON, OpenAI GP LLC, OpenAI Holdings LLC, OpenAI Startup Fund I LP, OpenAI LP, OpenAI Startup Fund Management LLC, OpenAI Inc., OAI Corporation LLC, David Baldacci, Nicholas Basbanes, Kai Bird, Mary Bly, Taylor Branch, Rich Cohen, Michael Connelly, Sylvia Day, Jonathan Franzen, John Grisham, Sides Hampton, Elin Hilderbrand, Christina Baker Kline, Victor LaValle, Maya Shanbhag Lang, Eugene Linden, George R.R. Martin, Microsoft Corporation, Nicholas Ngagoyeanes, Daniel Okrent, OpenAI Startup Fund GP I LLC, Jodi Picoult, Douglas Preston, Roxana Robinson, Julian Sancton, George Saunders, Stacy Schiff, James Shapiro, Jia Tolentino, Scott Turow, Rachel Vail, Simon Winchester, OpenAI, LLC, Julian Sancton, Hampton Sides, Rachel Vail. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-08292-SHS-OTW, 1:23-cv-10211-SHS-OTW, 1:24-cv-00084-SHS-OTWMotion or Order to File Under Seal: 384 .(Lanham, John)
Related: [-]
153 153 respoth Response (non-motion) Fri 04/04 12:21 AM
***SELECTED PARTIES*** RESPONSE re: (381 in 1:23-cv-08292-SHS-OTW) Response to Motion,,, . Document filed by Jonathan Alter, Authors Guild, MICHAEL CHABON, TA-NEHISI COATES, JUNOT DAZ, ANDREW SEAN GREER, Christopher Golden, DAVID HENRY HWANG, MATTHEW KLAM, Richard Kadrey, LIPPMAN LAURA, Microsoft Corporation, Nicholas Ngagoyeanes, Nicholas A. Basbanes, OAI Corporation, LLC, OpenAI GP, LLC, OpenAI Global LLC, OpenAI Holdings, LLC, OpenAI LLC, OpenAI OpCo LLC, OpenAI, Inc., RACHEL LOUISE SNYDER, Sarah Silverman, Paul Tremblay, AYELET WALDMAN, JACQUELINE WOODSON, OpenAI GP LLC, OpenAI Holdings LLC, OpenAI Startup Fund I LP, OpenAI LP, OpenAI Startup Fund Management LLC, OpenAI Inc., OAI Corporation LLC, OpenAI Startup Fund GP I LLC, David Baldacci, Nicholas Basbanes, Kai Bird, Mary Bly, Taylor Branch, Rich Cohen, Michael Connelly, Sylvia Day, Jonathan Franzen, John Grisham, Sides Hampton, Elin Hilderbrand, Christina Baker Kline, Victor LaValle, Maya Shanbhag Lang, Eugene Linden, George R.R. Martin, Microsoft Corporation, Nicholas Ngagoyeanes, Daniel Okrent, Jodi Picoult, Douglas Preston, Roxana Robinson, Julian Sancton, George Saunders, Stacy Schiff, James Shapiro, Jia Tolentino, Scott Turow, Rachel Vail, Simon Winchester, OpenAI, LLC, Julian Sancton, Hampton Sides, Rachel Vail. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-08292-SHS-OTW, 1:23-cv-10211-SHS-OTW, 1:24-cv-00084-SHS-OTWMotion or Order to File Under Seal: 384 .(Lanham, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
158 158 transfer MDL Order Transfer Origin in S.D.N.Y. Fri 04/11 4:54 PM
CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER IN ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL... that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the action(s) listed... and pending... be, and the same hereby are, transferred to the Southern District of New York and, with consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Sidney H. Stein, for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings with the actions pending in that district... (Signed by MDL Panel on 4/3/2025) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-08292-SHS-OTW, 1:23-cv-10211-SHS-OTW, 1:24-cv-00084-SHS-OTW (vba)
Related: [-]
152 152 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Fri 04/04 12:02 AM
