Arizona, State of v. Optum Incorporated et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:23-md-03080
Lead case: 2:23-md-03080
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Brian R Martinotti |
Referred: | Rukhsanah L Singh |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00260 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Jan 17, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Arizona, 2:23-cv-02688 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 15, 2024 4:27 AM EDT |
Defendant
EXPRESS SCRIPTS ADMINISTRATORS LLC.
|
|
Defendant
UNITEDHEALTH GROUP INCORPORATED
|
|
Defendant
SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. L.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
OptumRx Incorporated
|
|
Defendant
OptumInsight Incorporated
|
|
Defendant
Optum Incorporated
|
|
Defendant
Novo Nordisk Incorporated
|
|
Defendant
Medco Health Solutions Incorporated
|
|
Defendant
Express Scripts Pharmacy Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Express Scripts Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Evernorth Health Incorporated
|
|
Defendant
ESI Mail Pharmacy Services Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
|
|
Defendant
CVS PHARMACY, INCORPORATED
|
|
Defendant
CVS HEALTH CORPORATION
|
|
Defendant
CAREMARK RX L.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
CAREMARK PCS HEALTH LLC
|
|
Defendant
CAREMARK L.L.C.
|
|
Plaintiff
Arizona, State of
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, February 12, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 02/12 5:49 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Arizona, State of. Novo Nordisk Incorporated waiver sent on 2/6/2024, answer due 4/8/2024. (PIFKO, MARK) |
|
Tuesday, February 06, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 02/06 5:57 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Arizona, State of. ELI LILLY AND COMPANY waiver sent on 2/6/2024, answer due 4/8/2024. (PIFKO, MARK) |
|
25 | 25
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 02/06 5:46 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Arizona, State of. SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. L.L.C. waiver sent on 12/26/2023, answer due 2/26/2024. (PIFKO, MARK) |
|
24 | 24
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 02/06 5:44 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Arizona, State of. Optum Incorporated waiver sent on 12/26/2023, answer due 2/26/2024; OptumInsight Incorporated waiver sent on 12/26/2023, answer due 2/26/2024; OptumRx Incorporated waiver sent on 12/26/2023, answer due 2/26/2024; UNITEDHEALTH GROUP INCORPORATED waiver sent on 12/26/2023, answer due 2/26/2024. (PIFKO, MARK) |
|
23 | 23
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 02/06 5:39 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Arizona, State of. ESI Mail Pharmacy Services Incorporated waiver sent on 12/20/2023, answer due 2/20/2024; EXPRESS SCRIPTS ADMINISTRATORS LLC. waiver sent on 12/20/2023, answer due 2/20/2024; Evernorth Health Incorporated waiver sent on 12/20/2023, answer due 2/20/2024; Express Scripts Incorporated waiver sent on 12/20/2023, answer due 2/20/2024; Express Scripts Pharmacy Incorporated waiver sent on 12/20/2023, answer due 2/20/2024; Medco Health Solutions Incorporated waiver sent on 12/20/2023, answer due 2/20/2024. (PIFKO, MARK) |
|
22 | 22
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 02/06 5:24 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Arizona, State of. CAREMARK L.L.C. waiver sent on 12/14/2023, answer due 2/13/2024; CAREMARK PCS HEALTH LLC waiver sent on 12/14/2023, answer due 2/13/2024; CAREMARK RX L.L.C. waiver sent on 12/14/2023, answer due 2/13/2024; CVS HEALTH CORPORATION waiver sent on 12/14/2023, answer due 2/13/2024; CVS PHARMACY, INCORPORATED waiver sent on 12/14/2023, answer due 2/13/2024. (PIFKO, MARK) |
|
Friday, February 02, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 02/02 9:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by TROY ALAN RAFFERTY on behalf of Arizona, State of (RAFFERTY, TROY) |
|
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 02/02 10:36 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by BRANDON LEE BOGLE on behalf of All Plaintiffs (BOGLE, BRANDON) |
|
Friday, January 26, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 01/26 12:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew D. Schultz on behalf of Arizona, State of (Schultz, Matthew) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 01/26 12:31 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by BECCA TIMMONS on behalf of Arizona, State of (TIMMONS, BECCA) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 01/26 12:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM FRANKLIN CASH, III on behalf of Arizona, State of (CASH, WILLIAM) |
|
Wednesday, January 17, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
mdl
MDL Notice to Counsel
Wed 01/17 10:53 AM
Clerk's Notice to Counsel Pursuant to CTO-8 entered in MDL No. 3080, District of Arizona case number 2:23-cv-02688 has been transferred to the District of New Jersey and assigned civil action number: 2:24-cv-00260. In Re: Insulin Pricing Litigation, MDL 3080. (sms2) |
|
15 | 15
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Court Transfer
