278
|
|
278
claims
Certificate of Mailing
Fri 05/03 10:59 AM
Certificate of Mailing of Claims Agent re Second Monthly Application of Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A. for Allowance of Compensation for Services Rendered and for Reimbursement of Expenses as Co- Counsel to the Debtor for the period from March 1, 2024 to March 31, 2024 . Filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC. Related [+] (Garabato, Sid)
|
277
|
|
277
claims
Certificate of Mailing
Fri 05/03 10:47 AM
Certificate of Mailing of Claims Agent re Certification of Counsel Regarding Order Appointing Fee Examiner and Establishing Related Procedures for the Review of Fee Applications of Professionals; Order Appointing Fee Examiner and Establishing Related Procedures for the Review of Fee Applications of Professionals . Filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC. Related [+] (Garabato, Sid)
|
276
|
|
276
claims
Certificate of Mailing
Fri 05/03 10:43 AM
Certificate of Mailing of Claims Agent re Certification of Counsel Regarding Scheduling of Omnibus Hearing Date; Order Scheduling Omnibus Hearings. Omnibus Hearings scheduled for 6/11/2024 at 01:30 PM US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Signed on 4/26/2024 . Filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC. Related [+] (Garabato, Sid)
|
275
|
|
275
misc
Affidavit/Declaration of Service
Fri 05/03 9:06 AM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service . Filed by The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Terraform Labs Pte. Ltd.. Related [+] (Matthews, Gene)
|
274
|
|
274
misc
Declaration in Support
Fri 05/03 8:16 AM
Declaration in Support // Second Supplemental Declaration of Edward Kim in Support of Application of the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Terraform Labs Pte. Ltd. to Retain and Employ Genesis Credit Partners LLC as Financial Advisor, Effective March 29, 2024 Related [+] Filed by The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Terraform Labs Pte. Ltd.. (Hurst, David)
|
273
|
|
273
misc
Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required
Thu 05/02 4:03 PM
Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required Regarding Second Monthly Fee Statement of Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP for Payment of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the period February 1, 2024 to February 29, 2024 Related [+] Filed by Terraform Labs Pte. Ltd.. (Milana, Matthew)
|
272
|
|
272
misc
Declaration
Thu 05/02 2:19 PM
Declaration and Disclosure Statement of Josephine Gartrell, on Behalf of Willis Towers Watson ("WTW") Filed by Terraform Labs Pte. Ltd.. (Milana, Matthew)
Related: [-]
|
271
|
|
271
misc
Declaration
Thu 05/02 2:17 PM
Declaration and Disclosure Statement of ADA Danelo, on Behalf of Summit Law Group PLLC Filed by Terraform Labs Pte. Ltd.. (Milana, Matthew)
Related: [-]
|
270
|
|
270
misc
Declaration
Thu 05/02 2:15 PM
Declaration and Disclosure Statement of Matthew L. Levine, on Behalf of Elliott Kwok Levine & Jaroslaw LLP Filed by Terraform Labs Pte. Ltd.. (Milana, Matthew)
Related: [-]
|
269
|
|
269
misc
Declaration
Thu 05/02 2:13 PM
Declaration and Disclosure Statement of Mark Forte, on Behalf of Conyers, Dill & Pearman Filed by Terraform Labs Pte. Ltd.. (Milana, Matthew)
Related: [-]
|
268
|
|
268
claims
Certificate of Mailing
Thu 05/02 9:36 AM
Certificate of Mailing of Claims Agent re Third Monthly Fee Statement of Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP for Payment of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the period March 1, 2024 to March 31, 2024 . Filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC. Related [+] (Garabato, Sid)
|
267
|
|
267
misc
Declaration
Wed 05/01 10:16 PM
Declaration of Chris Amani in Support of Debtor's Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing Debtor to Redact and File Under Seal Confidential Information Related to the Key Employee Retention Plan and Certain Expense Payments Related [+] Filed by Terraform Labs Pte. Ltd.. (Milana, Matthew)
|
266
|
|
266
motion
File Under Seal - Motion (B)
Wed 05/01 10:13 PM
Motion to File Under Seal (Debtor's Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing Debtor to Redact and File Under Seal Confidential Information Related to the Key Employee Retention Plan and Certain Expense Payments) Filed by Terraform Labs Pte. Ltd.. Hearing scheduled for 5/15/2024 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/8/2024. (Milana, Matthew)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Notice
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit A
|
265
|
|
265
motion
Extend - Motion
Wed 05/01 9:39 PM
Motion to Extend // Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Extending Time to Assume or Reject Unexpired Lease of Nonresidential Real Property and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed by Terraform Labs Pte. Ltd.. Hearing scheduled for 5/15/2024 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/8/2024. (Milana, Matthew)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Notice
