California Southern District Court
Judge:Cynthia Bashant
Referred: Bernard G Skomal
Case #: 3:24-cv-00113
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441fr Removal- Fraud
Case Filed:Jan 17, 2024
Terminated:Mar 26, 2024
Case in other court:Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, 37-02023-00054414-CU-NP-CTL
Last checked: Monday Jul 15, 2024 1:17 AM PDT
Defendant
Smarty, LLC
Represented By
Allison C. Nelson
Venable LLP
contact info
Ari N. Rothman
Venable LLP
contact info
Abigail Colleen Zeimis
Venable LLP
contact info
Abigail C. Zeimis
Venable LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Catherine Foster
Represented By
Sophia Goren Gold
Kalielgold PLLC
contact info
Jeffrey Douglas Kaliel
Kaliel Gold PLLC
contact info
Amanda Rosenberg
Kaliel Gold PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
10 10 3 pgs notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 03/26 11:35 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Catherine Foster (Gold, Sophia)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
9 9 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 03/25 10:54 AM
ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Extend Time to Respond (ECF No.8 ). Defendant Smarty, LLC response due 4/24/2024. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 03/25/2024. (mjw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 03/19 6:26 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Notice of Removal, Exhibit 1 - Complaint by Smarty, LLC. (Rothman, Ari)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 02/13 2:56 PM
ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Extend Time to Respond (ECF No.6 ) Responses due by 3/25/2024. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 02/13/2024. (mjw)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 02/12 4:39 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint by Smarty, LLC.(Rothman, Ari)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Proposed Order Re: Joint Motion to Extend Smarty, LLC's Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
5 5 notice Notice (Other) Wed 01/24 3:07 PM
NOTICE of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. § 1446(D) by Smarty, LLC (Rothman, Ari) (mjw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2024
4 4 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 01/18 2:54 PM
ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Extend Time to Respond (ECF No.3 ). Defendant Smarty, LLC response due 2/23/2024. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 01/18/2024. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mjw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
3 3 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 01/17 7:05 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Notice of Removal, Exhibit 1 (Complaint) by Smarty, LLC. (Rothman, Ari)
Related: [-]
2 2 4 pgs misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 01/17 3:37 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Smarty, LLC. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (rxc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Wed 01/17 3:35 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-18506053.), filed by Smarty, LLC. The new case number is 3:24-cv-113-BAS-BGS. Judge Cynthia Bashant and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case.(rxc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 17 pgs Exhibit 1 (Complaint),
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 (Summons),
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 (Civil Case Cover Sheet),
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 (Notice of Case Assignment)