***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Alexander Zbrozek in Support re: (151 in 1:24-cv-00084-SHS-OTW) LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Counsel for Defendants dated April 3, 2025.. Document filed by Jonathan Alter, Authors Guild, MICHAEL CHABON, TA-NEHISI COATES, JUNOT DAZ, ANDREW SEAN GREER, Christopher Golden, DAVID HENRY HWANG, MATTHEW KLAM, Richard Kadrey, LIPPMAN LAURA, Microsoft Corporation, Nicholas Ngagoyeanes, Nicholas A. Basbanes, OAI Corporation, LLC, OpenAI GP, LLC, OpenAI Global LLC, OpenAI Holdings, LLC, OpenAI LLC, OpenAI OpCo LLC, OpenAI, Inc., RACHEL LOUISE SNYDER, Sarah Silverman, Paul Tremblay, AYELET WALDMAN, JACQUELINE WOODSON, OpenAI GP LLC, OpenAI Holdings LLC, OpenAI Startup Fund I LP, OpenAI LP, OpenAI Startup Fund Management LLC, OpenAI Inc., OAI Corporation LLC, OpenAI Startup Fund GP I LLC, David Baldacci, Nicholas Basbanes, Kai Bird, Mary Bly, Taylor Branch, Rich Cohen, Michael Connelly, Sylvia Day, Jonathan Franzen, John Grisham, Sides Hampton, Elin Hilderbrand, Christina Baker Kline, Victor LaValle, Maya Shanbhag Lang, Eugene Linden, George R.R. Martin, Microsoft Corporation, Nicholas Ngagoyeanes, Daniel Okrent, Jodi Picoult, Douglas Preston, Roxana Robinson, Julian Sancton, George Saunders, Stacy Schiff, James Shapiro, Jia Tolentino, Scott Turow, Rachel Vail, Simon Winchester, OpenAI, LLC, Julian Sancton, Hampton Sides, Rachel Vail.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-08292-SHS-OTW, 1:23-cv-10211-SHS-OTW, 1:24-cv-00084-SHS-OTWMotion or Order to File Under Seal: 384 .(Lanham, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Revised Version of ECF No. 345,
Att: 2 Exhibit Revised Version of ECF No. 351,
Att: 3 Exhibit Revised Version of ECF No. 355,
Att: 4 Exhibit Revised Version of ECF No. 359,
Att: 5 Exhibit Revised Version of ECF No. 361,
Att: 6 Exhibit Revised Version of ECF No. 364,
Att: 7 Exhibit Revised Version of ECF No. 365
151 151 motion Seal Thu 04/03 11:50 PM
LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Counsel for Defendants dated April 3, 2025. Document filed by OAI Corporation LLC, OpenAI GP LLC, OpenAI Global LLC, OpenAI Holdings LLC, OpenAI Inc., OpenAI LLC, OpenAI LP, OpenAI OpCo LLC, OpenAI Startup Fund GP I LLC, OpenAI Startup Fund I LP, OpenAI Startup Fund Management LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-08292-SHS-OTW, 1:23-cv-10211-SHS-OTW, 1:24-cv-00084-SHS-OTW.(Lanham, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Granting Defendants' Letter Motion to Seal
150 150 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 04/03 5:44 PM
LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Michelle Ybarra, Allison Blanco, and Rose Lee dated April 3, 2025 re: (366 in 1:23-cv-08292-SHS-OTW, 318 in 1:23-cv-10211-SHS-OTW) LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Rohit Nath, Rachel Geman, Scott J. Sholder dated March 31, 2025. . Document filed by OAI Corporation LLC, OpenAI GP LLC, OpenAI Global LLC, OpenAI Holdings LLC, OpenAI Inc., OpenAI LLC, OpenAI LP, OpenAI OpCo LLC, OpenAI Startup Fund GP I LLC, OpenAI Startup Fund I LP, OpenAI Startup Fund Management LLC, OAI Corporation, LLC, OpenAI GP, LLC, OpenAI Holdings, LLC, OpenAI, LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-08292-SHS-OTW, 1:23-cv-10211-SHS-OTW, 1:24-cv-00084-SHS-OTW.(Ybarra, Michelle)
Related: [-]
149 149 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/03 2:22 PM
MOTION for Spencer McManus to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-30874633. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by OAI Corporation, LLC, OpenAI GP, LLC, OpenAI Global LLC, OpenAI Holdings, LLC, OpenAI LLC, OpenAI OpCo LLC, OpenAI, Inc., OAI Corporation LLC, OpenAI GP LLC, OpenAI Holdings LLC, OpenAI Inc., OpenAI LP, OpenAI Startup Fund GP I LLC, OpenAI Startup Fund I LP, OpenAI Startup Fund Management LLC, OpenAI, LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-08292-SHS-OTW, 1:23-cv-10211-SHS-OTW, 1:24-cv-00084-SHS-OTW.(McManus, Spencer) Modified on 4/3/2025 (rju).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Spencer McManus in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice