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit A
|
264
|
|
264
claims
Certificate of Mailing
Wed 05/01 3:47 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Claims Agent re Notice of Further Directions from Singapore International Commercial Court . Filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC. Related [+] (Garabato, Sid)
|
263
|
|
263
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 05/01 11:52 AM
Order Approving Agreed Confidentiality Stipulation and Protective Order Related [+] Order Signed on 5/1/2024. (JMW)
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit 1
|
262
|
|
262
misc
Schedules/Statements
Wed 05/01 8:38 AM
[SEALED] Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by Terraform Labs Pte. Ltd.. (Shapiro, Zachary)
Related: [-]
|
261
|
|
261
misc
Schedules/Statements
Tue 04/30 11:46 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by Terraform Labs Pte. Ltd.. (Milana, Matthew)
Related: [-]
|
260
|
|
260
misc
Schedules/Statements
Tue 04/30 11:42 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by Terraform Labs Pte. Ltd.. (Milana, Matthew)
Related: [-]
|
259
|
|
259
misc
Certification of Counsel(Aty)
Tue 04/30 1:19 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Agreed Confidentiality Stipulation and Protective Order Filed by Terraform Labs Pte. Ltd.. (Milana, Matthew)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit A
|
258
|
|
258
motion
Compensation - Application (Attorney)
Tue 04/30 12:58 PM
Monthly Application for Compensation // First Monthly Fee Statement of Rahman Ravelli for Payment of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the period January 21, 2024 to February 29, 2024 Filed by Rahman Ravelli. Objections due by 5/21/2024. (Milana, Matthew)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Notice
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit A
|
| |
Att: 3
Exhibit B
|
257
|
|
257
misc
Declaration
Tue 04/30 8:56 AM
Supplemental Declaration of Mark G. Califano, Pursuant to Rule 2014 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, in Connection with the Application of Debtor for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Dentons US LLP as Special Counsel to the Debtor and Debtor in Possession, Effective as of the Petition Date Related [+] Filed by Terraform Labs Pte. Ltd.. (Milana, Matthew)
|
256
|
|
256
motion
Compensation - Application (Attorney)
Mon 04/29 4:45 PM
Monthly Application for Compensation // Second Monthly Application of Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A. for Allowance of Compensation for Services Rendered and for Reimbursement of Expenses as Co- Counsel to the Debtor for the period from March 1, 2024 to March 31, 2024 Filed by Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A.. Objections due by 5/20/2024. (Shapiro, Zachary)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Notice
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit A
|
| |
Att: 3
Exhibit B
|
255
|
|
255
court
Omnibus Hearing Dates
Mon 04/29 2:26 PM
Order Scheduling Omnibus Hearings. Omnibus Hearings scheduled for 6/11/2024 at 01:30 PM US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Signed on 4/29/2024. (JMW)
Related: [-]
|
254
|
|
254
10
pgs
order
Order
Mon 04/29 2:26 PM
Order Appointing Fee Examiner and Establishing Related Procedures for the Review of Fee Applications of Professionals Related [+] Order Signed on 4/29/2024. (JMW)
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit 1
|
253
|
|
253
claims
Certificate of Mailing
Mon 04/29 9:49 AM
Certificate of Mailing of Claims Agent re Second Monthly Fee Statement of Services Rendered and Expenses Incurred by Alvarez & Marsal North America, LLC as Financial Advisors to Debtor, for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the period from February 1, 2024 to February 29, 2024 . Filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC. Related [+] (Garabato, Sid)
|
252
|
|
252
motion
Compensation - Application (Attorney)
Fri 04/26 3:30 PM
Monthly Application for Compensation // Third Monthly Fee Statement of Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP for Payment of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the period March 1, 2024 to March 31, 2024 Filed by Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP. Objections due by 5/17/2024. (Milana, Matthew)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Notice
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit A
|
| |
Att: 3
Exhibit B
|
251
|
|
251
misc
Certification of Counsel(Aty)
Fri 04/26 2:45 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Scheduling of Omnibus Hearing Date Filed by Terraform Labs Pte. Ltd.. (Milana, Matthew)
Related: [-]
|