New York Southern District Court
Judge:Mary Kay Vyskocil
Case #: 1:24-cv-00401
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Jan 18, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 16, 2024 4:28 AM EDT
Defendant
Hanover Capital Group LLC
Defendant
Haim Llalouz
367 Summit Ave.
Cedarhurst, NY 11516
Defendant
Yanathon Llalouz
Plaintiff
Geoffrey Kigongo
Represented By
Carl Edward Zapffe
M. Ross & Associates, LLC
contact info
Philip Michael Hines
Held & Hines, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
George Rauch
Represented By
Carl Edward Zapffe
M. Ross & Associates, LLC
contact info
Philip Michael Hines
Held & Hines, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Layla Saliba
Represented By
Carl Edward Zapffe
M. Ross & Associates, LLC
contact info
Philip Michael Hines
Held & Hines, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Kwaine Thompson Jr.
Represented By
Carl Edward Zapffe
M. Ross & Associates, LLC
contact info
Philip Michael Hines
Held & Hines, LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Premium Merchant Funding One, LLC
Terminated: 03/04/2024


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, April 17, 2025
55 55 order Case Management Plan ~Util - Terminate Motions Thu 04/17 11:28 AM
REVISED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties consent do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge, including motions and trials. 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). The case is to be tried to a jury. Any motion to amend or to join additional parties shall be filed within ten (10) days from the date of this Order. The Parties have discussed settlement and the use of alternative dispute resolution. Please advise the Court of the outcome of your discussion. The Post-Discovery Conference scheduled for July 2, 2025 at 11:30AM is ADJOURNED to the date noted below. Motions terminated:54 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Joey Tsai dated 4/16/2025. filed by Hanover Capital Group LLC. ( Deposition due by 7/23/2025., Fact Discovery due by 5/21/2025., Expert Discovery due by 7/23/2025., Status Conference set for 8/13/2025 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil.) (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 4/17/2025) (tg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
54 54 motion Extension of Time Wed 04/16 6:05 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Joey Tsai dated 4/16/2025. Document filed by Hanover Capital Group LLC..(Tsai, Joey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Revised Scheduling Order