Allsman v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00211 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Jan 12, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Illinois Southern, 3:23-cv-03920 |
Last checked: Friday Jul 12, 2024 6:21 AM EDT |
Defendant
Johnson Controls Inc
|
|
Defendant
Williams Fire & Hazard Control Inc
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Shell USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Safety Kleen Systems Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Phillips 66 Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Olin Corporation
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde Fenwal Fire Fighting, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
E I Du Pont De Nemours & Co
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Angus International Safety Group LTD
|
|
Defendant
Angus Fire Armour Corporation
141 Junny Road
Angier, NC 27501 |
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edward Allsman
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
HWRT Oil Company
Terminated: 03/21/2024
One Piasa Lane
Hartford, IL 62048 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Aton, LLC
Terminated: 03/21/2024
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
60 | 60
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 03/21 2:51 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Aqueous Film-Forming Foams Products Liability Litigation Re Edward Allsman 24-cv-00211 for Aton Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:24-cv-00211-RMG(Edelson, Joshua) |
|
59 | 59
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 03/21 2:47 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Aqueous Film-Forming Foams Products Liability Litigation Re Edward Allsman 24-cv-00211 for HWRT Oil Company Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:24-cv-00211-RMG(Edelson, Joshua) |
|
Friday, March 15, 2024 | ||
58 | 58
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 03/15 5:36 PM
DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 58 (original) Reason: misfiled; attorney filing user to receive further instruction on correct filing procedures Filing date of original filing: 3/15/2024 (sshe, ) |