Wed 01/17 9:57 AM
Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:23-cv-02688. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Wed 01/17 10:04 AM
Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh added. (sms2) |
||
utility
Create Case Association
Wed 01/17 10:06 AM
Cases associated to 2:23-md-03080-BRM-RLS. (sms2) |
||
order
Case Management Order
Wed 01/17 10:55 AM
This case is part of MDL 3080. Parties are expected to review and abide by all prior orders entered in this MDL, which can be found[LINK:here] . (sms2) |
||
Tuesday, January 16, 2024 | ||
14 | 14 CERTIFIED MDL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-8) Transferring Case to the District of New Jersey Re MDL-3080. (MAP) | |
Remark: Case Transferred to the District of New Jersey via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) | ||
Friday, January 05, 2024 | ||
13 | 13 NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal of Leslie Kyman Cooper filed by Shane Ham. (Ham, Shane) | |
Thursday, January 04, 2024 | ||
12 | 12 NOTICE re: Service by Arizona, State of re:10 Order . (Tann, Joseph) | |
Wednesday, January 03, 2024 | ||
11 | 11 ORDER: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 2/12/2024 at 09:15 AM before Judge Susan M Brnovich. See Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 1/3/2024. (KJ) | |
10 | 10 ORDER: Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendant(s) and file notice of service with the Clerk of Court. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 1/3/2024. (KJ) | |
Friday, December 29, 2023 | ||
9 | 9 NOTICE re: Filing of Notice of Potential Tag-Along Action with the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Incorporated, Caremark LLC, Caremark PCS Health LLC, Caremark RX LLC .(Stein, Lee) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Filed Tag Notice | ||
Thursday, December 28, 2023 | ||
8 | 8 Additional Attachments to Main Document re:1 Notice of Removal,, Civil Cover Sheet per 5 by Defendants ESI Mail Pharmacy Services Incorporated, Express Scripts Incorporated, Express Scripts Pharmacy Incorporated. (Hounfodji, Catherine) | |
Wednesday, December 27, 2023 | ||
7 | 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Incorporated, Caremark LLC, Caremark PCS Health LLC, Caremark RX LLC. (Stein, Lee) | |
6 | 6 *SUPPLEMENT re:1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Incorporated, Caremark LLC, Caremark PCS Health LLC, Caremark RX LLC .(Stein, Lee) *Modified event on 12/28/2023 (KJ). | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment State Court Docket, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A - Complaint, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B - Court Pleadings, | ||
Att: 5 Attachment Verification, | ||
Att: 6 Affidavit Notice of Appearance | ||
5 | 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re:1 Notice of Removal filed by Express Scripts Pharmacy Incorporated, Express Scripts Incorporated, ESI Mail Pharmacy Services Incorporated. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please submit the Automated Civil Cover Sheet using the following: Civil, Other Filings, Other Documents, Additional Attachment to Main Document and link to the Notice of Removal. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK) | |
4 | 4 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re:1 Notice of Removal filed by Express Scripts Pharmacy Incorporated, Express Scripts Incorporated, ESI Mail Pharmacy Services Incorporated. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required . This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK) | |
Friday, December 22, 2023 | ||
3 | 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-22602380. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan M Brnovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 23-02688 PHX-SMB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK) | |
2 | 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ESI Mail Pharmacy Services Incorporated, Express Scripts Incorporated, Express Scripts Pharmacy Incorporated. (submitted by Catherine Hounfodji) (REK) | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2023-018501. Filing fee received: $405.00, receipt number AAZDC-22602380 filed by ESI Mail Pharmacy Services Incorporated, Express Scripts Incorporated, Express Scripts Pharmacy Incorporated. (submitted by Catherine Hounfodji)(REK) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E (Supplemental Cover Sheet), | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 10 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
***State Court record received on 12/22/2023***SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arizona, State of: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 12/06/2023 to CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Incorporated, Caremark RX LLC, Caremark PCS Health LLC, Caremark LLC, Ernorth Health Incorporated, Express Scripts Incorporated, Express Scripts Administrators LLC, Medco Health Solutions Incorporated, ESI Mail Pharmacy Service Incorporated, and Express Scripts Pharmacy Incorporated.***Waivers of Service docketed in U.S. District Court on 12/22/2023 for case management purposes.*** (REK) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. |