Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:James S Gwin
Case #: 1:24-cv-00047
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Case Filed:Jan 08, 2024
Terminated:Mar 28, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jul 06, 2024 4:37 AM EDT
Defendant
Middlefield Banking Company
Represented By
Walter A. Scott Lucas
Weston Hurd - Cleveland
contact info
James F. Monagle
Mullen Coughlin - Sacramento
contact info
Plaintiff
Emerson Rainsburg
Represented By
Jonathan T. Deters
Markovits, Stock & Demarco - Cincinnati
contact info
Terence Coates
Markovits, Stock & Demarco - Cincinnati
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Thursday, March 28, 2024
12 12 order Judgment Thu 03/28 11:00 AM
Judgment Entry signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 3/28/24. The Court having entered an Order on March 28, 2024. Accordingly, the Court dismisses this case pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (T,A)
Related: [-]
11 11 1 pgs order Order Thu 03/28 10:54 AM
Marginal Entry Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 3/28/24 approving the voluntary dismissal without prejudice. re10 Notice (T,A)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Dismissal Thu 03/28 9:18 AM
Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) (A)(i) filed by Emerson Rainsburg. (Coates, Terence)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
order Order on Motion to stay Order on Motion for extension of time to answer Tue 03/26 9:49 AM
Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 3/26/24. The Defendant shall answer by May 17, 2024. The Court STAYS all other case deadlines until June 17, 2024. The parties must file a joint status report regarding mediation by June 10, 2024. re8 ,9 (T,A)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
9 9 motion Extension (answer complaint) Mon 03/18 6:11 PM
Unopposed Motion for extension of time until seven days after ruling on Joint Motion For Stay Pending Mediation to answer filed by Defendant Middlefield Banking Company. Related document(s)1 .(Monagle, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, March 15, 2024
8 8 motion Stay Fri 03/15 2:33 PM
Joint Motion to stay Pending Mediation filed by Defendant Middlefield Banking Company.(Lucas, Walter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, March 07, 2024
order Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice Thu 03/07 11:10 AM
Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney James F. Monagle for Middlefield Banking Company. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge James S. Gwin on 3/7/24. Related [+](T,A)
Related: [-] 7
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
7 7 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/05 1:30 PM
Motion for attorney Walter A. Lucas to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-12439980, filed by Defendant Middlefield Banking Company.(Lucas, Walter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of James E. Monagle,
Att: 2 Certificate of Standing
Friday, February 02, 2024
order Order on Motion for extension of time to answer Fri 02/02 3:22 PM
Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 2/2/24 granting in part defendant's5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Court grants a 45 day extension. No further extensions. (T,A)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
6 6 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement (atty event) Thu 02/01 6:07 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Middlefield Banc for Middlefield Banking Company filed by Middlefield Banking Company. (Lucas, Walter)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Extension (answer complaint) Thu 02/01 6:02 PM
Motion for extension of time until April 2, 2024 to answer filed by Defendant Middlefield Banking Company. (Lucas, Walter)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Thu 02/01 5:59 PM
Attorney Appearance by Walter A. Scott Lucas filed by on behalf of Middlefield Banking Company. (Lucas, Walter)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 13, 2024
3 3 service Return of Service Executed Sat 01/13 5:09 PM
Return of Service by personal service executed upon Middlefield Banking Company on 1/12/2024, filed on behalf of Emerson Rainsburg Related document(s)1 ,2 . (Coates, Terence)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
2 2 oth_evt Summons Issued Tue 01/09 8:36 AM
Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Middlefield Banking Company. (R,AP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form
utility Add and Terminate Judge Tue 01/09 8:23 AM
Judge James S. Gwin assigned to case. (R,AP)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Tue 01/09 8:24 AM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jennifer Dowdell Armstrong. (R,AP)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 01/08 10:40 PM
Complaint with jury demand against The Middlefield Banking Company. Filing fee paid $ 405, Receipt number AOHNDC-12347618.. Filed by Emerson Rainsburg. (Coates, Terence)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons