Tierney v. 3M Company, et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00210 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jan 12, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Louisiana Eastern, 2:23-cv-07215 |
Last checked: Friday Jul 12, 2024 6:21 AM EDT |
Defendant
Municipal Emergency Services, Inc.
1200 South Pine Island Road
Plantation, FL 33324 |
|
Defendant
E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Fire-Dex LLC
780 Progress Dr.
Medina, OH 44256 |
|
Defendant
Globe Manufacturing Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Honeywell Safety Products USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
Lion Group Inc
|
|
Defendant
Mallory Safety and Supply LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
PBI Performance Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Southern Mills Inc.
|
|
Defendant
StedFast USA, Inc.
800 Mountain View Dr.
Piney Flats, TN 37686 |
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corp
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
W.L. Gore & Associates Inc
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
Allstar Fire Equipment
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corp
|
|
Defendant
Archroma U.S. Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
August Tierney, III
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
service
Summons Returned Executed - Complaint Served
Tue 04/23 4:33 PM
STATUS REPORT - General Denial and Statement of Affirmative Defenses by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
16 | 16
service
Summons Returned Executed - Complaint Served
Tue 04/23 4:32 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC, Globe Manufacturing Co LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige) |
|
15 | 15
service
Summons Returned Executed - Complaint Served
Tue 04/23 4:31 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent MSA Safety Inc. for Globe Manufacturing Company LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
14 | 14
service
Summons Returned Executed - Complaint Served
Tue 04/23 4:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC, Globe Manufacturing Co LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Monday, February 26, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
service
Summons Issued
Mon 02/26 5:09 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
Tuesday, January 16, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice Other
Tue 01/16 3:09 PM
NOTICE TO NEW COUNSEL : MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) is open as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. All counsel of record are directed to take the steps necessary to be registered as electronic filers in the District of South Carolina ( See CMO No. 3 pg. 17 Electronic Filing at 22. footnote 5 (ECF Multidistrict Litigation Attorney Registration Form - available at link at the end of this NOTICE). CMO Nos. 1 - 27, (including any supplemental CMO Nos. i.e., 2.A, etc.) govern all cases in the MDL proceedings and can be viewed in the Lead case. Counsel will be notified by Liaison Counsel re new Case Management Orders and other new documents posted in the lead case. Please also read CLERKS NOTICE (s) TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 and QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE (s) filed in the Lead case. NOTICE of Hearing: Next Monthly Status Conference TBD. See the District Court's website containing information on the MDL at[LINK:MDL-2873] (sshe, ) (Entered: 01/16/2024) |
|
11 | 11
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Tue 01/16 3:06 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Llouisiana Eastern (associated as of 1/12/2024), 2:23-cv-07215, Tierney v. 3M Company, et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-00210-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
9 | 9
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Tue 01/16 3:02 PM
Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:23-cv-07215. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Friday, January 12, 2024 | ||
8 | 8 Order of MDL Transfer to District of South Carolina. MDL case number is 2873. Electronic file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent.(ko) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/16/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Transmittal Letter | ||
7 | 7 Notice of Conditional Transfer Order from MDL Panel regarding MDL 2873. (ko) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/16/2024.] | |
Monday, December 18, 2023 | ||
6 | 6 Summons Issued as to Allstar Fire Equipment, AGC Chemicals Americas Inc., Archroma U.S., Inc., Arkema Inc., BASF Corporation, Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, Carrier Global Corporation, ChemDesign Products, Inc., Chemguard, Inc., Chemicals, Inc., Chemours Company, Chemours Company FC, LLC, Chubb Fire, Ltd., Clariant Corporation, Corteva Inc., Deepwater Chemicals, Inc., Du Pont de Nemours Inc., Dynax Corporation, E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company, Fire-Dex, LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Honeywell Safety Products USA Inc, Kidde P.L.C., Inc., Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., Lion Group, Inc., Mallory Safety and Supply LLC., Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Municipal Emergency Services, Inc., National Foam, Inc., PBI Performance Products, Inc., Southern Mills, Inc., Stedfast USA, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP, UTC Fire & Security Americas Corp, United Technologies Corporation, W.L. Gore & Associates, Inc. (lb) (lb). Modified text on 12/18/2023 (lb). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/16/2024.] | |
Att: 1 (12/18/2023) Summons, | ||
Att: 2 (12/18/2023) Summons, | ||
Att: 3 (12/18/2023) Summons, | ||
Att: 4 (12/18/2023) Summons, | ||
Att: 5 (12/18/2023) Summons, | ||
Att: 7 (12/18/2023) Summons, | ||
Att: 8 (12/18/2023) Summons, | ||
Att: 9 (12/18/2023) Summons, | ||
Att: 10 (12/18/2023) Summons, | ||
Att: 11 (12/18/2023) Summons, | ||
Att: 12 (12/18/2023) Summons, | ||
Att: 13 (12/18/2023) Summons, | ||
Att: 14 (12/18/2023) Summons, | ||
Att: 15 (12/18/2023) Summons, | ||
Att: 16 (12/18/2023) Summons, | ||
Att: 17 (12/18/2023) Summons, | ||
Att: 18 (12/18/2023) Summons, | ||
Att: 19 (12/18/2023) Summons, | ||
Att: 20 (12/18/2023) Summons, | ||
Att: 21 (12/18/2023) Summons, | ||
Att: 22 (12/18/2023) Summons, | ||
Att: 23 (12/18/2023) Summons, | ||
Att: 24 (12/18/2023) Summons, | ||
Att: 25 (12/18/2023) Summons, | ||
Att: 26 (12/18/2023) Summons, | ||
Att: 27 (12/18/2023) Summons, | ||
Att: 28 (12/18/2023) Summons, | ||
Att: 29 (12/18/2023) Summons, | ||
Att: 30 (12/18/2023) Summons, | ||
Att: 31 (12/18/2023) Summons, | ||
Att: 32 (12/18/2023) Summons, | ||
Att: 33 (12/18/2023) Summons, | ||
Att: 34 (12/18/2023) Summons, | ||
Att: 35 (12/18/2023) Summons, | ||
Att: 36 (12/18/2023) Summons | ||
Friday, December 15, 2023 | ||
5 | 5 Summons Submitted for Issuance(Falcon, Jarrett) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/16/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Subpoena, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Summons, | ||
Att: 7 Summons, | ||
Att: 8 Summons, | ||
Att: 9 Summons, | ||
Att: 10 Summons, | ||
Att: 11 Summons, | ||
Att: 12 Summons, | ||
Att: 13 Summons, | ||
Att: 14 Summons, | ||
Att: 15 Summons, | ||
Att: 16 Summons, | ||
Att: 17 Summons, | ||
Att: 18 Summons, | ||
Att: 19 Summons, | ||
Att: 20 Summons, | ||
Att: 21 Summons, | ||
Att: 22 Summons, | ||
Att: 23 Summons, | ||
Att: 24 Summons, | ||
Att: 25 Summons, | ||
Att: 26 Summons, | ||
Att: 27 Summons, | ||
Att: 28 Summons, | ||
Att: 29 Summons, | ||
Att: 30 Summons, | ||
Att: 31 Summons, | ||
Att: 32 Summons, | ||
Att: 33 Summons, | ||
Att: 34 Summons, | ||
Att: 35 Summons, | ||
Att: 36 Summons, | ||
Att: 37 Summons | ||
Tuesday, December 12, 2023 | ||
4 | 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re1 Complaint: Prepared summons only provided for 3M Company. Summons will not be issued for other defendants listed in addendum. Please provide completed summons for each, individual defendant for whom summons are requested. (ko) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/16/2024.] | |
3 | 3 Summons Issued as to 3M Company. (ko) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/16/2024.] | |
Thursday, December 07, 2023 | ||
2 | 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Darrel James Papillion and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cc) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/16/2024.] | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAEDC-10308623) filed by August A. Tierney, III.Attorney Jarrett S. Falcon added to party August A. Tierney, III(pty:pla).(Falcon, Jarrett) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/16/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons |