Kevin Martin v. 3M Company, The et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-06730 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Dec 18, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Jun 15, 2024 6:56 AM EDT |
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Co.
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
3M Company, The
|
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Martin
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 08/20 11:01 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Only, of Particular Personal Injury Claims, Without Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i) & Second Amended Case Management Order No. 28 Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(London, Michael) |
|
Thursday, January 18, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Thu 01/18 3:03 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed) (associated as of 12/18/2023), Kevin Martin v. 3M Company, The et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-06730-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Southern California (sshe, ) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 01/18 10:19 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (cper, ) |
|
Monday, December 18, 2023 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 01/18 10:18 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-11487794), filed by Kevin Martin. Service due by 3/18/2024(cper, ) |