New York Southern District Court
Judge:J Paul Oetken
Case #: 1:24-cv-00311
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12132 Americans with Disabilities Act - Discrimination
Case Filed:Jan 16, 2024
Terminated:Sep 18, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jul 14, 2024 5:08 AM EDT
Defendant
Rumpl, Inc.
Represented By
Sean Joseph Kirby
Sheppard, Mullin, Richter & Hampton
contact info
Plaintiff
Sanjay Sookul
Represented By
Mars Khaimov
contact info


Docket last updated: 55 minutes ago
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
19 19 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Wed 09/18 3:36 PM
ORDER: The Court has been informed that the parties have reached a settlement in principle of this case. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED without costs and subject to restoring the action to the Court's calendar, provided the application to restore the action is made within thirty days. All filing deadlines and conference dates are adjourned sine die. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 9/18/2024) (vfr)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
18 18 notice Notice of Settlement Mon 09/16 11:34 AM
NOTICE of Settlement . Document filed by Sanjay Sookul..(Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
17 17 order Order Fri 09/13 5:11 PM
ORDER: The parties were directed to file a joint status letter by September 5, 2024. They have not done so. The parties shall file the joint status letter no later than September 27, 2024. If they fail to do so, this case will be dismissed for failure to prosecute. So ordered. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken) (Text Only Order) (cw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Order Thu 05/09 4:32 PM
ORDER: On Friday, May 3, 2024, the Honorable J. Paul Oetken assigned this matter to my docket for settlement. In light of the Court's busy calendar, settlement conferences must generally be scheduled at least six to eight weeks in advance. The Court will likely be unable to accommodate last-minute requests for settlement conferences, and the parties should not anticipate that litigation deadlines will be adjourned in response to late requests for settlement conferences. As soon as practicable, the parties are directed to contact Courtroom Deputy Diljah Shaw with both parties on the email, at diljah_shaw@nysd.uscourts.gov, to schedule a settlement conference for a time when they believe it would be productive. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 5/9/2024) (dsh)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 05/03 4:49 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. The parties are directed to confer with each other and with the magistrate judge to determine the most fruitful time to hold the settlement conference. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 5/3/2024) (ate)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Case Management Plan Fri 05/03 4:44 PM
CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. Depositions shall be completed by 9/5/24. All expert discovery, including expert depositions, shall be completed no later than 10/18/24. This case is to be tried to a jury. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is 2 or 3 days. The telephone conference scheduled for May 8, 2024 at 12:00 p.m. is ADJOURNED. The Court approves and so-orders the parties' proposed schedule. The parties are directed to file a joint status letter by the close of fact discovery--on or before September 5, 2024--addressing (1) the status of fact discovery; (2) whether any party intends to proceed with expert discovery; and (3) any other issues the parties wish to address. Motions due by 6/7/2024. Deposition due by 10/18/2024. Fact Discovery due by 9/5/2024. Expert Discovery due by 10/18/2024. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 5/2/2024) (ate)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Proposed Case Management Plan Fri 05/03 2:52 PM
PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Sanjay Sookul..(Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
12 12 order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Thu 04/04 3:28 PM
ORDER granting11 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference: Granted. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for April 8, 2024 is adjourned to Wednesday, May 8, 2024 at 12:00 p.m. The parties shall file the proposed case management plan on or before May 3, 2024. So ordered. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (sc)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Adjourn Conference Thu 04/04 3:17 PM
LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Mars Khaimov dated 4/4/24. Document filed by Sanjay Sookul..(Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
10 10 2 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Mon 03/18 11:10 AM
ORDER : Counsel for all parties are directed to appear telephonically for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on Monday, April 8, 2024 at 3:00 p.m. Counsel should call (888) 557-8511 at the scheduled time. The access code is 9300838. Counsel who appear at the pretrial conference must be authorized to negotiate terms of settlement. Members of the public may join but are instructed to place their phones on mute. SO ORDERED. ( Initial Conference set for 4/8/2024 at 03:00 PM before Judge J. Paul Oetken.) (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 3/18/24) (yv)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 03/15 1:04 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Rumpl, Inc...(Kirby, Sean)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 03/15 1:01 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Rumpl, Inc...(Kirby, Sean)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
7 7 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 02/08 10:31 AM
ORDER granting6 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Granted. Defendant shall move, answer, or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before March 15, 2024. So ordered. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (sc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 02/07 1:57 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Sean J. Kirby dated February 7, 2024. Document filed by Rumpl, Inc...(Kirby, Sean)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 01/30 4:47 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Rumpl, Inc. served on 1/23/2024, answer due 2/13/2024. Service was accepted by Mark C White, Registered Agent. Document filed by Sanjay Sookul..(Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 01/17 3:06 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Rumpl, Inc...(pc)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Wed 01/17 10:17 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 01/17 10:18 AM
Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 01/17 10:19 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 01/16 2:19 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Rumpl, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Sanjay Sookul..(Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 01/16 2:15 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
1 1 29 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 01/16 2:13 PM
COMPLAINT against Rumpl, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28814263)Document filed by Sanjay Sookul..(Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]