Ultimate Justice, LLC
Maryland Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | David E Rice |
Case #: | 1:24-bk-10354 |
Case Filed: | Jan 15, 2024 |
Creditor Meeting: | Feb 22, 2024 |
Terminated: | Aug 01, 2024 |
Debtor
Ultimate Justice, LLC
7609 Energy Pkwy Ste 101
Curtis Bay, MD 21226-2600 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Patricia B. Jefferson
Miles & Stockbridge P.C. 100 Light Street 10th Floor
Baltimore, MD 21202 |
Docket last updated: 01/15/2024 12:03 PM EST |
Monday, January 15, 2024 | ||
crditcrd
none
Mon 01/15 7:14 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK 24-10354 ) [misc,volp7a] ( 338.00). Receipt number A41709811. Fee amount 338.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) - Case Opening
Mon 01/15 7:12 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $338 Filed by Ultimate Justice, LLC. (Freiman, Adam) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
Mon 01/15 7:13 AM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Filed by Adam M. Freiman. (Freiman, Adam) |
|
3 | 3
court
Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7
Mon 01/15 7:18 AM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Jefferson, Patricia B. with 341(a) |