misc Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion Thu 04/03 2:47 PM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. (372 in 1:23-cv-08292-SHS-OTW, 149 in 1:24-cv-00084-SHS-OTW, 324 in 1:23-cv-10211-SHS-OTW) MOTION for Spencer McManus to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-30874633. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-08292-SHS-OTW, 1:23-cv-10211-SHS-OTW, 1:24-cv-00084-SHS-OTW(rju)
Related: [-]
utility Case Accepted as Related Fri 04/11 4:56 PM
CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:25-md-03143-SHS. Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-08292-SHS-OTW, 1:23-cv-10211-SHS-OTW, 1:24-cv-00084-SHS-OTW(vba)
Related: [-]
utility Case Consolidation - MDL Fri 04/11 4:58 PM
CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:25-md-03143-SHS. Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-08292-SHS-OTW, 1:23-cv-10211-SHS-OTW, 1:24-cv-00084-SHS-OTW(vba)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
148 148 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/02 10:17 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Maile Nell Yeats-Rowe on behalf of OAI Corporation, LLC, OpenAI GP, LLC, OpenAI Global LLC, OpenAI Holdings, LLC, OpenAI LLC, OpenAI OpCo LLC, OpenAI, Inc., OAI Corporation LLC, OpenAI GP LLC, OpenAI Holdings LLC, OpenAI Inc., OpenAI LP, OpenAI Startup Fund GP I LLC, OpenAI Startup Fund I LP, OpenAI Startup Fund Management LLC, OpenAI, LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-08292-SHS-OTW, 1:23-cv-10211-SHS-OTW, 1:24-cv-00084-SHS-OTW.(Yeats-Rowe, Maile)
Related: [-]
misc Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion Wed 04/02 9:04 AM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. (321 in 1:23-cv-10211-SHS-OTW, 146 in 1:24-cv-00084-SHS-OTW, 369 in 1:23-cv-08292-SHS-OTW) MOTION for Timothy B. Scull to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-30863750. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-08292-SHS-OTW, 1:23-cv-10211-SHS-OTW, 1:24-cv-00084-SHS-OTW(rju)
Related: [-]
misc Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion Wed 04/02 9:39 AM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. (322 in 1:23-cv-10211-SHS-OTW, 370 in 1:23-cv-08292-SHS-OTW, 147 in 1:24-cv-00084-SHS-OTW) MOTION for Maile Nell Yeats-Rowe to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-30863901. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-08292-SHS-OTW, 1:23-cv-10211-SHS-OTW, 1:24-cv-00084-SHS-OTW(rju)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
147 147 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/01 9:24 PM
MOTION for Maile Nell Yeats-Rowe to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-30863901. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by OAI Corporation, LLC, OpenAI GP, LLC, OpenAI Global LLC, OpenAI Holdings, LLC, OpenAI LLC, OpenAI OpCo LLC, OpenAI, Inc., OAI Corporation LLC, OpenAI GP LLC, OpenAI Holdings LLC, OpenAI Inc., OpenAI LP, OpenAI Startup Fund GP I LLC, OpenAI Startup Fund I LP, OpenAI Startup Fund Management LLC, OpenAI, LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-08292-SHS-OTW, 1:23-cv-10211-SHS-OTW, 1:24-cv-00084-SHS-OTW.(Yeats-Rowe, Maile)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit / Declaration of Maile N. Yeats-Rowe is support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice
146 146 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/01 7:16 PM
MOTION for Timothy B. Scull to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-30863750. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Corporation.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-08292-SHS-OTW, 1:23-cv-10211-SHS-OTW, 1:24-cv-00084-SHS-OTW.(Scull, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Timothy B. Scull,
Att: 2 Exhibit A (Certificate of Good Standing),
Att: 3 Proposed Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice